This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/20/2023 at 06:34:26 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard v. Sage Associates

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Irving H Picard filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Sage Associates. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1107

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendants

Sage Associates

Sage Realty

Ann M. Sage Passer, in her Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates and Sage Realty, and individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates and Sage Realty.

Martin A. Sage, in his Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates and Sage Realty, and individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates and Sage Realty.

Plaintiff / Appellee

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Intervenor

SIPC

Defendant / Appellant

Malcolm H. Sage, in his Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates, Individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates and Sage Realty, and as the Personal Representative of The Estate of Lillian M. Sage

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Sage Associates

Sage Realty

Barry R. Lax Esq.

Richard A. Kirby Esq.

Intervenor Attorneys

Kevin H. Bell Esq.

Michael L. Post Esq.

Nicholas G. Hallenbeck

Nathanael Kelley Esq.

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Malcolm H. Sage

 

Court Documents

#217

(#217) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time until October 10, 2023, to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc [ # 203 ] filed by Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage, by SALM, FILED. [3561242][217] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 08/25/2023 12:29 PM]

212 #2

Supporting Document

212 #1

Itemized Bill of costs FILED

#211

(#211) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to extend time [ # 203 ], on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/24/2023 by US mail, email. [3560778] [22-1107] [Entered: 08/24/2023 01:15 PM]

#209

(#209) AMENDED SUMMARY ORDER, by ECL, MP, SALM, FILED.[3560522] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 08/24/2023 09:12 AM]

#206

(#206) LETTER, on behalf of SIPC, requesting that the Summary Order be amended to reflect that counsel for the intervenor was: Nicholas G. Hallenbeck (Michael L. Post, Kevin H. Bell and Nathanael S. Kelley, on the brief), for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, Washington, DC., RECEIVED. Service date 08/18/2023 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[3558389] [22-1107]--[Edited 08/18/2023 by YS] [Entered: 08/18/2023 11:45 AM]

204 #2

Supporting Document

204 #1

Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form FILED (c)

#203

(#203) MOTION, for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing , on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 08/17/2023 by US mail, email.[3557840] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 08/17/2023 01:54 PM]

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322388] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:09 PM]

#11

(#12) ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1107 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3322379] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:04 PM]

#9

(#10) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1107 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3322361] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:55 PM]

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3322343] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:44 PM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3319370] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 09:15 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#217) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time until October 10, 2023, to file a petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc [ # 203 ] filed by Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage, by SALM, FILED. [3561242][217] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 08/25/2023 12:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#212) ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of SIPC, FILED. Service date 08/24/2023 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[3560835] [22-1107] [Entered: 08/24/2023 02:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#211) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to extend time [ # 203 ], on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 08/24/2023 by US mail, email. [3560778] [22-1107] [Entered: 08/24/2023 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#209) AMENDED SUMMARY ORDER, by ECL, MP, SALM, FILED.[3560522] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 08/24/2023 09:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#206) LETTER, on behalf of SIPC, requesting that the Summary Order be amended to reflect that counsel for the intervenor was: Nicholas G. Hallenbeck (Michael L. Post, Kevin H. Bell and Nathanael S. Kelley, on the brief), for Securities Investor Protection Corporation, Washington, DC., RECEIVED. Service date 08/18/2023 by US mail, email, CM/ECF.[3558389] [22-1107]--[Edited 08/18/2023 by YS] [Entered: 08/18/2023 11:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#204) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, 22-1110, FILED. Service date 08/17/2023 by US mail, email.[3557843] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 08/17/2023 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#203) MOTION, for extension of time to file a petition for rehearing , on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 08/17/2023 by US mail, email.[3557840] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 08/17/2023 01:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • Docket(#201) ATTORNEY, James A. Walden, Daniel Arthur Cohen, Peter A. Devlin, and Timothy A. Macht for Malcolm H. Sage, TERMINATED.[3557291] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 08/16/2023 03:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#200) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to be relieved as attorney; Counsel shall promptly provide Mr. Sage with information regarding the deadlines and procedures for filing a motion for rehearing, and shall inform Mr. Sage of the need to file a pro se appearance on the docket [ # 195 ] filed by Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, by SALM, copy to pro se, FILED. [3557277][200] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 08/16/2023 03:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#195) MOTION, to be relieved as attorney, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, FILED. Service date 08/15/2023 by CM/ECF. [3556649] [22-1107] [Entered: 08/15/2023 12:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322388] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1107 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3322379] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322374] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1107 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3322361] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322360] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3322343] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3319541] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26176616, FILED.[3319372] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 09:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3319370] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 09:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, FILED. [3319365] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 09:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less