This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/06/2023 at 05:58:19 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard v. Sage Associates

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Irving H Picard filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Sage Associates. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1210

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendant / Appellees

Malcolm H. Sage, in his Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates, Individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates, and as the Personal Representative of The Estate of Lillian M. Sage

Sage Associates

Martin A. Sage, in his Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates and individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates

Ann M. Sage Passer, in her Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates and individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates

Intervenor

SIPC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Daniel Arthur Cohen Esq.

Peter A. Devlin Esq.

James A. Walden Esq.

Sage Associates

Richard A. Kirby Esq.

Andrew Kratenstein

Intervenor Attorney

Kevin H. Bell Esq.

 

Court Documents

#101

(#68) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 12/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3430495] [22-1210, 22-1107] [Entered: 12/02/2022 03:25 PM]

#71

(#74) NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[3431887] [22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 12/06/2022 12:51 PM]

#69

(#72) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 12/06/2022, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3431881] [22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 12/06/2022 12:49 PM]

#68

(#71) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[3431879] [22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 12/06/2022 12:48 PM]

#84

(#67) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee SIPC in 22-1107 Brief due date as 12/16/2022, FILED.[3399745] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 10/13/2022 02:25 PM]

#81

(#64) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee-Cross-Appellant Irving H. Picard Brief due date as 12/16/2022, FILED.[3398953] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 10/12/2022 05:13 PM]

#76

(#59) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of SIPC in 22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1212, informing Court of proposed due date 12/16/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 09/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3390440] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 09/29/2022 08:57 AM]

#88

(#57) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Irving H. Picard in 22-1107, 22-1110, informing Court of proposed due date 12/16/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 09/20/2022 by CM/ECF.[3385508] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 09/20/2022 03:16 PM]

#14

(#14) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3334795] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/17/2022 03:03 PM]

#13

(#13) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3334786] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:57 PM]

#12

(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3334782] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:53 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3326994] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/06/2022 09:19 AM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, dated 04/15/2022, RECEIVED.[3326992] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/06/2022 09:19 AM]

27 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

27 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

25 #2

Case FILED

25 #1

Docketing_Notice_for_XAP_Crim_cases

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) NEW CASE MANAGER, Ralph Obas, ASSIGNED.[3431887] [22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 12/06/2022 12:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 12/06/2022, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3431881] [22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 12/06/2022 12:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, FILED.[3431879] [22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 12/06/2022 12:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 12/02/2022 by CM/ECF.[3430495] [22-1210, 22-1107] [Entered: 12/02/2022 03:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee SIPC in 22-1107 Brief due date as 12/16/2022, FILED.[3399745] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 10/13/2022 02:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee-Cross-Appellant Irving H. Picard Brief due date as 12/16/2022, FILED.[3398953] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 10/12/2022 05:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of SIPC in 22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1212, informing Court of proposed due date 12/16/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 09/29/2022 by CM/ECF.[3390440] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 09/29/2022 08:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Irving H. Picard in 22-1107, 22-1110, informing Court of proposed due date 12/16/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 09/20/2022 by CM/ECF.[3385508] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 09/20/2022 03:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) CURED DEFECTIVE: PAGE PROOF BRIEF, [ # 3384498-2 ], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, FILED.[3385181] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 09/20/2022 11:53 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Docket(#52) ATTORNEY, Daniel Arthur Cohen for Malcolm H. Sage, in case 22-1212 Daniel Arthur Cohen for Malcolm H. Sage, in case 22-1210 Daniel Arthur Cohen for Malcolm H. Sage, in case 22-1110 Daniel Arthur Cohen for Malcolm H. Sage, in case 22-1107, [ # 51 ], ADDED.[3383091] [22-1107, 22-1110, 22-1210, 22-1212] [Entered: 09/15/2022 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Form C with Schedule A and Attachments A and B and Form D, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/17/2022 by 3rd party, email.[3335503] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/21/2022 12:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3334795] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/17/2022 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3334786] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:57 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/17/2022 by CM/ECF.[3334782] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/17/2022 02:53 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docket(#7) NOTE: See lead case, 22-1107, containing complete set of docket entries.[3327045] [22-1210, 22-1107] [Entered: 06/06/2022 09:36 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3327002] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/06/2022 09:22 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26233672, FILED.[3326996] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/06/2022 09:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3326994] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/06/2022 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, dated 04/15/2022, RECEIVED.[3326992] [22-1210] [Entered: 06/06/2022 09:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Irving H. Picard in 22-1210, FILED. [3326976] [22-1210, 22-1107] [Entered: 06/06/2022 09:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less