This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:38 (UTC).

PennEast Pipeline Co LLC v. Township of Kingwood, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 PennEast Pipeline Co LLC filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Township of Kingwood. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2598

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

AT&T CORP, FKA American Telephone & Telegraph Co

STATE OF NEW JERSEY

COUNTY OF HUNTERDON

Plaintiff / Appellee

In re: PENNEAST PIPELINE CO LLC

Defendant / Appellees

TOWNSHIP OF KINGWOOD

STATE OF NEW JERSEY

Not Yet Classified

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Katherine G. Motley-Hunt Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

William H. Pandos Esq.

Attorney at Lavery Selvaggi Abromitis & Cohen

1001 Route 517

Hackettstown, NJ 07840

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Maureen T. Coghlan Esq.

Attorney at Archer & Greiner

One Centennial Square, 33 East Euclid Avenue

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

James M. Graziano Esq.

Attorney at Archer & Greiner

One Centennial Square, 33 East Euclid Avenue

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Mark A. Collier Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Jeremy Feigenbaum Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to hold appeals in abeyance filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. The appeals are held in abeyance pending the Court's decision in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The parties must immediately advise the Court, in writing, when a decision has been reached by the Court in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The responses must advise the Court what effect, if any, the decision regarding No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals has on this set of appeals, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 08/14/2019 by KR] (KR) [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:34 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William H. Pandos, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Kingwood Township. [19-2598]--[Edited 08/01/2019 by KR] (WHP) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:33 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William H. Pandos, Esq. on behalf of Appellee Kingwood Township. --[Edited 08/01/2019 by KR] (WHP) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:04 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maureen T. Coghlan on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MTC) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:45 AM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Katherine G. Motley-Hunt, Esq. for State of New Jersey requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:23 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to William H. Pandos, Esq. for Township of Kingwood requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:16 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee PennEast Pipeline Co LLC in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:36 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Graziano on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:34 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Maureen T. Coghlan, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC and James M. Graziano, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 07/30/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:30 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:22 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:20 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, received. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:18 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark C. Collier, Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Appellant(s) New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:15 PM]

Open Document

CLERK ORDER consolidating the appeals for all purposes, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:45 PM]

Open Document #4

Standing Order

Open Document #3

Case Caption

Open Document #2

District Court Order 060719

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to hold appeals in abeyance filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. The appeals are held in abeyance pending the Court's decision in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The parties must immediately advise the Court, in writing, when a decision has been reached by the Court in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The responses must advise the Court what effect, if any, the decision regarding No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals has on this set of appeals, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 08/14/2019 by KR] (KR) [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CORRECTED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William H. Pandos, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Kingwood Township. [19-2598]--[Edited 08/01/2019 by KR] (WHP) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William H. Pandos, Esq. on behalf of Appellee Kingwood Township. --[Edited 08/01/2019 by KR] (WHP) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maureen T. Coghlan on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MTC) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Katherine G. Motley-Hunt, Esq. for State of New Jersey requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to William H. Pandos, Esq. for Township of Kingwood requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee PennEast Pipeline Co LLC in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Graziano on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Maureen T. Coghlan, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC and James M. Graziano, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 07/30/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, received. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark C. Collier, Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Appellant(s) New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER consolidating the appeals for all purposes, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in District Court No. 3-19-cv-01107. (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.