This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/28/2023 at 06:29:44 (UTC).

In Re: M/V MSC FLAMINIA

Case Summary

On 05/04/2016 In Re M/V MSC FLAMINIA was filed as a Contract - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-1419

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Claimants

Crocs Europa Netherlands

Hanna Motors

Kansai Nerolac Ltd. Bilakhia House

Red Electrica De Espana

ADPO NV

Unilever/TIGI Int. Ltd.

OOO OMYA URAL

Cray Valley USA Inc.

Angus Chemie GMBH

Arkema Inc.

Claimants and Plaintiffs

Hanna Motors

Red Electrica De Espana

Savory Paper (25)

Interforest Terminal Rotterdam SCA

OOO OMYA URAL

Carolina Cotton Growers Coop.

Cray Valley USA Inc.

Arkema Inc.

Defendants

John Artis Ltd.

Expeditors International of Washington, Inc.

Carlberg Kazakhstan Ltd.

Kostal GMBH

Unitcargo Container Line, Inc.

UTC Overseas GMBH

Vero Marine Insurance

993 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

James E. Ryan Esq.

Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret Esq.

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

#30

#28

#26

#25

#23

#10

#9

#8

#6

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/11/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#37) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 08/11/2016, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1838783] [16-1419] [Entered: 08/11/2016 12:51 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#36) NEW CASE MANAGER, Ahronda Crossman, ASSIGNED.[1838766] [16-1419] [Entered: 08/11/2016 12:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#35) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[1838762] [16-1419] [Entered: 08/11/2016 12:30 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 08/10/2016 by CM/ECF.[1837849] [16-1419] [Entered: 08/10/2016 02:25 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 08/01/2016 by CM/ECF.[1830163] [16-1419] [Entered: 08/01/2016 04:06 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION, Without Prejudice to Reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 07/21/2016 by email, CM/ECF.[1821850] [16-1419] [Entered: 07/21/2016 01:58 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 42.1 Stipulation Status Update, [24], on behalf of Appellant IWONA SIUTA, FILED.[1818212] [16-1419] [Entered: 07/18/2016 02:58 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2016

Docket(#24) LOCAL RULE 42.1 STIPULATION STATUS UPDATE, dated 07/15/2016 , informing the Court of proposed new date for reinstatement, RECEIVED. Service date 07/15/2016 by email.[1817407] [16-1419] [Entered: 07/15/2016 06:40 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) NOTICE, to Appellee Conti 11. Container Schiffahrts-Gmbh & Co. KG MS MSC FLAMINIA and NSB Niederelbe Schiffartsgesellschaft MBH & Co KG , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1814711] [16-1419] [Entered: 07/13/2016 03:18 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2016

Docket(#21) CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Follow-up Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 07/12/2016, Conference Start Time: 8:00 AM (EST). Note: Follow-up, endorsed by Kathleen M. Scanlon, FILED.[1797360] [16-1419] [Entered: 06/20/2016 01:41 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
05/23/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant IWONA SIUTA Brief due date as 08/01/2016. Joint Appendix due date as 08/01/2016, FILED.[1777512] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/23/2016 10:51 AM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) NEW CASE MANAGER, Amit Singh, ASSIGNED.[1775747] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/19/2016 12:33 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant IWONA SIUTA, informing Court of proposed due date 08/01/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 05/17/2016 by email, CM/ECF.[1773836] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/17/2016 02:16 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant IWONA SIUTA, FILED. Service date 05/17/2016 by email, CM/ECF.[1773832] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/17/2016 02:13 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant IWONA SIUTA, FILED. Service date 05/17/2016 by email, CM/ECF.[1773825] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/17/2016 02:06 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant IWONA SIUTA, FILED. Service date 05/17/2016 by email, CM/ECF.[1773797] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/17/2016 01:41 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1773706] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/17/2016 12:57 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant IWONA SIUTA, district court receipt # 0208-12261824, FILED.[1773701] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/17/2016 12:49 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/27/2016, RECEIVED.[1773700] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/17/2016 12:48 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2016
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant IWONA SIUTA, FILED. [1773695] [16-1419] [Entered: 05/17/2016 12:44 PM]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less