This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/07/2019 at 06:02:21 (UTC).

In re: NewStarcom Holdings Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 In re NewStarcom Holdings Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-3096

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Debtor / Appellees and Debtors

NSC HOLDINGS INC

In re: NEWSTARCOM HOLDINGS INC

PORT CITY ELECTRIC CO

CONSTAR INTERNATIONAL INC

KENNETH ELLIOTT

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

AMERICAN CAPITAL LTD

GORDON O'BRIEN

STEVEN PRICE

MARK FIKSE

CRAIG MOORE

ANN M. BARBER

MATCO ELECTRIC CORP, FKA Matco Associates Inc

MARK FREIJE

Trustee

GEORGE L. MILLER, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of NewStarcom Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor / Appellee and Debtor Attorneys

Christopher P. Simon Esq.

Attorney at Cross & Simon

1105 North Market Street, Suite 901, P.O. Box 1380

Wilmington, DE 19899

Kevin S. Mann Esq.

Attorney at Cross & Simon

1105 North Market Street, Suite 901, P.O. Box 1380

Wilmington, DE 19899

Benjamin W. Keenan Esq.

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, P.O. Box 1150, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

Ricardo Palacio Esq.

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, P.O. Box 1150, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

Daniel R. Norton Esq.

Attorney at Hinman Howard & Kattell

80 Exchange Street, 700 Security Mutual Building

Binghamton, NY 13902

Amy Shapiro Esq.

Attorney at Hinman Howard & Kattell

80 Exchange Street, 700 Security Mutual Building

Binghamton, NY 13902

Debtor / Appellee and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Benjamin W. Keenan Esq.

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, P.O. Box 1150, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

Ricardo Palacio Esq.

Attorney at Ashby & Geddes

500 Delaware Avenue, P.O. Box 1150, 8Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19899

Daniel R. Norton Esq.

Attorney at Hinman Howard & Kattell

80 Exchange Street, 700 Security Mutual Building

Binghamton, NY 13902

Amy Shapiro Esq.

Attorney at Hinman Howard & Kattell

80 Exchange Street, 700 Security Mutual Building

Binghamton, NY 13902

Trustee Attorneys

Steven M. Coren Esq.

Attorney at Kaufman Coren & Ress

2001 Market Street, Two Commerce Square, Suite 3900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

William J. Burnett Esq.

Attorney at Flaster Greenberg

1201 North Orange Street, Suite 301

Wilmington, DE 19801

Douglas E. Ress Esq.

Attorney at Kaufman Coren & Ress

2001 Market Street, Two Commerce Square, Suite 3900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Francis X. Lane Esq.

Attorney at Kaufman Coren & Ress

2001 Market Street, Two Commerce Square, Suite 3900

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Instructions

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Notice of Assignment

Open Document #2

certificate of service

Open Document #1

Appearance Form

Open Document

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Corporate Disclosure Statement

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Appearance Form

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document #1

Appearance Form

Open Document #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement EXHIBITS

Open Document #1

Corporate Disclosure Statement

Open Document #2

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

Open Document #1

Transcript Purchase Order Form

Open Document #3

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

Open Document #2

ATTACHMENTS

Open Document #1

Concise Summary of the Case

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (SY) [Entered: 11/15/2019 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Amy Shapiro on behalf of Appellee(s) Matco Electric Corporation, Mark Freije, Kenneth Elliott and Anne M. Barber. [19-3096] (AS) [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Kevin S. Mann, Esq. for Constar International Inc, NewStarcom Holdings Inc, NSC Holdings Inc and Port City Electric Co and Christopher P. Simon, Esq. for Constar International Inc, NewStarcom Holdings Inc, NSC Holdings Inc and Port City Electric Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 11/12/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 11/12/2019. (MB) [Entered: 10/28/2019 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Matco Electric Corp, filed. [19-3096] (BWK) [Entered: 10/22/2019 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Benjamin W. Keenan on behalf of Appellee(s) Matco Electric Corporation, Mark Freije, Kenneth Elliott and Anne M. Barber. [19-3096] (BWK) [Entered: 10/22/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ricardo Palacio on behalf of Appellee(s) Matco Electric Corporation, Mark Freije, Kenneth Elliott and Anne M. Barber. [19-3096] (RP) [Entered: 10/22/2019 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant George L. Miller, filed. [19-3096] (FXL) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant George L. Miller advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-3096] (FXL) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant George L. Miller, received. [19-3096] (FXL) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant George L. Miller, filed. [19-3096] (FXL) [Entered: 10/21/2019 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from FRANCIS X. LANE on behalf of Appellant(s) George L. Miller, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of NewStarcom Holdings, Inc., et al.. [19-3096] (FXL) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from DOUGLAS EVAN RESS on behalf of Appellant(s) George L. Miller, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of NewStarcom Holdings, Inc., et al.. [19-3096] (DER) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from STEVEN M. COREN on behalf of Appellant(s) George L. Miller, as Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of NewStarcom Holdings, Inc., et al.. [19-3096] (SMC) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (MB) [Entered: 10/08/2019 03:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant George L. Miller in District Court No. 1-17-cv-00309. (MB) [Entered: 10/08/2019 03:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN CAPITAL ENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Port City Co., LLC dba St. Joseph's Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas E. Ress Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William J. Burnett Esq.