This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/05/2021 at 06:03:12 (UTC).

In re: PES Holdings LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 In re PES Holdings LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1208

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff

OFFICIAL COMMITTE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS

Debtor / Appellee and Debtor

In re: PES HOLDINGS LLC ET AL.

Defendant / Appellee

ICBC STANDARD BANK PLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan M. Stemerman Esq.

Attorney at Elliott Greenleaf

1105 North Market Street, Suite 1700

Wilmington, DE 19801

Rafael X. Zahralddin-Arevena Esq.

Attorney at Elliott Greenleaf

1105 North Market Street, Suite 1700

Wilmington, DE 19801

Debtor / Appellee and Debtor Attorneys

Laura D. Jones Esq.

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones

919 North Market Street, P.O. Box 8705, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

James E. O'Neill Esq. III

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones

919 North Market Street, P.O. Box 8705, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Peter J. Keane Esq.

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones

919 North Market Street, P.O. Box 8705, 17Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Stacy L. Newman Esq.

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, P.O. Box 1150, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

William P. Bowden Esq.

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, P.O. Box 1150, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

Deborah J. Newman Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Zachary Russell Esq.

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Paige N. Topper Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Robert J. Dehney Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Andrew R. Remming Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

James I. McClammy Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

David B. Toscano Esq.

Attorney at Davis Polk & Wardwell

450 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

18 #6

Non-Criminal Appendix (Volume 6)

18 #5

Non-Criminal Appendix (Volume 5)

18 #4

Non-Criminal Appendix (Volume 4)

18 #3

Non-Criminal Appendix (Volume 3)

18 #2

Non-Criminal Appendix (Volume 2)

18 #1

Non-Criminal Appendix (Volume 1)

#17

16 #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

16 #1

Mediation Instructions

#5

#4

#3

1 #6

Case Opening Letter

1 #5

Standing Order Excess Pagination

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Memorandum

#1

Notice of Appeal

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket(#22) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) After futher consideration, briefing in this appeal shall resume. Appellee's brief shall be filed within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. (CJG) [Entered: 03/24/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#21) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Cortland Capital Market Services LLC - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 6. (GPK) [Entered: 03/19/2021 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) It is noted that Appellant's brief and appendix was filed on March 16, 2021. As this case is currently before the Appellate Mediator, the briefing schedule is hereby stayed. The parties will be notified of the deadline for filing Appellee's brief once mediation has concluded. (CJG) [Entered: 03/18/2021 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#19) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Cortland Capital Market Services LLC - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 4.--[Edited 03/18/2021 by RM] (RM) [Entered: 03/18/2021 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC JOINT APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Cortland Capital Market Services LLC. Certificate of service dated 03/16/2021 by ECF. [21-1208] (JIM) [Entered: 03/16/2021 06:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellant Cortland Capital Market Services LLC. Certificate of Service dated 03/16/2021 by ECF. [21-1208] (JIM) [Entered: 03/16/2021 06:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 03/10/2021 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Cortland Capital Market Services LLC. [21-1208] (JIM) [Entered: 03/05/2021 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Laura D. Jones, Esq., Peter J. Keane, Esq., and James E. O'Neill, III, Esq. for PES Holdings LLC & Jonathan M. Stemerman, Esq., and Rafael X. Zahralddin-Arevena, Esq. for Official Committe of Unsecured Creditors requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form and Disclosure Statement on or before 03/05/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 02/19/2021 08:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FOLLOW UP LETTER to James I. McClammy, Esq. and David B. Toscano, Esq. for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC requesting Disclosure Statement on or before 03/05/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 02/19/2021 08:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from David B. Toscano on behalf of Appellant(s) Cortland Capital Market Services, LLC. [21-1208] (DBT) [Entered: 02/18/2021 06:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James I. McClammy on behalf of Appellant(s) Cortland Capital Market Services, LLC. [21-1208] (JIM) [Entered: 02/18/2021 06:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Disclosure Stmnt, Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance. Service made on 02/17/2021 by ECF. [21-1208] (SLN) [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee ICBC Standard Bank PLC. [21-1208] (SLN) [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Zachary Russell on behalf of Appellee(s) ICBC Standard Bank PLC. [21-1208] (SLN) [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Deborah J. Newman on behalf of Appellee(s) ICBC Standard Bank PLC. [21-1208] (SLN) [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stacy L. Newman on behalf of Appellee(s) ICBC Standard Bank PLC. [21-1208] (SLN) [Entered: 02/17/2021 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER FORM (Part 1). Transcripts already on file in District Court. (CJG) [Entered: 02/16/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 02/04/2021 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Cortland Capital Market Services LLC in District Court No. 1-20-cv-00363. (AMR) [Entered: 02/04/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Lockw is a litigant

Latest cases where CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ICBC Standard Bank PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige Noelle Topper