This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/03/2022 at 06:02:08 (UTC).

In re: Kimberly Bruce

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 In re Kimberly Bruce was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1000

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellee

Kimberly Bruce, Debtor and Plaintiff on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, AKA Kimberly A. Bruce, AKA Kimberly Antrell Bruce

Trustee

U.S. Trustee

Defendant / Appellants

Citigroup Inc.

Citibank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

George F. Carpinello

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

30 South Pearl Street

Albany, NY 12207

Adam R. Shaw Esq.

Attorney at Boies Schiller Flexner LLP

30 South Pearl Street

Albany, NY 12207

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

James R. Horner Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Eamon Paul Joyce

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Jonathan Warren Muenz Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Benjamin R. Nagin Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

787 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE OR DISMISS THE NATIONWIDE CLASS ALLEGATIONS, dated 08/10/2021, RECEIVED.[3309101] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/04/2022 02:44 PM]

#3

(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317266] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:17 AM]

#4

(#6) ATTORNEY, Jonathan Warren Muenz for Citigroup Inc. Citibank, N.A., in case 22-1000, [ # 4 ], ADDED.[3317280] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:24 AM]

#5

(#7) ATTORNEY, James R. Horner for Citigroup Inc. Citibank, N.A., in case 22-1000, [ # 5 ], ADDED.[3317284] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:25 AM]

#9

(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317701] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:46 PM]

#10

(#10) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., informing Court of proposed due date 08/17/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317704] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:47 PM]

#11

(#13) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 11 ], [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED.[3318248] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/19/2022 11:49 AM]

#12

(#13) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 11 ], [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED.[3318248] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/19/2022 11:49 AM]

#22

(#22) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dennisse Pizarro-Lebron, ASSIGNED.[3324409] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 10:52 AM]

#23

(#23) NOTICE, to Appellee Kimberly Bruce, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3324420] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 10:57 AM]

#26

(#26) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc. Brief due date as 08/17/2022. Appendix due date as 08/17/2022, FILED.[3324454] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 11:24 AM]

#27

(#27) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kimberly Bruce, FILED. Service date 06/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3325189] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 09:29 PM]

#28

(#28) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kimberly Bruce, FILED. Service date 06/01/2022 by CM/ECF. [3325190] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 09:40 PM]

#32

(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 06/02/2022 by CM/ECF. [3325504] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/02/2022 12:16 PM]

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ATTORNEY, Benjamin R. Nagin for Citigroup Inc. Citibank, N.A., in case 22-1000, [ # 32 ], ADDED.[3326288] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/03/2022 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 06/02/2022 by CM/ECF. [3325504] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/02/2022 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ATTORNEY, Adam R. Shaw for Kimberly Bruce, in case 22-1000, [ # 28 ], ADDED.[3325343] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/02/2022 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Kimberly Bruce, FILED. Service date 06/01/2022 by CM/ECF. [3325190] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 09:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Kimberly Bruce, FILED. Service date 06/01/2022 by CM/ECF.[3325189] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 09:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc. Brief due date as 08/17/2022. Appendix due date as 08/17/2022, FILED.[3324454] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE, to Appellee Kimberly Bruce, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[3324420] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NEW CASE MANAGER, Dennisse Pizarro-Lebron, ASSIGNED.[3324409] [22-1000] [Entered: 06/01/2022 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Docket(#14) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., district court receipt # 207532, FILED.[3321679] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/26/2022 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C [ # 11 ], [ # 12 ], on behalf of Appellant Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED.[3318248] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/19/2022 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., informing Court of proposed due date 08/17/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317704] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317701] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • Docket(#8) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317695] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY, James R. Horner for Citigroup Inc. Citibank, N.A., in case 22-1000, [ # 5 ], ADDED.[3317284] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY, Jonathan Warren Muenz for Citigroup Inc. Citibank, N.A., in case 22-1000, [ # 4 ], ADDED.[3317280] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF. [3317277] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF. [3317272] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Citigroup Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2022 by CM/ECF.[3317266] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/18/2022 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER DENYING IN PART AND GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO STRIKE OR DISMISS THE NATIONWIDE CLASS ALLEGATIONS, dated 08/10/2021, RECEIVED.[3309101] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/04/2022 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. [3309088] [22-1000] [Entered: 05/04/2022 02:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Warren Muenz