This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 06:05:46 (UTC).

In re: Lori Saxon

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 In re Lori Saxon was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7039

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

Lori Saxon

Washington, DC 20001

In Re

In the Matter of: Lori Saxon

937 N Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and In Re Attorney

Lori Saxon

937 N Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1795713] filed considering motion to extend time [ # 1794935-2 ]; suspending briefing schedule [ # 1786245-5 ] pending further order of the court.[19-7039] [Entered: 07/03/2019 01:58 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1795442] received from Lori Saxon [signed for on 06/25/2019] for order [1793515-2] sent to Appellant Lori Saxon [19-7039] [Entered: 07/02/2019 12:27 PM]

Open Document

MOTION [1794935] to extend time to file brief filed by Lori Saxon [Service Date: 06/27/2019 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-7039] [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:54 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1793506] filed removing case from abeyance; directing party to file payment of docketing fee: APPELLANT payment of docketing fee due 07/19/2019; directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis: APPELLANT motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court due 07/19/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-7039] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:34 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE [1793496] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is denied [Case Number 19-7039: IFP Denied USDC] [19-7039] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:18 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1792578] filed referring motion ifp [ # 1791733-2 ] to the district court for consideration, holding case in abeyance. Case 19-7039 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:17cv2607-TSC from U.S. District Court. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original motion to the district court. [19-7039] [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:10 AM]

Open Document

MOTION [1791733] to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis [Case Number 19-7039: IFP Pending USCA] filed by Lori Saxon [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-7039] [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:12 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1791701] received from Lori Saxon [signed for on 05/10/2019] for order [1786247-2] sent to Appellant Lori Saxon [19-7039] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:06 PM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1786245] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/25/2019. APPENDIX due 06/25/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:46 PM]

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1786232] submitted by Lori Saxon [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:24 PM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1786231] filed by Lori Saxon [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:23 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786227] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02607-TSC filed by Lori Saxon. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7039. [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:19 PM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1795713] filed considering motion to extend time [ # 1794935-2 ]; suspending briefing schedule [ # 1786245-5 ] pending further order of the court.[19-7039] [Entered: 07/03/2019 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1795442] received from Lori Saxon [signed for on 06/25/2019] for order [1793515-2] sent to Appellant Lori Saxon [19-7039] [Entered: 07/02/2019 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1794935] to extend time to file brief filed by Lori Saxon [Service Date: 06/27/2019 ] Length Certification: 3 pages. [19-7039] [Entered: 06/27/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • CERTIFIED MAIL and FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [1793515] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7007 0710 0004 7196 8474] of order [ # 1793506-3 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 07/19/2019 from Lori Saxon. [19-7039] [Entered: 06/19/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1793506] filed removing case from abeyance; directing party to file payment of docketing fee: APPELLANT payment of docketing fee due 07/19/2019; directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis: APPELLANT motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court due 07/19/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-7039] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE [1793496] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court is denied [Case Number 19-7039: IFP Denied USDC] [19-7039] [Entered: 06/19/2019 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1792578] filed referring motion ifp [ # 1791733-2 ] to the district court for consideration, holding case in abeyance. Case 19-7039 held in abeyance pending decision in 1:17cv2607-TSC from U.S. District Court. The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order and the original motion to the district court. [19-7039] [Entered: 06/13/2019 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION [1791733] to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis [Case Number 19-7039: IFP Pending USCA] filed by Lori Saxon [Service Date: 06/07/2019 ] Length Certification: 7 pages. [19-7039] [Entered: 06/07/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT [1791701] received from Lori Saxon [signed for on 05/10/2019] for order [1786247-2] sent to Appellant Lori Saxon [19-7039] [Entered: 06/07/2019 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • FIRST CLASS AND CERTIFIED MAIL SENT [1786247] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.7016 3010 0000 2295 2828] of order [ # 1786242-5 ], [ # 1786245-5 ]. Certified Mail Receipt due 06/05/2019 from Lori Saxon. [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1786245] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/25/2019. APPENDIX due 06/25/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1786242] filed directing party to file motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis or payment of docketing fee. APPELLANT payment of docketing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis in district court due 06/05/2019. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1786232] submitted by Lori Saxon [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1786231] filed by Lori Saxon [Service Date: 05/06/2019 ] [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1786227] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:17-cv-02607-TSC filed by Lori Saxon. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7039. [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • PRIVATE BANKRUPTCY CASE docketed. [19-7039] [Entered: 05/06/2019 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.