This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2021 at 06:54:54 (UTC).

In Re: M/V MSC FLAMINIA

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 In Re M/V MSC FLAMINIA was filed as a Contract - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    18-3083

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crocs Europa Netherlands

Kansai Nerolac Ltd. Bilakhia House

Red Electrica De Espana

ADPO NV

Unilever/TIGI Int. Ltd.

Cray Valley USA Inc.

Angus Chemie GMBH

Hanna Motors

Rayonier, Inc.

Volkswagon Group of America, Inc.

Xchanging Claims

C.H.Robinson Poland S.P ZO.O

JF Hillebrand Mexico SA

JA Lacour Company

Kamin LLC

Phoenix Trading NV

Cooper Tire & Rubber Company

Claimants

Savory Paper (25)

Interforest Terminal Rotterdam SCA

SCA Hygiene Products Russia, LLC

461 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Joseph J. Perrone Esq.

Attorney at Giuliano McDonnell & Perrone, LLP

170 Old Country Road

Mineola, NY 11501

Brian Bosworth Esq.

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

125 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

James E. Ryan Esq.

Attorney at Dougherty Ryan Giuffra Zambito & Hession

250 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10177

Joseph L. Clasen Esq.

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

1055 Washington Boulevard

Stamford, CT 06901

Nicholas D. Stellakis Esq.

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

60 State Street

Boston, MA 02109

Timothy Semenoro Esq.

Attorney at Montgomery, McCracken, Walker & Rhoads, LLP

437 Madison Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Peter Knight Esq.

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

280 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

James W. Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Ricci Tyrrell Johnson & Grey

1515 Market Street

Phildadelphia, PA 19102

Lawrence K. DeMeo Esq.

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

125 High Street

Boston, MA 02110

Eugene J. O'Connor Esq.

Attorney at Chalos O'Connor, LLP

366 Main Street

Port Washington, NY 11050

 

Court Documents

#34

No Description Available

#255

No Description Available

#252

No Description Available

#174

No Description Available

165 #7

Supporting Document

165 #3

Supporting Document

157 #5

Supporting Document

156 #8

Supporting Document

155 #10

Supporting Document

155 #9

Supporting Document

149 #8

Supporting Document

141 #3

Supporting Document

136 #3

Supporting Document

136 #2

Supporting Document

#133

No Description Available

#128

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#39

No Description Available

283 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#320) CASE, before DC, SLC, SJM, HEARD.[2840316] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 05/15/2020 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#319) SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, to withdraw certain appellees, FILED.[2827495] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 04/28/2020 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#315) MOTION ORDER, denying motion to adjourn oral argument [ # 2813782-2 ] filed by Appellant Stolt Nielsen USA, Inc. and Stolt Tank Containers B.V. in 18-2974, FILED. [2815849][315] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 04/08/2020 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#313) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to adjourn oral argument [ # 2813782-2 ], on behalf of Appellee MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. in 18-2974, FILED. Service date 04/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2815013] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 04/06/2020 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#310) ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [2811113] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 03/31/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#309) CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 05/15/2020, B Panel, SET.[2801632] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 03/13/2020 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#304) CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/11/2020,PANELB, PROPOSED.[2789801] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 02/28/2020 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#289) CURED DEFECTIVE Letter, [ # 288 ], on behalf of Appellant Deltech Corporation in 18-2974, FILED.[2769540] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 02/04/2020 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#288) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), [286], on behalf of Appellant Deltech Corporation in 18-2974, 18-3083, FILED.[2769502] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 02/04/2020 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#286) ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Nicholas D. Stellakis, Esq. for Appellant Deltech Corporation in 18-2974, 18-3083, FILED. Service date 02/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2769310] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 02/04/2020 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
178 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • Docket(#11) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Stolt Nielsen USA, Inc. and Stolt Tank Containers BV in 18-2974, FILED. Service date 10/23/2018 by CM/ECF.[2416818] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 10/23/2018 04:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Docket(#10) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Stolt Nielsen USA, Inc. and Stolt Tank Containers BV in 18-2974, FILED. Service date 10/23/2018 by CM/ECF.[2416817] [18-2974, 18-3083] [Entered: 10/23/2018 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Docket(#8) NOTE: See lead case, 18-2974, containing complete set of docket entries.[2414559] [18-3083, 18-2974] [Entered: 10/19/2018 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2414556] [18-3083] [Entered: 10/19/2018 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Docket(#6) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Deltech Corporation, district court receipt # ANYSDC-15688688, FILED.[2414553] [18-3083] [Entered: 10/19/2018 04:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/10/2018, RECEIVED.[2414548] [18-3083] [Entered: 10/19/2018 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 08/10/2018, RECEIVED.[2414543] [18-3083] [Entered: 10/19/2018 04:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT CORRECTED OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/23/2018, RECEIVED.[2414538] [18-3083] [Entered: 10/19/2018 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 07/28/2017, RECEIVED.[2414535] [18-3083] [Entered: 10/19/2018 04:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Deltech Corporation in 18-3083, FILED. [2414525] [18-3083, 18-2974] [Entered: 10/19/2018 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cray Valley USA Inc. is a litigant