This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/06/2022 at 09:19:32 (UTC).

In re: NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 In re NNN 400 Capitol Center 16, LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1639

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: NNN 400 CAPITOL CENTER 16 LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

RUBIN & RUBIN PA

Defendant / Appellees

WELLS FARGO BANK NA, Trustee for the Registered Holders of Comm 2006-C8 Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates

BERKADIA COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE LLC

LNR PARTNERS LLC

LITTLE ROCK 400 WEST CAPITOL TRUST

TACONIC CAPITAL ADVISORS

LITTLE ROCK 400 WEST CAPITOL OWNER LLC

Trustee

DON A. BESKRONE, solely as Chapter 7 Trustee of NNN 400 Capitol Center LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Julia B. Klein Esq.

225 West 14Th Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Lawrence J. Kotler Esq.

Attorney at Duane Morris

30 South 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Sommer L. Ross Esq.

Attorney at Duane Morris

1201 North Market Street, Suite 501

Wilmington, DE 19801

Paul E. Chronis Esq.

Attorney at Duane Morris

190 South Lasalle Street, Suite 3700

Chicago, IL 60603

Allison M. Midei Esq.

Attorney at Duane Morris

100 International Drive, Suite 700

Baltimore, MD 21202

Elinor M. Murarova Esq.

Attorney at Duane Morris

190 South Lasalle Street, Suite 3700

Chicago, IL 60603

Trustee Attorneys

Ricardo Palacio Esq.

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, P.O. Box 1150, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

Stacy L. Newman Esq.

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, P.O. Box 1150, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is GRANTED. As required by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12(a), these appeals were docketed under the captions used during the district-court proceedings. Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust was therefore included as a party in both appeals. The motion to substitute that party's successor-in-interest is GRANTED. The captions for both appeals are hereby amended to substitute Little Rock 400 West Capitol Owner LLC in place of Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust. [21-3013, 22-1639] (PDB) [Entered: 05/18/2022 09:28 AM]

#26

(#26) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Sommer L. Ross, Esq. for Appellees Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust, LNR Partners LLC, Taconic Capital Advisors and Wells Fargo Bank NA in 21-3013, Attorney Sommer L. Ross, Esq. for Appellees Wells Fargo Bank NA, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners LLC, Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust and Taconic Capital Advisors in 22-1639 Letter In Response To The Court's May 5, 2022 Text Order. Certificate of Service dated 05/12/2022. Service made by ECF. [21-3013, 22-1639] (SLR) [Entered: 05/12/2022 05:47 PM]

24 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

24 #1

Standing Order

#23

(#23) ECF FILER: AMENDED Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 11:31 PM]

#22

(#22) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:26 PM]

#21

(#21) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:20 PM]

#20

(#20) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA advising this court that. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 12:11 PM]

#19

(#19) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 11:59 AM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Don A. Beskrone. [22-1639] (SLN) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:01 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stacy L. Newman on behalf of Appellee(s) Don A. Beskrone, solely as Chapter 7 Trustee of NNN 400 Capitol Center LLC, et al.. [22-1639] (SLN) [Entered: 04/20/2022 02:53 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ricardo Palacio on behalf of Appellee(s) Don A. Beskrone, solely as Chapter 7 Trustee of NNN 400 Capitol Center LLC, et al.. [22-1639] (RP) [Entered: 04/20/2022 02:52 PM]

#3

(#3) CLERK ORDER The above captioned appeals are hereby consolidated for purposes of disposition only. The Court disfavors redundant briefs. The parties are therefore encouraged to file consolidated briefs addressing both appeals or adopt portions of other briefs by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). All parties must file case opening forms, motions, briefs, and other documents only in the appeal(s) to which the filings relate. Case-opening forms for the later filed appeal must only be filed in the new appeal and not re filed in the earlier appeal in which the forms were previously filed. The parties are advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document. [22-1639, 21-3013] (PDB) [Entered: 04/07/2022 12:55 PM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Opinion dated 032422

