This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/24/2020 at 06:10:21 (UTC).

In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 In Re Nine West LBO Securitie was filed as a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3315

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Defendants

Prudential Financial, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Harvest Street Capital LLC

Stacey A. Harmon

Roy Chan

KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism

Investment Managers Series Trust, (Towle Deep Value Fund)

The Hartford Life Insurance Company

Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund

Defendant NJ-1

MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, AKA BlackRock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2

Wisdom Tree Asset Management Inc.

Vincent Morales

Arlene Starr

iShares Russell 3000 ETF

The Arbitrage Fund

State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund

Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust

Virtu Americas LLC

Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series)

DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 2 Portfolio

364 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Scott Musoff

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001

Allison B. Hudson Esq.

Attorney at Vedder Price P.C.

222 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Louis E. Fogel

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

353 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Timothy Ryan Farrell Esq.

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

111 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Craig C. Martin

Attorney at Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP

300 North Lasalle Drive

Chicago, IL 60654

Steven P. Mandell Esq.

Attorney at Mandell Menkes LLC

1 North Franklin Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Edward A. Friedman Esq.

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Brian J. Fischer Esq.

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

919 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Gregg Lewis Weiner Esq.

Attorney at Ropes & Gray LLP

1211 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

William W. Thorsness Esq.

Attorney at Vedder Price P.C.

222 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Robert Joel Lack

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Robert Scott Saunders Esq.

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

1 Rodney Square, 920 North King Street, P.O. Box 636

Wilmington, DE 19899

Joshua Dunn Esq.

Attorney at Vedder Price P.C.

1633 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Shenghao Stan Chiueh Esq.

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

61 #2

Addendum A

61 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance FILED

#49

#38

#32

#30

#29

#28

#25

#16

#144

#143

#142

#125

#124

#114

#100

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • Docket(#68) ATTORNEY, Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3326 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3315 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3327 Shenghao Stan Chiueh for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3290 , [ # 67 ], ADDED.[2979089] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, 20-3290, Marc S Kirschner and Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, FILED. Service date 11/20/2020 by CM/ECF. [2979066] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 11/20/2020 01:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3290, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335 Brief due date as 01/22/2021. Joint Appendix due date as 01/22/2021, FILED.[2967292] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 11/04/2020 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) NEW CASE MANAGER, Wilson Dudley, ASSIGNED.[2967218] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 11/04/2020 09:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust, FILED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2958889] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, 20-3290, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, informing Court of proposed due date 01/22/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF.[2958829] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335] [Entered: 10/23/2020 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice, Counsel is directed to register as a Filing User under Local Rule 25.1 to file documents electronically in this case within three (3) days of the date of this order. [ # 46 ] filed by Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust, by WJN, FILED. [2958555][59] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/22/2020 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 46 ], on behalf of Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust in 20-3257, 20-3315, FILED. Service date 10/20/2020 by email, CM/ECF.[2956717][55] [20-3257, 20-3315] [Entered: 10/21/2020 03:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 35 ], [ # 49 ], on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED.[2954892] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/19/2020 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954759] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/19/2020 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#15) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Louis E. Fogel for Appellee Peak6 Investments LLC, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2943636] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 08:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#10) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Steven P. Mandell, Esq. for Appellee State Farm Small Cap Index Fund and State Farm Variable Products Trust, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2943120] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#9) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Allison Hudson, Esq. for Appellee HFR Asset Management, L.L.C., orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2943110] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#8) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Timothy Ryan Farrell, Esq. for Appellee Flexshares Morningstar United States Market Factor Tilt Index Fund, Northern Small Cap Core Fund, Northern Small Cap Index Fund and Northern Small Cap Value Fund, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2943093] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTE: See lead case, 20-3257, containing complete set of docket entries.[2943084] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2942909] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, district court receipt # NYSDC-21843621, FILED.[2942870] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/28/2020, RECEIVED.[2942853] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2942848] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, FILED. [2942827] [20-3315] [Entered: 10/01/2020 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series) is a litigant