This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/24/2023 at 19:28:43 (UTC).

In Re: Pharmaceutical Industry

Case Summary

On 02/23/2012 In Re Pharmaceutical Industry was filed as an Other - Antitrust lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    12-1067

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Defendants

ALPHA THERAPEUTIC CO

BAXTER HEMOGLOBIN THERAPEUTICS

NOVARTIS PHARMACEUTICALS

PFIZER, INC.

PHARMACIA CORPORATION

IVAX CORPORATION

ASTELLAS PHARMA US, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellees

STATE OF IOWA

COUNTY OF GREENE

ACTION ALLIANCE OF SENIOR CITIZENS OF GREATER PHILADELPHIA

COUNTY OF DUTCHESS

COUNTY OF ONEIDA

KIMBERLY K. HOOVER

COUNTY OF MADISON

STATE OF HAWAII

COUNTY OF CAYUGA

Interested Party

OXFORD HEALTH PLANS, LLC

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

PHARMACIA CORPORATION

PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.

Not Classified By Court

M. JOYCE HOWE

COUNTY OF ORANGE

365 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Gavin G. Jangard

Patrick M. Bryan

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Mitchell R. Jensen

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Paul K. Dueffert

Other Attorneys

Curtis Drake

Roy D. Campbell III

Jill Brenner Meixel

Maura T. Healey

Meredith Myers LeConey

Michael P. Doss

Kenneth W. Africano

Lauren O. Casazza

Seth A. Gastwirth

Thomas Neal Jamerson

David D. Bassett

Charles David Ewing

Eliseo Zamora Sisneros

J. Gordon Cooney

Andrea Schillaci

James L. Ward Jr.

821 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

district court record

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

03/13/2012
View Court Documents

DocketMANDATE issued. [12-1067] (CMP) [Entered: 03/13/2012 01:57 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2012
View Court Documents

DocketJUDGMENT dismissing case pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). [12-1067] (CMP) [Entered: 03/13/2012 01:56 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2012
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Corinna Connick in 12-1067. Certificate of service dated 02/27/2012. [12-1067] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. [12-1067]--[Edited 02/29/2012 by CP] (TJC) [Entered: 02/27/2012 02:18 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2012
View Court Documents

DocketMOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellee Blue Cross/Blue Shield of Massachusetts in 12-1067, 11-2141. Certificate of service dated 01/19/2012. CLERK'S NOTE: This motion was filed on January 19, 2012. [12-1067, 11-2141] (CMP) [Entered: 02/24/2012 03:17 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2012
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Blue Cross/Blue Shield of Massachusetts in 12-1067 filed by Attorney Steve W. Berman. Certificate of service dated 02/24/2012. [12-1067, 11-2141] (SWB) [Entered: 02/24/2012 02:28 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2012
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #8026) filed by Appellant Corinna Connick. Docketing Statement due 03/09/2012. Transcript Report/Order form due 03/09/2012. Appearance form due 03/09/2012. [12-1067] (CMP) [Entered: 02/24/2012 10:30 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less