This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/22/2021 at 06:19:18 (UTC).

In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 In Re Nine West LBO Securitie was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3981

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee

Wayne Kulkin

Defendant / Appellees

Katherine Butler

Chi Operating Investment Program, LP

198 Lnverness Drive W

Centennial, CO 80112

Jamie Cygielman

The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund

Vanguard International Equity Index Funds, Vanguard Total World Stock Index Fund

Heather Roussel

Brooklyn, NY 11249

Sharon Harger

Penndel, PA 19047

Matthew H. Kamens

Joseph A. Rosato

Wayne Kulkin

American International Group Inc.

175 Water St.

New York, NY 10038

Lowell W. Robinson

Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, (NVIT Multi-Manager Small Cap Value Fund)

Barington Companies Investors, LLC

RBB Fund, Inc.

909 Third Ave., 31St Fl.

New York, NY 10022

Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co.

Gerald Hood

Scott Bowman

EQ Advisors Trust, (EQ/2000 Managed Volatility Portfolio)

1290 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10104

Royce Institutional, LLC, (Opportunity Portfolio)

104 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Joel Malen Taylor Esq.

Attorney at Kagen, Caspersen & Bogart PLLC

757 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Andrew J. Entwistle Esq.

Attorney at Entwistle & Cappucci, LLP

299 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10171

Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Scott Musoff

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Joseph T. Kelleher Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Marissa Rachel Parker Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

James P. Chou

Attorney at Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP

1407 Broadway

New York, NY 10018

Harlan M. Lazarus Esq.

Attorney at Lazarus & Lazarus, P.C.

240 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Matthew Joel Aaronson Esq.

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

875 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Kevin J. O'Connor Esq. Sr.

Attorney at Peckar & Abramson, P.C.

70 Grand Avenue

River Edge, NJ 07661

Brian D. Koosed Esq.

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1601 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Danielle C. Lesser Esq.

Attorney at Morrison Cohen LLP

909 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Philip D. Anker

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Joseph Cioffi Esq.

Attorney at Davis & Gilbert LLP

1740 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Craig C. Martin

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

300 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Craig Aaron Benson Esq.

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP

2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Robert Joel Lack

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

David A. Schrader Esq.

Attorney at Paykin, Krieg & Adams, LLP

750 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Riccardo DeBari Esq.

