This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/14/2020 at 05:42:41 (UTC).

In re: Kirilichin

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 In re Kirilichin was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1168

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

BRIAN P. KRIEGER

In re: VICTOR KIRILICHIN

DAVID P. TURECHEK

Appellee

ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Gene Stanley Winter

Attorney at St. Onge Steward Johnston & Reens, LLC

986 Bedford Street

Stamford, CT 06905

Appellee Attorney

Thomas W. Krause

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • Docket(#2) Filing fee paid. Fee Amount: $500.00. Receipt Number: A13-34859-705. [734408] [21-1168] [Gene Winter] [Entered: 11/09/2020 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 10/26/2020. [734213] Fee/IFP due on 11/20/2020. Entry of Appearance is due 11/20/2020. Certificate of Interest is due 11/20/2020. Docketing Statement is due 12/07/2020. Certified List is due 12/16/2020. [KMH] [Entered: 11/06/2020 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREI IANCU, Director, U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Krause