This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2019 at 06:31:29 (UTC).

In Re: Paul J. DiPietro

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 In Re Paul J DiPietro was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-559

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellant

Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union

Debtor

In re: Paul J. DiPietro

Appellee

Paul J. DiPietro

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Daniel Cade Stafford Esq.

Attorney at McCabe & Mack LLP

63 Washington Street, P.O. Box 509

Poughkeepsie, NY 12602

Cory Poolman

Attorney at McCabe & Mack LLP

63 Washington Street, P.O. Box 509

Poughkeepsie, NY 12602

Richard DuVall

Attorney at McCabe & Mack LLP

63 Washington Street, P.O. Box 509

Poughkeepsie, NY 12602

Appellee Attorney

Francis J. O'Reilly Esq.

Attorney at Francis J. O'Reilly, Esq.

1961 Route 6

Carmel, NY 10512

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, informing Court of proposed due date 06/19/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 04/01/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2530154] [19-559] [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:27 PM]

#33

(#33) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/02/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2526066] [19-559] [Entered: 03/26/2019 02:03 PM]

#32

(#32) NEW CASE MANAGER, Kyaire Wynn, ASSIGNED.[2524393] [19-559] [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:07 PM]

#23

(#23) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [17], on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED.[2523445] [19-559] [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:42 PM]

#22

(#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED. Service date 03/21/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2523441] [19-559] [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:39 PM]

#20

(#24) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 23 ], [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED.[2523460] [19-559] [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:48 PM]

#18

No Description Available

15 #2

Supporting Document

15 #1

Form C FILED

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2522162] [19-559] [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:55 PM]

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION and ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, RECEIVED.[2512847] [19-559] [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:05 PM]

1 #2

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union Brief due date as 06/19/2019 FILED.[2531594] [19-559] [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, informing Court of proposed due date 06/19/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 04/01/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2530154] [19-559] [Entered: 04/01/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 05/02/2019, Start Time: 10:30 AM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Dean W.M. Leslie, ENTERED.[2526066] [19-559] [Entered: 03/26/2019 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) NEW CASE MANAGER, Kyaire Wynn, ASSIGNED.[2524393] [19-559] [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ATTORNEY, Richard R. DuVall, [ # 22 ], in place of attorney Daniel C. Stafford, SUBSTITUTED.[2523475] [19-559] [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, [ # 21 ], [ # 22 ], on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED.[2523470] [19-559] [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ATTORNEY, Cory Poolman for Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, in case 19-559 , [ # 21 ], ADDED.[2523465] [19-559] [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 23 ], [ # 20 ], on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED.[2523460] [19-559] [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [17], on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED.[2523445] [19-559] [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED. Service date 03/21/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2523441] [19-559] [Entered: 03/21/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2019
  • (#12) FORM C/A, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2522219] [19-559] [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2522172] [19-559] [Entered: 03/20/2019 02:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • (#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2522170] [19-559] [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • (#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2522167] [19-559] [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2522162] [19-559] [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • (#5) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Francis J. O'Reilly, Esq. for Appellee Paul J. DiPietro, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2512860] [19-559] [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2512852] [19-559] ] [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16449122, FILED.[2512850] [19-559] [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION and ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, RECEIVED.[2512847] [19-559] [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union, FILED. [2512814] [19-559] [Entered: 03/07/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hudson Valley Federal Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Francis J. O'Reilly