This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/16/2020 at 06:22:25 (UTC).

In re: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 In re PersonalWeb Technologies LLC was filed as an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1566

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEVEL 3 COMMUNICATIONS, LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

In re: PERSONALWEB TECHNOLOGIES LLC

Plaintiff / Appellees

AMAZON WEB SERVICES, INC.

AMAZON.COM, INC.

Defendant / Appellee

TWITCH INTERACTIVE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lawrence Milton Hadley

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Wesley Warren Monroe

Attorney at Stubbs Alderton & Markiles LLP

15260 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Plaintiff / Appellee and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

J. David Hadden Esq.

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

801 California Street, Silicon Valley Center

Mountain View, CA 94041

Thomas Fox

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Todd Richard Gregorian

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

555 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Saina S. Shamilov

Attorney at Fenwick & West, LLP

801 California Street, Silicon Valley Center

Mountain View, CA 94041

Ravi Ragavendra Ranganath

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

 

Court Documents

#19

#17

#16

#15

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief [ # 19 ] filed by Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. The opening brief is due 06/18/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [691865] [JAL] [Entered: 05/04/2020 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION of Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC to extend the time to 06/18/2020 to file the May 18, 2020 principal brief. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 05/01/2020 by email. [691782] [20-1566] [Wesley Monroe] [Entered: 05/01/2020 05:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#18) REMINDER : All counsel of record are reminded of their responsibility per Fed. Cir. R. 47.4(a) and Fed. Cir. R. 47.3 to promptly submit an amended Certificate of Interest (COI) and/or Entry of Appearance (EOA) as information changes during the pendency of the appeal. Failure to comply with these Rules may delay the timely processing of your case or result in adverse action. [691757] [JAL] [Entered: 05/01/2020 04:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Entry of appearance for Thomas J. Fox as of counsel for Appellees Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. and Twitch Interactive, Inc.. Service: 04/03/2020 by email. [684029] [20-1566] [Thomas Fox] [Entered: 04/03/2020 01:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Entry of appearance for Lawrence M. Hadley as principal counsel for Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Service: 04/02/2020 by email. [683854] [20-1566] [Lawrence Hadley] [Entered: 04/02/2020 04:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended Entry of appearance for Wesley W. Monroe as of counsel for Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Service: 04/02/2020 by email. [683805] [20-1566] [Wesley Monroe] [Entered: 04/02/2020 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docket(#14) Note to file: 20-1566 (COMPANION started 04/01/2020) with 20-1543. These cases shall be considered companion cases and assigned to the same merits panel for oral argument. [683379] [20-1543, 20-1566] [LMN] [Entered: 04/01/2020 11:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Docketing Statement for the Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Service: 03/31/2020 by email. [683292] [20-1566] [Wesley Monroe] [Entered: 03/31/2020 11:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interest for Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Service: 03/31/2020 by email. [683291] [20-1566] [Wesley Monroe] [Entered: 03/31/2020 11:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Entry of appearance for Wesley W. Monroe as principal counsel for Appellant PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Service: 03/31/2020 by email. [683290] [20-1566] [Wesley Monroe] [Entered: 03/31/2020 11:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellees Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. and Twitch Interactive, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2020 by email. [682533] [20-1566] [J. David Hadden] [Entered: 03/27/2020 07:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Interest for Appellee Twitch Interactive, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2020 by email. [682532] [20-1566] [J. David Hadden] [Entered: 03/27/2020 06:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Appellees Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Amazon.com, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2020 by email. [682530] [20-1566] [J. David Hadden] [Entered: 03/27/2020 06:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for J. David Hadden as principal counsel for Appellees Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. and Twitch Interactive, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2020 by email. [682529] [20-1566] [J. David Hadden] [Entered: 03/27/2020 06:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Todd R. Gregorian as of counsel for Appellees Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. and Twitch Interactive, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2020 by email. [682528] [20-1566] [Todd Gregorian] [Entered: 03/27/2020 06:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Ravi R. Ranganath as of counsel for Appellees Amazon Web Services, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. and Twitch Interactive, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2020 by email. [682526] [20-1566] [Ravi Ranganath] [Entered: 03/27/2020 06:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Saina S. Shamilov as of counsel for Appellees Twitch Interactive, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Web Services, Inc.. Service: 03/27/2020 by email. [682522] [20-1566] [Saina Shamilov] [Entered: 03/27/2020 06:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#3) Note to file: The following cases are associated: 20-1566 Lead with 20-1568 and 20-1569 Member Cases. FURTHER ENTRIES WILL BE ADDED TO THE LEAD APPEAL ONLY. [679944] [20-1566, 20-1568, 20-1569] [JAL] [Entered: 03/18/2020 02:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER consolidating appeals 20-1566, 20-1568, and 20-1569. The revised official caption is reflected in the order. Appellant's opening brief is due 05/18/2020. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [679943] [20-1566, 20-1568, 20-1569] [JAL] [Entered: 03/18/2020 02:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/06/2020. [679454] Entry of Appearance is due 03/31/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/31/2020. Docketing Statement is due 03/31/2020. Appellant's brief is due 05/18/2020. [JAL] [Entered: 03/17/2020 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Web Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Twitch Interactive, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Level 3 Communications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Amazon.Com, Inc. is a litigant