This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/07/2023 at 06:07:37 (UTC).

In re: Kathleen Wilkinson, et al v. Facebook, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 In re Kathleen Wilkinson, filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Facebook, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16888

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

In re: FACEBOOK SIMULATED CASINO-STYLE GAMES LITIGATION

Plaintiff / Appellees

KATHLEEN WILKINSON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

NANCY URBANCZYK, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

LAURA PERKINSON, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

MARIA VALENCIA-TORRES, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

MARY AUSTIN, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

PATRICIA MCCULLOUGH, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

ALISON KODA, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

GLENNA WIEGARD

CLOTERA ROGERS, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

CAROL SMITH, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

HANNELORE BOORN, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

JANICE WILLIAMS, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

JENNIFER ANDREWS, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

DAWN MEHSIKOMER, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

DENISE WAX, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

FRANCES LONG, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

SANDRA MEYERS, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

STEVE SIMONS, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

VANESSA SOWELL SKEETER, individually, and on behalf of the proposed classes

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Jason Henry Alperstein

Attorney at Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert

One West Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Glenn Chappell

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei, LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 1010

Washington, DC 20006

Gregory Scott Dovel

Attorney at DOVEL & LUNER, LLP

201 Santa Monica Boulevard

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Jay Edelson

Attorney at Edelson P.C.

350 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60654

Philip Lawrence Fraietta

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, PA

888 7Th Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Rafey S. Balabanian

Attorney at Edelson, PC

150 California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Wesley W. Barnett

Attorney at DAVIS & NORRIS, LLP

2154 Highland Avenue, South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Andrea R. Gold

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei, LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 1010

Washington, DC 20006

Cecily Jordan

Attorney at Tousley Brain Stephens, PLLC

1200 5Th Avenue, Suite 1700

Seattle, WA 98101

Todd Logan

Attorney at Edelson, PC

150 California Street, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jill M. Manning

Attorney at Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP

555 Montgomery Street, Suite 1205

San Francisco, CA 94111

John E. Norris

Attorney at DAVIS & NORRIS, LLP

2154 Highland Avenue, South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Alexander Glenn Tievsky

Attorney at Edelson P.C.

350 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60654

Dargan Maner Ware

Attorney at DAVIS & NORRIS, LLP

2154 Highland Avenue, South

Birmingham, AL 35205

Daniel Leon Warshaw Esquire

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Melissa S. Weiner

Attorney at Pearson Simon & Warshaw, LLP

328 Barry Avenue, S, Suite 200

Wayzata, MN 55391

Sarah N. Westcot

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

701 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1420

Miami, FL 10019

Hassan Zavareei

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei, LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 1010

Washington, DC 20006

Other Attorneys

Christopher Chorba

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Patrick James Fuster

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

333 S Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

#2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

2 #3

Mediation Letter

2 #4

Mediation Questionnaire

2 #5

Case Opening Packet

3 #1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

3 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#3

Cross Appeal Chart

3 #4

Mediation Letter

3 #5

Mediation Questionnaire

3 #6

Case Opening Packet

#4

(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Facebook, Inc. in 22-16888, Appellee Facebook, Inc. in 22-16889 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/16/2022. [12612874] [22-16888, 22-16889] (Chorba, Christopher) [Entered: 12/16/2022 03:25 PM]

#7

(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/18/2023, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12614420] [22-16888, 22-16889] (CL) [Entered: 12/19/2022 05:03 PM]

