This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/24/2020 at 06:16:01 (UTC).

In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 In Re Nine West LBO Securitie was filed as a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3327

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Defendants

Prudential Financial, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Harvest Street Capital LLC

Stacey A. Harmon

Roy Chan

KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism

Investment Managers Series Trust, (Towle Deep Value Fund)

The Hartford Life Insurance Company

Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund

Defendant NJ-1

MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, AKA BlackRock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2

Wisdom Tree Asset Management Inc.

Vincent Morales

Arlene Starr

iShares Russell 3000 ETF

The Arbitrage Fund

State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund

Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust

Virtu Americas LLC

Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series)

DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 2 Portfolio

364 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Philip D. Anker

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Edward A. Friedman Esq.

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Robert Joel Lack

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Shenghao Stan Chiueh Esq.

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#24

#18

#10

#144

#143

#142

#125

#124

#100

#70

#51

#39

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#41) ATTORNEY, Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3326 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3315 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3327 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3290 , [ # 40 ], ADDED.[2979089] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, 20-3290, Marc S Kirschner and Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, FILED. Service date 11/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2979066] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3290, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335 Brief due date as 01/22/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/22/2021, FILED.[2967292] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 11/04/2020 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[2967218] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 11/04/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, 20-3290, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, informing Court of proposed due date 01/22/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2958829] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice, Counsel is directed to register as a Filing User under Local Rule 25.1 to file documents electronically in this case within three (3) days of the date of this order. [ # 2953094-2 ] filed by Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust, by WJN, FILED. [2958555][33] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/22/2020 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 19 ], [ # 24 ], on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner, FILED.[2954896] [20-3327] [Entered: 10/19/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner, FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954785] [20-3327] [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to withdraw document [ # 2952483-2 ]; withdrawing motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 2948167-2 ] in 20-3257, 20-3290, FILED. [2953116][23] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ATTORNEY, Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3326 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, in case 20-3315 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3257 Robert Joel Lack for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3327 Robert Joel Lack for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3290 , [ # 2949738-2 ], [ # 2949740-2 ], [ # 2949741-2 ], [ # 2949743-2 ], [ # 18 ], ADDED.[2951706] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 10/14/2020 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION ORDER, deferring motion for admission pro hac vice [ # 2948167-2 ] filed by Appellee DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 1 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Micro Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Value Portfolio, Dimensional Funds PLC Global Targeted Value Fund, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Targeted Value Portfolio, DFA Australia Limited Global Core Equity Trust, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc TA US Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Small Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Targeted Value Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Social Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Vector Equity Portfolio, DFA Investment Trust Company Tax-Managed US Marketwide Value Series, DFA US Core Equity Fund, DFA US Vector Equity Fund, Micro Cap Subtrust, Small Cap Value Subtrust, Tax-Managed US Equity Series, U.S. Small Cap Subtrust and Dimensional Funds plc U.S. Small Companies Fund, Within seven (7)days of the date of this order, Mr. Florence must submit a declaration in support of his motion that complies with Local Rule 46.1(d)(3), FILED. [2949076][14] [20-3257, 20-3290]--[Edited 10/09/2020 by RD] [Entered: 10/09/2020 11:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Ross E. Firsenbaum for CNH Opportunistic Premium Offshore Fund, L.P. AQR Absolute Return Master Account, L.P. AQR Delta Sapphire Fund, L.P. AQR Funds-AQR Multi-Strategy Alternative Fund AQR Delta Master Account, L.P. AQR DELTA XN Master Account, L.P. CNH Master Account, L.P., in case 20-3326 Ross E. Firsenbaum for CNH Opportunistic Premium Offshore Fund, L.P. HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund LP AQR Absolute Return Master Account, L.P. AQR Funds AQR Delta Sapphire Fund, L.P. AQR Funds-AQR Multi-Strategy Alternative Fund AQR Delta Master Account, L.P. HBK Master Fund L.P. AQR DELTA XN Master Account, L.P. CNH Master Account, L.P., in case 20-3257 Ross E. Firsenbaum for AQR Funds, in case 20-3327 Ross E. Firsenbaum for HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund LP HBK Master Fund L.P., in case 20-3290 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[2947226] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 10/07/2020 01:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HBK Master Fund L.P., HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund LP, AQR Absolute Return Master Account, L.P., AQR Delta Master Account, L.P., AQR Delta Sapphire Fund, L.P., AQR DELTA XN Master Account, L.P., AQR Funds-AQR Multi-Strategy Alternative Fund, CNH Master Account, L.P., CNH Opportunistic Premium Offshore Fund, L.P. and AQR Funds in 20-3257, Appellee HBK Master Fund L.P. and HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund LP in 20-3290, Appellee AQR Absolute Return Master Account, L.P., AQR Delta Master Account, L.P., AQR Delta Sapphire Fund, L.P., AQR DELTA XN Master Account, L.P., AQR Funds-AQR Multi-Strategy Alternative Fund, CNH Master Account, L.P. and CNH Opportunistic Premium Offshore Fund, L.P. in 20-3326, Appellee AQR Funds in 20-3327, FILED. Service date 10/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2947140] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 10/07/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee AQR Funds, FILED. Service date 10/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2947104] [20-3327] [Entered: 10/07/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTE: See lead case, 20-3257, containing complete set of docket entries.[2943499] [20-3327] [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2943492] [20-3327] [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner, district court receipt # NYSDC-21843882, FILED.[2943482] [20-3327] [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/28/2020, RECEIVED.[2943476] [20-3327] [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2943472] [20-3327] [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner, FILED. [2943453] [20-3327] [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series) is a litigant