This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2019 at 06:00:25 (UTC).

In re: Navy Chaplaincy

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 In re Navy Chaplaincy was filed as a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5204

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Furniss Harkness

Michael Belt

James M. Weibling

Martha Carson

George P. Byrum

Barby Earl Wilson

All Adair Plaintiffs

Ray A. Bailey

Richard L. Arnold

All Chaplain/Full Gospel Plaintiffs

Denise Y. Merritt

John Witherspoon

All Gibson Plaintiffs

Defendant / Appellees

Richard V. Spencer, Secretary of the U.S. Navy

Brent W. Scott, Rear Admiral, Chief of Chaplains

United States Navy

John B. Nowell, Vice Admiral, Chief of Naval Personnel

Secretary of the Navy

Plaintiff / Appellant

Associated Gospel Churches

In Re

In re: Navy Chaplaincy

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee and Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Arthur Andrew Schulcz Sr.

Attorney at Chaplain's Counsel, PLLC

21043 Honeycreeper Place

Leesburg, VA 20175

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Marleigh D. Dover

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Sushma Soni

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE [1805002] Appellants Will Not File a Dispositive Motion filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 [Service Date: 09/04/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 09/04/2019 05:00 PM]

Open Document

REPLY [1804526] filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 to response [ # 1803677-2 ] [Service Date: 09/02/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1921 words. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 09/02/2019 11:56 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1803764] for motion for other relief [ # 1803535-2 ] filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/26/2019 07:38 PM]

Open Document

RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1803677] to motion [ # 1803535-2 ] filed by Deputy Chief of Chaplains, John B. Nowell, Brent W. Scott, Secretary of the Navy, Richard V. Spencer and United States Navy in 19-5204, 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/26/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 499. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:00 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1803535] Procedural Motion to Separate Associated Gospel Churches appeal from remaining 54 Navy chaplains filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Richard L. Arnold, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 (Service Date: 08/23/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 7 pages (including Certificateof Service). [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:56 PM]

Open Document #4

Initial Statement of Issues to be Raised

Open Document #3

Addendum 2 to Docketing Stmt

Open Document #2

Addendum 1 to Docket Stmt

Open Document #1

Docketing Statement Filed

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1803524] filed by United States Navy, Richard V. Spencer, Secretary of the Navy, Brent W. Scott, John B. Nowell and Deputy Chief of Chaplains in 19-5204, 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 08/23/2019 06:41 PM]