#9

(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellees Jennifer Andrews, Mary Austin, Hannelore Boorn, Alison Koda, Ben Kramer, Paul Lombard, Frances Long, Patricia McCullough, Dawn Mehsikomer, Sandra Meyers, Sheri Miller, Eleanor Mizrahi, Laura Perkinson, Clotera Rogers, Steve Simons, Carol Smith, Vanessa Sowell Skeeter, Nancy Urbanczyk, Maria Valencia-Torres, Denise Wax, Donna Whiting, Glenna Wiegard, Kathleen Wilkinson, Janice Williams and Janice Wilson in 22-16888, Appellants Jennifer Andrews, Mary Austin, Hannelore Boorn, Alison Koda, Ben Kramer, Paul Lombard, Frances Long, Patricia McCullough, Dawn Mehsikomer, Sandra Meyers, Sheri Miller, Eleanor Mizrahi, Laura Perkinson, Clotera Rogers, Steve Simons, Carol Smith, Vanessa Sowell Skeeter, Nancy Urbanczyk, Maria Valencia-Torres, Denise Wax, Donna Whiting, Glenna Wiegard, Kathleen Wilkinson, Janice Williams and Janice Wilson in 22-16889 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/21/2022. [12616137] [22-16888, 22-16889] (Tievsky, Alexander) [Entered: 12/21/2022 07:18 PM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • Docket(#10) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/21/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12616150]. [22-16888] (AD) [Entered: 12/22/2022 06:44 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Appellees Jennifer Andrews, Mary Austin, Hannelore Boorn, Alison Koda, Ben Kramer, Paul Lombard, Frances Long, Patricia McCullough, Dawn Mehsikomer, Sandra Meyers, Sheri Miller, Eleanor Mizrahi, Laura Perkinson, Clotera Rogers, Steve Simons, Carol Smith, Vanessa Sowell Skeeter, Nancy Urbanczyk, Maria Valencia-Torres, Denise Wax, Donna Whiting, Glenna Wiegard, Kathleen Wilkinson, Janice Williams and Janice Wilson in 22-16888, Appellants Jennifer Andrews, Mary Austin, Hannelore Boorn, Alison Koda, Ben Kramer, Paul Lombard, Frances Long, Patricia McCullough, Dawn Mehsikomer, Sandra Meyers, Sheri Miller, Eleanor Mizrahi, Laura Perkinson, Clotera Rogers, Steve Simons, Carol Smith, Vanessa Sowell Skeeter, Nancy Urbanczyk, Maria Valencia-Torres, Denise Wax, Donna Whiting, Glenna Wiegard, Kathleen Wilkinson, Janice Williams and Janice Wilson in 22-16889 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/21/2022. [12616137] [22-16888, 22-16889] (Tievsky, Alexander) [Entered: 12/21/2022 07:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • Docket(#8) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee in Cross Appeal 22-16889 only, by Plaintiff-Appellees Cross Appellants. Amount Paid: USD 505.00. Date paid: 12/20/2022. [12615278] [22-16889, 22-16888] (RT) [Entered: 12/20/2022 04:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - DIAL-IN Assessment Conference, 01/18/2023, 11:00 a.m. PACIFIC Time. The briefing schedule previously set by the court remains in effect. See order for instructions and details. [12614420] [22-16888, 22-16889] (CL) [Entered: 12/19/2022 05:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • Docket(#6) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee for appeal no. 22-16888. Amount Paid: 505.00 USD . Date paid: 12/13/2022. [12613690] [22-16888, 22-16889] (RT) [Entered: 12/19/2022 10:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • Docket(#5) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 12/16/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12613153]. [22-16888] (AD) [Entered: 12/16/2022 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Facebook, Inc. in 22-16888, Appellee Facebook, Inc. in 22-16889 Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/16/2022. [12612874] [22-16888, 22-16889] (Chorba, Christopher) [Entered: 12/16/2022 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting cross-appeal briefing schedule as follows: Appellants Jennifer Andrews, Mary Austin, Hannelore Boorn, Alison Koda, Ben Kramer, Paul Lombard, Frances Long, Patricia McCullough, Dawn Mehsikomer, Sandra Meyers, Sheri Miller, Eleanor Mizrahi, Laura Perkinson, Clotera Rogers, Steve Simons, Carol Smith, Vanessa Sowell Skeeter, Nancy Urbanczyk, Maria Valencia-Torres, Denise Wax, Donna Whiting, Glenna Wiegard, Kathleen Wilkinson, Janice Williams and Janice Wilson Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/16/2022. First cross appeal brief due 03/20/2023 for Facebook, Inc.. Second brief on cross appeal due 04/20/2023 for Jennifer Andrews, Mary Austin, Hannelore Boorn, Alison Koda, Ben Kramer, Paul Lombard, Frances Long, Patricia McCullough, Dawn Mehsikomer, Sandra Meyers, Sheri Miller, Eleanor Mizrahi, Laura Perkinson, Clotera Rogers, Steve Simons, Carol Smith, Vanessa Sowell Skeeter, Nancy Urbanczyk, Maria Valencia-Torres, Denise Wax, Donna Whiting, Glenna Wiegard, Kathleen Wilkinson, Janice Williams and Janice Wilson. Third brief on cross appeal due 05/22/2023 for Facebook, Inc. Optional cross appeal Reply brief for Jennifer Andrews, Mary Austin, Hannelore Boorn, Alison Koda, Ben Kramer, Paul Lombard, Frances Long, Patricia McCullough, Dawn Mehsikomer, Sandra Meyers, Sheri Miller, Eleanor Mizrahi, Laura Perkinson, Clotera Rogers, Steve Simons, Carol Smith, Vanessa Sowell Skeeter, Nancy Urbanczyk, Maria Valencia-Torres, Denise Wax, Donna Whiting, Glenna Wiegard, Kathleen Wilkinson, Janice Williams and Janice Wilson is due within 21 days of service of Third brief on cross appeal. [12607278] [22-16889, 22-16888] (RT) [Entered: 12/09/2022 03:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Facebook, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/16/2022. Transcript ordered by 01/09/2023. Transcript due 02/08/2023. Appellant Facebook, Inc. opening brief due 03/20/2023. Appellees Jennifer Andrews, Mary Austin, Hannelore Boorn, Alison Koda, Ben Kramer, Paul Lombard, Frances Long, Patricia McCullough, Dawn Mehsikomer, Sandra Meyers, Sheri Miller, Eleanor Mizrahi, Laura Perkinson, Clotera Rogers, Steve Simons, Carol Smith, Vanessa Sowell Skeeter, Nancy Urbanczyk, Maria Valencia-Torres, Denise Wax, Donna Whiting, Glenna Wiegard, Kathleen Wilkinson, Janice Williams and Janice Wilson answering brief due 04/20/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12607082] (RT) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Docket(#1) Filed order (A. WALLACE TASHIMA and SIDNEY R. THOMAS, Circuit Judges) in case no. 22-80100 on December 8, 2022: Respondents motion to withdraw their motion to extend the time to answer the petition and to exceed page limits (Docket Entry No. 6) is granted. The motion to extend time and exceed page limits (Docket Entry No. 4) is withdrawn. The motion for leave to file a reply in support of the petition (Docket Entry No. 8) is granted. The reply has been filed. The petition for permission to appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b) is granted. Respondents conditional cross-petition is also granted. See Yamaha Motor Corp., U.S.A. v. Calhoun, 516 U.S. 199, 205 (1996) (holding that under 1292(b), the appellate court may address any issue fairly included within the certified order because it is the order that is appealable, and not the controlling question identified by the district court. (citation omitted)). The Clerk will open cross-appeals. Within 14 days after the date of this order, the parties shall perfect their respective appeals in accordance with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 5(d). [12607078] (RT) [Entered: 12/09/2022 02:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less