This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:01:54 (UTC).

In re: PennEast Pipeline Co LLC v. Township of Holland, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 In re PennEast Pipeline Co LLC filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Township of Holland. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2601

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION

Defendants and Defendant / Appellees

TOWNSHIP OF HOLLAND

VERIZON NEW JERSEY INC

COUNTY OF HUNTERDON

M&T BANK

M&T BANK, RP

Plaintiff / Appellee

In re: PENNEAST PIPELINE CO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Mark A. Collier Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Jeremy Feigenbaum Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of New Jersey

25 Market Street, Richard J. Hughes Justice Complex

Trenton, NJ 08625

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew P. Lyons Esq.

Attorney at Gebhardt & Kiefer

1318 Route 31 North, P.O. Box 4001

Clinton, NJ 08809

Kathleen M. DalCortivo Esq.

Attorney at Sterns & Weinroth

50 West State Street, P.O. Box 1298, Suite 1400

Trenton, NJ 08607

Michael L. Rich Esq. I

Attorney at Porzio Bromberg & Newman

100 Southgate Parkway, P.O. Box 1997

Morristown, NJ 07962

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Maureen T. Coghlan Esq.

Attorney at Archer & Greiner

One Centennial Square, 33 East Euclid Avenue

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

James M. Graziano Esq.

Attorney at Archer & Greiner

One Centennial Square, 33 East Euclid Avenue

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

 

Court Documents

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael L. Rich, I, Esq. for M&T Bank requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:02 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Matthew P. Lyons, Esq. for Township of Holland requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William H. Pandos, Esq. on behalf of Appellee Kingwood Township. --[Edited 08/01/2019 by KR] (WHP) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:04 AM]

Open Document

ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to hold appeals in abeyance filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. The appeals are held in abeyance pending the Court's decision in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The parties must immediately advise the Court, in writing, when a decision has been reached by the Court in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The responses must advise the Court what effect, if any, the decision regarding No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals has on this set of appeals, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 08/14/2019 by KR] (KR) [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:34 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maureen T. Coghlan on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MTC) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:45 AM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kathleen M. DalCortivo, Esq. for Verizon New Jersey Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. [19-2596, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:50 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee PennEast Pipeline Co LLC in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:36 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Graziano on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:34 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Maureen T. Coghlan, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC and James M. Graziano, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:57 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 07/30/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:30 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:22 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:20 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, received. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:18 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark C. Collier, Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Appellant(s) New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:15 PM]

Open Document #5

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #4

Standing Order

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document

CLERK ORDER consolidating the appeals for all purposes, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:45 PM]

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to hold appeals in abeyance filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. The appeals are held in abeyance pending the Court's decision in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The parties must immediately advise the Court, in writing, when a decision has been reached by the Court in No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals. The responses must advise the Court what effect, if any, the decision regarding No. 19-1191 and the consolidated appeals has on this set of appeals, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 08/14/2019 by KR] (KR) [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William H. Pandos, Esq. on behalf of Appellee Kingwood Township. --[Edited 08/01/2019 by KR] (WHP) [Entered: 08/01/2019 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Maureen T. Coghlan on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MTC) [Entered: 08/01/2019 10:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Michael L. Rich, I, Esq. for M&T Bank requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Matthew P. Lyons, Esq. for Township of Holland requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kathleen M. DalCortivo, Esq. for Verizon New Jersey Inc requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. [19-2596, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee PennEast Pipeline Co LLC in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James M. Graziano on behalf of Appellee(s) PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (JMG) [Entered: 07/31/2019 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Maureen T. Coghlan, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC and James M. Graziano, Esq. for PennEast Pipeline Co LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 08/14/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 08/14/2019. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/31/2019 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 to stay briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 07/30/2019. Service made by ECF. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601]--[Edited 07/30/2019 by KR] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601 advising this court that no transcripts are available. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in 19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601, received. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Mark C. Collier, Deputy Attorney General on behalf of Appellant(s) New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (MAC) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER consolidating the appeals for all purposes, filed. [19-2596, 19-2597, 19-2598, 19-2599, 19-2600, 19-2601] (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant New Jersey Department of Environmental Protection in District Court No. 3-19-cv-01117. (KR) [Entered: 07/16/2019 12:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.