Open Document #4

Transcript Status Report

Open Document #3

Underlying Decisions for Review

Open Document #2

No Deferred Index Statement

Open Document #1

Certificate as to Parties, Rulings and Related Cases Filed

Open Document

LETTER [1800342] Correct ECM Party/attorney list and Party filer menu to reflect Notice of Appeal filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright, Chris Xenakis and Ray A. Bailey in 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/01/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:43 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799864] filed by Arthur A. Schulcz Sr. on behalf of Appellants Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206. [19-5206, 19-5204] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:35 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799858] filed by Arthur A. Schulcz Sr. on behalf of Appellant Associated Gospel Churches. [19-5204] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:03 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799179] filed by Sushma Soni and co-counsel Marleigh Dover on behalf of Appellees Deputy Chief of Chaplains, John B. Nowell, Brent W. Scott, Secretary of the Navy, Richard V. Spencer and United States Navy in 19-5204, 19-5206. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:27 PM]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1805002] Appellants Will Not File a Dispositive Motion filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 [Service Date: 09/04/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 09/04/2019 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY [1804526] filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 to response [ # 1803677-2 ] [Service Date: 09/02/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 1921 words. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 09/02/2019 11:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1803764] for motion for other relief [ # 1803535-2 ] filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/26/2019 07:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1803677] to motion [ # 1803535-2 ] filed by Deputy Chief of Chaplains, John B. Nowell, Brent W. Scott, Secretary of the Navy, Richard V. Spencer and United States Navy in 19-5204, 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/26/2019 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 499. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 08/26/2019 03:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1803535] Procedural Motion to Separate Associated Gospel Churches appeal from remaining 54 Navy chaplains filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Richard L. Arnold, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 (Service Date: 08/23/2019 by CM/ECF NDA) Length Certification: 7 pages (including Certificateof Service). [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT AND STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1803534] filed by Associated Gospel Churches and Denise Y. Merritt and Daniel E. Roysden in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206]--[Edited 08/26/2019 by LMF] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1803524] filed by United States Navy, Richard V. Spencer, Secretary of the Navy, Brent W. Scott, John B. Nowell and Deputy Chief of Chaplains in 19-5204, 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 08/23/2019 06:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES, DEFERRED APPENDIX STATEMENT, UNDERLYING DECISION AND TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1803511] filed by Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, George P. Byrum, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Larry Farrell, David L. Gibson, Furniss Harkness, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, Denise Y. Merritt, Timothy D. Nall, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Mary Helen Spalding, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Michael A. Wright, All Gibson Plaintiffs and Associated Gospel Churches [Service Date: 08/23/2019 ] [19-5204]--[Edited 08/26/2019 by LMF] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/23/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER [1800342] Correct ECM Party/attorney list and Party filer menu to reflect Notice of Appeal filed by Associated Gospel Churches in 19-5204, Richard L. Arnold, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright, Chris Xenakis and Ray A. Bailey in 19-5206 [Service Date: 08/01/2019 ] [19-5204, 19-5206] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799864] filed by Arthur A. Schulcz Sr. on behalf of Appellants Richard L. Arnold, Ray A. Bailey, Michael Belt, William C. Blair, Rick P. Bradley, George P. Byrum, Andrew Calhoun, Martha Carson, Gregory R. De Marco, Timothy J. Demy, Patrick T. Doney, Joseph E. Dufour, Larry Farrell, Alan Garner, David L. Gibson, John Gordy, Richard F. Hamme, Furniss Harkness, William A. Hatch, Jr., Gary Heinke, Robert L. Hendricks, Frank Johnson, Laurence W. Jones, Samuel David Kirk, Frank Klapach, Thomas G. Klappert, Jan C. Kohlmann, Allen Lancaster, Michael Lavelle, George W. Linzey, James Looby, Jairo Marino, Walker E. Marsh, Jr., Denise Y. Merritt, David Mitchell, Timothy D. Nall, Edith Rene Porter-Stewart, Cynthia Palmer Prince, Rafael J. Quiles, Daniel E. Roysden, Thomas Rush, Lloyd Scott, Mary Helen Spalding, Gary Paul Stewart, Fred A. Thompson, Jr., Glenn Thyrion, Armando Torralva, Thomas R. Watson, James M. Weibling, David S. Wilder, Barby Earl Wilson, Wilson W. Wineman, Michael A. Wright and Chris Xenakis in 19-5206. [19-5206, 19-5204] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 07/30/2019 10:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799858] filed by Arthur A. Schulcz Sr. on behalf of Appellant Associated Gospel Churches. [19-5204] (Schulcz, Arthur) [Entered: 07/30/2019 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1799179] filed by Sushma Soni and co-counsel Marleigh Dover on behalf of Appellees Deputy Chief of Chaplains, John B. Nowell, Brent W. Scott, Secretary of the Navy, Richard V. Spencer and United States Navy in 19-5204, 19-5206. [19-5204, 19-5206] (Soni, Sushma) [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1798897] filed consolidating cases 19-5206 (Consolidation started 07/24/2019) with 19-5204; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/23/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 09/09/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 08/23/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 08/23/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 08/23/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 09/09/2019 [19-5204, 19-5206] [Entered: 07/24/2019 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1798790] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:07-mc-00269-JDB filed by Associated Gospel Churches. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-5204. [19-5204] [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-5204] [Entered: 07/24/2019 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.