1 #2

District Court Order dated 032422

#1

Civil Case Docketed

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER (Clerk) The foregoing motion is GRANTED. As required by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12(a), these appeals were docketed under the captions used during the district-court proceedings. Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust was therefore included as a party in both appeals. The motion to substitute that party's successor-in-interest is GRANTED. The captions for both appeals are hereby amended to substitute Little Rock 400 West Capitol Owner LLC in place of Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust. [21-3013, 22-1639] (PDB) [Entered: 05/18/2022 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Sommer L. Ross, Esq. for Appellees Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust, LNR Partners LLC, Taconic Capital Advisors and Wells Fargo Bank NA in 21-3013, Attorney Sommer L. Ross, Esq. for Appellees Wells Fargo Bank NA, Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC, LNR Partners LLC, Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust and Taconic Capital Advisors in 22-1639 Letter In Response To The Court's May 5, 2022 Text Order. Certificate of Service dated 05/12/2022. Service made by ECF. [21-3013, 22-1639] (SLR) [Entered: 05/12/2022 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#25) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk): In one of these consolidated appeals, Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust moved to substitute a new party in its place. The motion was not filed in the other appeal, however. Within seven days, the movant must notify the Court in writing whether the requested substitution should apply to both appeals. [21-3013, 22-1639] (RFH) [Entered: 05/05/2022 01:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA due on or before 06/06/2022. Appendix due on or before 06/06/2022. (PDB) [Entered: 04/26/2022 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ECF FILER: AMENDED Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 11:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA advising this court that. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA. [22-1639] (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Julia Bettina Klein of Klein LLC on behalf of Appellant(s) Rubin & Rubin, P.A.. (JBK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sommer L. Ross on behalf of Appellee(s) Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Comm 2006-C8 Commercial Mortgage Pass Through Certificates; LNR Partners LLC; Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC; Little Rock-400 West Capitol Owner LLC; and, Taconic Capital Advisors. [22-1639] (SLR) [Entered: 04/21/2022 11:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lawrence J. Kotler on behalf of Appellee(s) Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the Registered Holders of Comm 2006-C8 Commercial Mortgage Pass Through Certificates; LNR Partners LLC; Berkadia Commercial Mortgage LLC; Little Rock-400 West Capitol Owner LLC; and, Taconic Capital Advisors. [22-1639] (LJK) [Entered: 04/21/2022 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Motion filed by Appellee Little Rock 400 West Capitol Trust to substitute Little Rock - 400 West Capitol Owner LLC, Appellee. Certificate of Service dated 04/20/2022. Service made by ECF. [21-3013] (SLR) [Entered: 04/20/2022 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Don A. Beskrone. [22-1639] (SLN) [Entered: 04/20/2022 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stacy L. Newman on behalf of Appellee(s) Don A. Beskrone, solely as Chapter 7 Trustee of NNN 400 Capitol Center LLC, et al.. [22-1639] (SLN) [Entered: 04/20/2022 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ricardo Palacio on behalf of Appellee(s) Don A. Beskrone, solely as Chapter 7 Trustee of NNN 400 Capitol Center LLC, et al.. [22-1639] (RP) [Entered: 04/20/2022 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • Docket(#4) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 04/18/2022. (PDB) [Entered: 04/19/2022 04:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK ORDER The above captioned appeals are hereby consolidated for purposes of disposition only. The Court disfavors redundant briefs. The parties are therefore encouraged to file consolidated briefs addressing both appeals or adopt portions of other briefs by reference. See Fed. R. App. P. 28(i). All parties must file case opening forms, motions, briefs, and other documents only in the appeal(s) to which the filings relate. Case-opening forms for the later filed appeal must only be filed in the new appeal and not re filed in the earlier appeal in which the forms were previously filed. The parties are advised that failure to file documents in the appropriate case may result in the issuance of a noncompliance order. If any party is unsure how to file a particular document, he or she should call the case manager prior to filing the document. [22-1639, 21-3013] (PDB) [Entered: 04/07/2022 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 04/07/2022 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Rubin & Rubin PA in District Court No. 1-21-cv-00816. (PDB) [Entered: 04/07/2022 12:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKADIA COMMERCIAL MORTGAGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LNR PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Taconic Capital Advisors LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacy Lynn Newman