This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/26/2020 at 06:10:42 (UTC).

In re Micro Focus Internationa

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 In re Micro Focus Internationa was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3686

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Schmitt

Defendant / Appellees

Silke Scheiber

Darren Roos

Giselle Manon

Amanda Brown

Karen Slatford

Richard Atkins

Micro Focus International PLC

John Schultz

Stephen Murdoch

Mike Phillips

Kevin Loosemore

Nils Brauckmann

Christopher Hsu

Plaintiff / Appellant

Iron Workers Local No. 25 Pension Fund

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Matthew O. Solum Esq.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP

601 Lexington Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Kenneth I. Schacter Esq.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Marc J. Sonnenfeld Esq.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

John David Pernick Esq.

Attorney at Bergeson, LLP

111 North Market Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Daniel John Bergeson Esq.

Attorney at Bergeson, LLP

111 North Market Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

James Abram Harrod Esq.

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#39

34 #2

Supporting Document

34 #1

Motion for removal from Expedited Appeals Calendar FILED

#32

#31

#29

#25

#24

#23

#11

#10

#9

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION ORDER, granting motion for the removal of this matter from this Courts Expedited Appeals Calendar and requests that the Court set a deadline of 02/04/2021 for the opening brief, [ # 34 ] filed by Appellant Iron Workers Local No. 25 Pension Fund, by JON, FILED. [2986641][39] [20-3686] [Entered: 12/04/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Iron Workers Local No. 25 Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 11/27/2020 by CM/ECF. [2982610] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/27/2020 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ATTORNEY, Marc J. Sonnenfeld for John Schultz, in case 20-3686 , [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2980402] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/23/2020 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee John Schultz, FILED. Service date 11/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2980156] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/23/2020 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 12/28/2020, appellee's brief due date as 02/01/2021,TRANSMITTED.[2978920] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/20/2020 11:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NEW CASE MANAGER, Jasmine Beard, ASSIGNED.[2978491] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/19/2020 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Iron Workers Local No. 25 Pension Fund, informing Court of proposed due date 02/04/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 11/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2978037] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/19/2020 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Christopher Hsu, FILED. Service date 11/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2976734] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/17/2020 07:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Christopher Hsu, FILED. Service date 11/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2975211] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice, Counsel is directed to register as a Filing User under Local Rule 25.1 to file documents electronically in this case within three (3) days of the date of this order [ # 16 ] [ # 18 ] filed by Appellee Christopher Hsu, by JFB, FILED. [2973685][22] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/13/2020 09:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Iron Workers Local No. 25 Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 11/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2969110] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/05/2020 06:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Iron Workers Local No. 25 Pension Fund, FILED. Service date 11/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2969108] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/05/2020 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee John Schultz, FILED. Service date 11/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2968062] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/04/2020 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Richard Atkins, Nils Brauckmann, Amanda Brown, Kevin Loosemore, Giselle Manon, Micro Focus International PLC, Stephen Murdoch, Mike Phillips, Darren Roos, Silke Scheiber and Karen Slatford, FILED. Service date 11/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2967393] [20-3686] [Entered: 11/04/2020 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docket(#6) NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY, Attorney John David Pernick, Esq. for Appellee Christopher Hsu, orally informed to apply for admission forthwith and submit Addendum A to Notice of Appearance, NOTIFIED.[2962789] [20-3686] [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2962788] [20-3686] [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Iron Workers Local No. 25 Pension Fund, district court receipt # ANYSDC-22326498, FILED.[2962787] [20-3686] [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/30/2020, RECEIVED.[2962786] [20-3686] [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 09/29/2020, RECEIVED.[2962782] [20-3686] [Entered: 10/28/2020 07:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Iron Workers Local No. 25 Pension Fund, FILED. [2962771] [20-3686] [Entered: 10/28/2020 07:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Micro Focus LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Iron Workers Local 11 Pension Fund is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Abram Harrod, III