This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 06:01:31

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 a Property - Eminent Domain case was filed by In re PennEast Pipeline Co LLC against Verizon New Jersey Inc, in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit.

Case Details

  • Case Number 19-2596
  • Filing Date 07/16/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Property - Eminent Domain
  • Jurisdiction U.S. Courts Of Appeals
  • Courthouse U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

Party Details

  • Plaintiff / Appellee In re: PENNEAST PIPELINE CO LLC
  • Represented By
    • Maureen T. Coghlan Esq.
    • James M. Graziano Esq.
  • Not Yet Classified NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION
  • Represented By
    • Jeremy Feigenbaum Esq.
    • Mark A. Collier Esq.
  • Defendant COUNTY OF HUNTERDON
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC, FKA New Jersey Bell Telephone Co
  • Represented By
    • Kathleen M. DalCortivo Esq.

Court Documents

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Graziano on beh...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Ne...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to hold appeals in abeyance fi...

Fees Apply
Open Document

CLERK ORDER consolidating the appeals for all purposes, file...

Fees Apply
Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kathleen M. DalCortivo, Esq. for Verizon...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark C. Collier, Deputy ...

Fees Apply
Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Maureen T. Coghlan, Esq. for PennEast Pi...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maureen T. Coghlan on be...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant New Jersey Department o...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by ...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee PennEa...

Fees Apply
Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellan...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to hold appeals in abeyance filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. The appeals are held in abeyance pending the Court's decision in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The parties must immediately advise the Court, in writing, when a decision has been reached by the Court in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The responses must advise the Court what effect, if any, the decision regarding No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals has on this set of appeals, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 08/14/2019 by KR] (KR) [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:34 PM]
  • 08/01/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maureen T. Coghlan on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MTC) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:45 AM]
  • 07/31/2019
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kathleen M. DalCortivo, Esq. for Verizon New Jersey Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. [19-2596, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:50 PM]
  • 07/31/2019
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee PennEast Pipeline Co LLC in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:36 PM]
  • 07/31/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Graziano on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:34 PM]
  • 07/31/2019
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Maureen T. Coghlan, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC and James M. Graziano, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:57 PM]
  • 07/30/2019
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 07/30/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:30 PM]
  • 07/30/2019
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:22 PM]
  • 07/30/2019
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:20 PM]
  • 07/30/2019
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, received. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:18 PM]
  • 07/30/2019
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark C. Collier, Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Appellant(s) New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:15 PM]
  • 07/16/2019
  • CLERK ORDER consolidating the appeals for all purposes, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:45 PM]
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:30 AM]
  • 07/16/2019
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in District Court No. 3-19-cv-01097. (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 08:25 AM]

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.