Attorney at Thompson Hine LLP

335 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

45 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#80

#60

58 #2

Supporting Document

58 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#56

#46

#44

#42

#186

#182

#176

#174

#173

151 #2

Supporting Document

151 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

#144

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) FRAP 26.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, on behalf of Appellee Valued Advisers Trust, FILED. Service date 01/07/2021 by CM/ECF.[3008118] [20-3981] [Entered: 01/07/2021 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[2999165] [20-3959, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/22/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • Docket(#75) NOTE: See lead case, 20-3257, containing complete set of docket entries.[2998349] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals and Case Management Order, [ # 2988739-2 ] filed by Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Marc S Kirschner, in 20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, granting motion to consolidate appeals [ # 55 ] filed by Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Marc S Kirschner in 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, by JON, FILED. [2998294][73] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3941, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3952, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, informing Court of proposed due date 03/05/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 12/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2996971] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/18/2020 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2996206] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/18/2020 08:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE, to Appellee American International Group Inc., Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd., Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund, Chi Operating Investment Program, LP, Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND, Dreman Contrarian Funds, EQ Advisors Trust, EQ Advisors Trust, JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund, KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels, KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism, KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites, Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust, Merrill Lynch Investment, Milton Partners, Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio, Odin Holdings LP, Panagora Asset Management Inc., Pillsbury, Pinebridge Investments LP, Quantitative Master Series LLC, RBB Fund, Inc., SEI Institutional Investments Trust, SEI Institutional Managed Trust, Securian Life Insurance Co., TFS Capital LLC, Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co., The Hartford Life Insurance Company, Tradition Securities and Derivatives Inc., Tudor Trading I, LP and Virtu Americas LLC in 20-3941, Appellee American International Group Inc., Bluecrest Capital Management Ltd., Chi Operating Investment Program, LP, Chrysler World IMI Equity Index - ND, Dreman Contrarian Funds, EQ Advisors Trust, EQ Advisors Trust, JPMorgan Systematic Alpha Fund, KBC Equity Fund - Fallen Angels, KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism, KBC Equity Fund - Strategic Satellites, Lincoln Variable Insurance Products Trust, Multimanager Small Cap Value Portfolio, Odin Holdings LP, Pinebridge Investments LP, Quantitative Master Series LLC, RBB Fund, Inc., SEI Institutional Investments Trust, SEI Institutional Managed Trust, Securian Life Insurance Co., TFS Capital LLC and Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Co. in 20-3981, Appellee Boston Partners All-Cap Value Fund and Panagora Asset Management Inc. in 20-3992, 20-3998, regarding a corporation proceeding Pro Se, and requesting a response 30 days from the date of this letter, SENT.[2996191] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/18/2020 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket(#62) ATTORNEY, Ross E. Firsenbaum for Susquehanna International Group LLP State Street Global Advisors Gardner Lewis Merger Arbitrage Fund II, L.P. State Street Bank Maya Account Holder Gardner Lewis Merger Arbitrage Fund, L.P. State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund State Street Global Advisors Total ETF State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF Gardner Lewis Event Driven Fund, L.P. Hartford Schroders US Small Cap Opportunities Fund of The Hartford Mutual Funds II, Inc. State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A State Street North America Confidential Client 1 FOF State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Ishares 405 State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund State Street North America Confidential Client 1 Domestic Equities State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund, in case 20-3941 Ross E. Firsenbaum for State Street Global Advisors State Street Bank Maya Account Holder State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Total ETF State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF, in case 20-3998 Ross E. Firsenbaum for State Street Global Advisors State Street Bank Maya Account Holder State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund State Street Global Advisors Total ETF State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund SL SER A State Street Global Advisors U.S. Extended Market Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 1000 Value Fund CTF State Street Global Advisors Russell Small Cap Fund Complete S/L A State Street Global Advisors Russell 3000 Index Fund State Street Global Advisors Russell 2000 Index Fund, in case 20-3992 Ross E. Firsenbaum for Susquehanna International Group LLP, in case 20-3981 , [ # 59 ], ADDED.[2989367] [20-3941, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/09/2020 06:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#61) ATTORNEY, Andrew J. Entwistle for Joseph R. Gromek Gabelli Global Series Fund Inc., in case 20-3941, ADDED.[2989290] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/08/2020 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John D. Demsey, Matthew H. Kamens, Sidney Kimmel, James A. Mitarotonda, Jeffrey D. Nuechterlein, Lowell W. Robinson and The Sidney Kimmel Revocable Indenture of Trust, FILED. Service date 12/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2989231] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/08/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Nationwide Mutual Funds and Nationwide Variable Insurance Trust, FILED. Service date 12/02/2020 by CM/ECF. [2985294] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/02/2020 08:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3941, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3952, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 12/02/2020 by CM/ECF. [2985138] [20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 12/02/2020 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 12/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2985043] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cref Equity Index Account, TIAA-CREF Funds, TIAA-CREF Funds and TIAA-CREF Funds, FILED. Service date 12/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2984397] [20-3981] [Entered: 12/01/2020 05:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTE: See lead case, 20-3941, containing complete set of docket entries.[2983213] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2983189] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, district court receipt # NYSDC-22678570, FILED.[2983185] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/19/2020, RECEIVED.[2983181] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2983170] [20-3981] [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3981, FILED. [2983154] [20-3981, 20-3941] [Entered: 11/30/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Arbitrage Event-Driven Fund is a litigant

Latest cases where TALCOTT RESOLUTION LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where American International Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danielle C. Lester