This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/15/2023 at 06:09:20 (UTC).

Irving H. Picard v. Sage Associates

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Irving H Picard filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Sage Associates. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1107

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendants

Sage Associates

New York, NY 10014

Sage Realty

New York, NY 10014

Ann M. Sage Passer, in her Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates and Sage Realty, and individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates and Sage Realty.

Martin A. Sage, in his Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates and Sage Realty, and individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates and Sage Realty.

Plaintiff / Appellee

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Intervenor

SIPC

Defendant / Appellant

Malcolm H. Sage, in his Capacity as Partner or Joint Venturer of Sage Associates, Individually as Beneficiary of Sage Associates and Sage Realty, and as the Personal Representative of The Estate of Lillian M. Sage

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Sage Associates

45 Christopher Street

New York, NY 10014

Sage Realty

45 Christopher Street

New York, NY 10014

Barry R. Lax Esq.

Attorney at Lax & Neville, LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Richard A. Kirby Esq.

Attorney at R K Invest Law, PBC

1725 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Intervenor Attorneys

Nathanael Kelley Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kevin H. Bell Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Michael L. Post Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Nicholas G. Hallenbeck

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

James A. Walden Esq.

Attorney at Walden Macht & Haran LLP

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Daniel Arthur Cohen Esq.

Attorney at Walden Macht & Haran LLP

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

Peter A. Devlin Esq.

Attorney at Walden Macht & Haran LLP

250 Vesey Street

New York, NY 10281

 

Court Documents

#159

(#159) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, informing the Court of unavailable dates for argument, RECEIVED. Service date 02/15/2023 by CM/ECF.[3469857] [22-1107]--[Edited 02/15/2023 by EM] [Entered: 02/15/2023 02:09 PM]

#137

(#158) FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 02/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3467980] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 02/13/2023 10:21 AM]

#136

(#157) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Final form brief, [ # 155 ], on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED.[3463858] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:07 PM]

#154

(#154) FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 22-1107, Appellee-Cross-Appellant Irving H. Picard in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 01/26/2023 by CM/ECF. [3459639] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 01/26/2023 05:11 PM]

#129

(#150) FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 01/16/2023 by CM/ECF. [3452754] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 01/16/2023 02:01 PM]

128 #2

Deferred Joint Appx_vol 18 (2 of 2)

128 #1

Deferred Appendix FILED Deferred Joint Appx_vol 18 (1 of 2)

127 #1

Deferred Appendix FILED Deferred Joint Appx_vol 17 (1 of 2)

#13

(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322388] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:09 PM]

#11

(#12) ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1107 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3322379] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:04 PM]

#9

(#10) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1107 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3322361] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:55 PM]

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3322343] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:44 PM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3319370] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 09:15 AM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

100 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • Docket(#165) CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 05/30/2023, PROPOSED.[3480874] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 03/09/2023 11:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#159) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, informing the Court of unavailable dates for argument, RECEIVED. Service date 02/15/2023 by CM/ECF.[3469857] [22-1107]--[Edited 02/15/2023 by EM] [Entered: 02/15/2023 02:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#160) CURED DEFECTIVE BRIEF, [ # 158 ], on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, 22-1110, FILED.[3470097] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 02/15/2023 04:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#158) FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 02/13/2023 by CM/ECF. [3467980] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 02/13/2023 10:21 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#157) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Final form brief, [ # 155 ], on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED.[3463858] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 02/03/2023 03:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#155) FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 01/27/2023 by CM/ECF. [3459892] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 01/27/2023 12:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard in 22-1107, Appellee-Cross-Appellant Irving H. Picard in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 01/26/2023 by CM/ECF. [3459639] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 01/26/2023 05:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 01/16/2023 by CM/ECF. [3452754] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 01/16/2023 02:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 18 of 18, (pp. 4377-4628) on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 01/16/2023 by CM/ECF.[3452753] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 01/16/2023 01:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 17 of 18, (pp. 4132-4376) on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1107, Appellant-Cross-Appellee Malcolm H. Sage in 22-1110, FILED. Service date 01/16/2023 by CM/ECF.[3452752] [22-1107, 22-1110] [Entered: 01/16/2023 01:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322388] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1107 , [ # 11 ], ADDED.[3322379] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322374] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-1107 , [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3322361] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF. [3322360] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 05/26/2022 by CM/ECF.[3322343] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/26/2022 03:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3319541] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 11:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26176616, FILED.[3319372] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 09:17 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 04/20/2022, RECEIVED.[3319370] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 09:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Malcolm H. Sage, FILED. [3319365] [22-1107] [Entered: 05/23/2022 09:08 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less