This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/28/2021 at 20:29:05 (UTC).

In Re: Nine West LBO Securitie

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 In Re Nine West LBO Securitie was filed as a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3290

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Defendants

Prudential Financial, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Harvest Street Capital LLC

Stacey A. Harmon

Roy Chan

KBC Equity Fund - Leisure and Tourism

Investment Managers Series Trust, (Towle Deep Value Fund)

The Hartford Life Insurance Company

Fidelity Concord Street Trust-Fidelity Total Market Index Fund

Defendant NJ-1

MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2, AKA BlackRock MSCI U.S. IMI Index Fund B2

Wisdom Tree Asset Management Inc.

Vincent Morales

Arlene Starr

iShares Russell 3000 ETF

The Arbitrage Fund

State Street Global Advisors Russell Special Small Company Fund

Vanguard Institutional Total Stock Market Index Trust

Virtu Americas LLC

Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series)

DWS Small Cap Index VIP

364 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Philip D. Anker

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Bryan J. Wick Esq.

Attorney at Wick Phillips Gould & Martin LLP

3131 Mckinney Avenue

Dallas, TX 75204

Beth Bivans Petronio

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1717 Main Street

Dallas, TX 75201

Craig G. Florence Esq.

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

2021 Mckinney Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael S. Doluisio Esq.

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Cira Centre, 2929 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19104

Edward A. Friedman Esq.

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Shenghao Stan Chiueh Esq.

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Robert Joel Lack

Attorney at Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

7 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

Brian Raphel Esq.

Attorney at Dechert LLP

3 Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Ross E. Firsenbaum Esq.

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

7 World Trade Center, 250 Greenwich Street

New York, NY 10007

Stephen G. Topetzes Esq.

Attorney at K&L Gates LLP

1601 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Joseph T. Kelleher Esq.

Attorney at Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP

2005 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Joshua D. N. Hess Esq.

Attorney at Dechert LLP

1900 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Steven D. Jerome Esq.

Attorney at Snell & Wilmer L.L.P.

1 Arizona Center, 400 East Van Buren Street

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Ryan Lapine Esq.

Attorney at Diamond McCarthy LLP

333 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Allan B. Diamond

Attorney at Diamond McCarthy LLP

295 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#95

#81

#75

#74

#59

#241

#232

#230

#229

#228

#227

#212

#211

#210

#209

#154

#146

#205

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 03/19/2021, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, RECEIVED. Service date 03/19/2021 by CM/ECF.[3059916] [20-3290] [Entered: 03/19/2021 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Jagdeep S. Bhandari, Peter V. Marchetti, Esq. and Stephen McJohn , FILED. Service date 03/15/2021 by CM/ECF. [3056019] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998]--[Edited 03/15/2021 by WD] [Entered: 03/15/2021 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#88) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Movant Jagdeep S. Bhandari, Peter V. Marchetti, Stephen Michael McJohn, FILED. Service date 03/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3055594] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998]--[Edited 03/15/2021 by WD] [Entered: 03/12/2021 07:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Heather Harlan and George Sharp in 20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, Appellee Heather Harlan and George Sharp in 20-3941, 20-3981, FILED. Service date 03/10/2021 by CM/ECF. [3052913] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 03/10/2021 11:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Brief and Special Appendix for Plaintiffs-Appellants and one copy of the Joint Appendix Volumes I & II, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3290, Marc S Kirschner and Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3327, 20-3941, 20-3952, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF.[3050292] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 03/05/2021 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) BRIEF & SPECIAL APPENDIX, on behalf of Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Marc S Kirschner in 20-3257, 20-3290, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF, email. [3050238] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 2 of 2, (pp. 296-591), on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, 20-3290, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3050230] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 2, (pp. 1-295), on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3257, 20-3290, Appellant Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3315, 20-3326, Appellant Marc S Kirschner in 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998, FILED. Service date 03/05/2021 by CM/ECF, email.[3050228] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3315, 20-3326, 20-3327, 20-3334, 20-3335, 20-3941, 20-3952, 20-3959, 20-3961, 20-3964, 20-3969, 20-3980, 20-3981, 20-3992, 20-3998] [Entered: 03/05/2021 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) ATTORNEY, Allan B. Diamond for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB Marc S Kirschner, in case 20-3290 , [ # 81 ], ADDED.[3045165] [20-3290] [Entered: 02/26/2021 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner, FILED. Service date 02/26/2021 by CM/ECF. [3045111] [20-3290] [Entered: 02/26/2021 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HBK Master Fund L.P., HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund LP, AQR Absolute Return Master Account, L.P., AQR Delta Master Account, L.P., AQR Delta Sapphire Fund, L.P., AQR DELTA XN Master Account, L.P., AQR Funds-AQR Multi-Strategy Alternative Fund, CNH Master Account, L.P., CNH Opportunistic Premium Offshore Fund, L.P. and AQR Funds in 20-3257, Appellee HBK Master Fund L.P. and HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund LP in 20-3290, Appellee AQR Absolute Return Master Account, L.P., AQR Delta Master Account, L.P., AQR Delta Sapphire Fund, L.P., AQR DELTA XN Master Account, L.P., AQR Funds-AQR Multi-Strategy Alternative Fund, CNH Master Account, L.P. and CNH Opportunistic Premium Offshore Fund, L.P. in 20-3326, Appellee AQR Funds in 20-3327, FILED. Service date 10/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2947140] [20-3257, 20-3290, 20-3326, 20-3327] [Entered: 10/07/2020 12:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HBK Master Fund L.P. and HBK Quantitative Strategies Master Fund LP, FILED. Service date 10/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2947100] [20-3290] [Entered: 10/07/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTE: See lead case, 20-3257, containing complete set of docket entries.[2942978] [20-3290] [Entered: 10/01/2020 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#10) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Craig G. Florence, Esq. for Appellee DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 1 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Micro Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Small Cap Value Portfolio, Dimensional Funds PLC Global Targeted Value Fund, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Targeted Value Portfolio, DFA Australia Limited Global Core Equity Trust, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc TA US Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Small Cap Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc Tax-Managed US Targeted Value Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Social Core Equity 2 Portfolio, DFA Investment Dimensions Group Inc US Vector Equity Portfolio, DFA Investment Trust Company Tax-Managed US Marketwide Value Series, DFA US Core Equity Fund, DFA US Vector Equity Fund, Micro Cap Subtrust, Small Cap Value Subtrust, Tax-Managed US Equity Series, U.S. Small Cap Subtrust and Dimensional Funds plc U.S. Small Companies Fund,, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2942295] [20-3290] [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • Docket(#9) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney Bryan J. Wick, Esq. for Appellee Kenny Allan Troutt Separate Trust Estate, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2942294] [20-3290] [Entered: 10/01/2020 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2941932] [20-3290] [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, district court receipt # NYSDC-21843403, FILED.[2941922] [20-3290] [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 08/28/2020, RECEIVED.[2941903] [20-3290] [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 08/27/2020, RECEIVED.[2941893] [20-3290] [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Marc S Kirschner and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB in 20-3290, FILED. [2941872] [20-3290, 20-3257] [Entered: 09/30/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quantitative Master Series LLC, (Master Extended Market Index Series) is a litigant