This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/27/2020 at 06:04:17 (UTC).

In re: Neomedic Pelvic

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 In re Neomedic Pelvic was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2170

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Appellant

LANA C. KEETON

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Not Classified By Court

In re: NEOMEDIC PELVIC REPAIR SYSTEM PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Defendant / Appellees

NEOMEDIC INTERNATIONAL

NEOMEDIC, INC.

NEOMEDIC INTERNATIONAL SL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Lana C. Keeton

901 Pennsylvania Avenue

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Carolyn Purwin

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER

450 Sentry Parkway

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Lindsay N. Clifton

Attorney at HURLEY LAW OFFICE

5400 Glenwood Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27612

James E. Looper

Attorney at HALL BOOTH SMITH

611 Commerce Street

Nashville, TN 37209

Ernest F. Koschineg

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER

450 Sentry Parkway

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Heather D. Piper

Attorney at HALL BOOTH SMITH

611 Commerce Street

Nashville, TN 37209

Cy A. Hill Jr.

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER

500 Lee Street East

Charleston, WV 25301

Michael D. Hutchens

Attorney at MEAGHER & GEER, PLLP

4200 Multifoods Tower, 33 South 6Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

William Robert Pringle

Attorney at CHRISTIAN & SMALL, LLP

505 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35226

Emily L. Mugaas

Attorney at MEAGHER & GEER, PLLP

4200 Multifoods Tower, 33 South 6Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Jon R. Russell

Attorney at MEAGHER & GEER, PLLP

4200 Multifoods Tower, 33 South 6Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402-0000

Michael C. Hurley Sr.

Attorney at YATES, MCLAMB & WEYHER, LLP

P. O. Box 2889

Raleigh, NC 27602-2889

Katherine Leigh Jones

Attorney at HURLEY LAW OFFICE

5400 Glenwood Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27612

 

Court Documents

21 #13

Additional Document

21 #12

Additional Document

21 #11

Additional Document

21 #10

Additional Document

21 #9

Additional Document

21 #8

Additional Document

21 #7

Additional Document

21 #6

Additional Document

21 #5

Additional Document

21 #4

Additional Document

21 #3

Additional Document

21 #2

Additional Document

21 #1

Informal appendix

#20

19 #6

Additional Document

19 #5

Additional Document

19 #4

Additional Document

19 #3

Additional Document

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) INFORMAL APPENDIX by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 12/03/2020 11:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DOCUMENT referencing [ # 5 ] Record - ADDITIONAL RECORD ON APPEAL BY LANA C. KEETON by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. [1000855334] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 11/29/2020 09:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000855333] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 11/29/2020 09:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ]. Number of days granted: 10. Informal Opening Brief due 12/03/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000853900] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 11/24/2020 08:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170 to extend filing time for informal opening brief until Thursday, December 3, 2020.. Date and method of service: 11/23/2020 ecf. [1000853656] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 11/23/2020 05:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • Docket(#10) (PARTIAL) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed (pleadings 220-294). Originating case number: 2:14-md-02511. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-2170] MR [Entered: 11/18/2020 01:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice issued re: [ # 3 ] initial notice, [ # 4 ] briefing order.. . [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:49 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1000835008-2 ] case , [ # 1000836087-2 ] case , [ # 1000836857-2 ] case , [ # 1000837196-2 ] case , [ # 1000837571-2 ] case , [ # 1000837796-2 ] case , [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 2:10-md-02187, 2:12-md-02325, 2:12-md-02326, 2:12-md-02327, 2:12-md-02387, 2:13-md-02440, 2:14-md-02511. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:41 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption.. [20-2170] MR [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PARTIAL RECORD (pleadings 220-294) requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/09/2020 [20-2170] MR [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RECORDS requested from Clerk of Court in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. Due: 11/12/2020. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 10/29/2020 10:10 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 11/23/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 10/29/2020 10:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170 - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/30/2020 Originating case number: 2:10-md-02187. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, and 20-2170 with 20-2139.. Copies to all parties.. [1000838551] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:54 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:14-md-02511. Case manager: MRadday. [20-2170] MR [Entered: 10/28/2020 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Neomedic is a litigant

Latest cases where Neomedic International, S.L. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon R Russell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D Hutchens