This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/29/2021 at 05:56:50 (UTC).

In re: Indirect Plaintiff Class, et al v. LG Display Co., Ltd., et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2013 In re Indirect Plaintiff Class filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against LG Display Co , Ltd . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    13-15929

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORPORATION

NEC DISPLAY SOLUTIONS OF AMERICA, INC.

SAMSUNG SDI AMERICA, INC.

TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC.

KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V.

TOSHIBA CORPORATION

EPSON ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.

SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS COMPANY, LTD.

TATUNG COMPANY

SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.

HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC.

CMO JAPAN CO., LTD.

CHIMEI INNOLUX CORP.

SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONICS COMPONENTS, INC.

NEXGEN MEDIATECH USA INC.

MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LIMITED

TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.

HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD.

Not Classified By Court

In re: TFT-LCD, (Flat Panel) Antitrust Litigation

26 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher A. Nedeau Esquire

Attorney at Nossaman, LLP

50 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Stephen P. Freccero

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

William Farmer Esquire

Attorney at Farmer Brownstein Jaeger & Goldstein LLP

235 Montgomery Street, Suite 835

San Francisco, CA 94104

Christopher M. Curran

Attorney at White & Case LLP

701 13Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Jeffrey Michael Davidson Esquire

Attorney at Covington & Burling LLP

415 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2533

Harrison Frahn

Attorney at Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

2475 Hanover Street

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Anne Kaldor Sauro

Attorney at Bingham McCutchen LLP

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111-4067

Peter W. James Esquire

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Other Attorneys

Jerry Chen Esquire

Attorney at Freitas Tseng & Kaufman LLP

100 Marine Parkway, Suite 200

Redwood City, CA 94065

Qianwei Fu

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP

44 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Judith Zahid

Attorney at Zelle Hofmann Voelbel & Mason LLP

3400 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Francis O. Scarpulla Esquire

Attorney at Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpulla

456 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Patrick B. Clayton

Attorney at Law Offices of Francis O. Scarpulla

456 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

John Bogdanov

Attorney at Cooper & Kirkham, P.C.

357 Tehama Street

San Francisco, CA 94103

Joseph Darrell Palmer

Attorney at Law Offices of Darrell Palmer

2244 Faraday Avenue

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Hailyn Jennifer Chen

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Craig C. Corbitt Esquire

Attorney at Corbitt Law Office

1200 California Street, Unit 21D

San Francisco, CA 94109

Donald H. Mullins Esquire

Attorney at Badgley Mullins Turner, PLLC

19929 Ballinger Way Ne

Shoreline, WA 98155

Jake J. Ewart

Attorney at Hillis Clark Martin & Peterson, P.S.

999 Third Avenue, Suite 4600

Seattle, WA 98104

Joseph M. Alioto

Attorney at ALIOTO LAW FIRM

One Sansome Street, 35Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

25 More Attorneys Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MAC): Appellants motion to voluntarily dismiss this appeal is granted. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [9107634] (AF) [Entered: 05/23/2014 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Filed (ECF) Appellants Leveta Chesser, Johnny Kessel and Alison Paul Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 05/22/2014. [9105842] (Palmer, Joseph) [Entered: 05/22/2014 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Filed (ECF) Appellants Leveta Chesser, Johnny Kessel and Alison Paul reply to response (). Date of service: 10/31/2013. [8845728] (Palmer, Joseph) [Entered: 10/31/2013 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class response opposing motion (motion to extend time to file brief,motion to reinstate case after FRAP 42-1 dismissal). Date of service: 10/21/2013. [8830064] (Clayton, Patrick) [Entered: 10/21/2013 04:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Filed order MEDIATION (CLB): The Class Plaintiffs Opposition to Appellants Motion to Reinstate Appeal and Appellants Reply thereto disclose confidential communications made in connection with the mediation process conducted pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 33-1. The Clerk shall remove from the docket the opposition filed September 30, 2013, and the reply filed October 7, 2013. Within seven (7) days of the entry of this order, Class Plaintiffs shall file a substitute opposition which does not violate the courts mediation confidentiality rules. See Rule 33-1. Particularly, Class Plaintiffs shall remove Exhibit A to the Declaration of Patrick Clayton. Within seven (7) days of the filing of Class Plaintiffs Substitute Opposition, appellants shall file a substitute reply which does not violate the courts mediation confidentiality rules. See Rule 33-1. Particularly, appellants shall remove all information contained in paragraph 2 of page 1 of the reply. [8827746] (BJB) [Entered: 10/18/2013 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2013
  • Docket(#18) Deleted Incorrect Entry (Per Order Filed 10/18/2013) ****** COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellants Leveta Chesser, Johnny Kessel and Alison Paul reply to response (). Date of service: 10/07/2013. [8812627] (Palmer, Joseph) [Entered: 10/07/2013 09:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • Docket(#17) Terminated Appellees NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation and NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd. in 13-15929 [8810165] (BJB) [Entered: 10/04/2013 02:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): The motion of appellees NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., Renesas Electronics America, NEC Corporation of America and NEC Electronics Corporation (collectively, the NEC Entities) to amend the caption is granted. The NEC Entities shall be removed from the caption of this case and shall be removed from the service list. Appellants opposed motion to reinstate the appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a renewed motion to reinstate within 21 days after the date of this order accompanied by the opening brief. See General Order 2.4, General Orders of the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit (a motion to reinstate is to be accompanied by correction of the defect that caused dismissal). (Pro Mo) [8810152] (BJB) [Entered: 10/04/2013 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Docket(#15) Deleted Incorrect Entry (Per Order Filed 10/18/2013) ****** COURT DELETED INCORRECT/DUPLICATE ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellee Indirect Plaintiff Class response opposing motion (,motion to reinstate case after FRAP 42-1 dismissal,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 09/30/2013. [8802259] (Clayton, Patrick) [Entered: 09/30/2013 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) COURT ENTERED FILING. Filed (ECF) Appellants Leveta Chesser, Johnny Kessel and Alison Paul Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 09/19/2013. [8789442] (RY) [Entered: 09/19/2013 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Terminated Sean David Unger for Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 12-16830, Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 12-16839, Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15920, Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15929, Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15930 and Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 13-15934 [8758404] [12-16839, 12-16830, 13-15920, 13-15929, 13-15930, 13-15934] (CW) [Entered: 08/27/2013 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Received Attorney Sean David Unger, Esquire for Appellee Epson Electronics America, Inc. in 12-16839, 12-16830, 13-15920, 13-15929, 13-15930, 13-15934 letter dated 08/22/2013 re: request to be removed from service. Terminated counsel. Served on 08/22/2013 [8758392] [12-16839, 12-16830, 13-15920, 13-15929, 13-15930, 13-15934] (CW) [Entered: 08/27/2013 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed order (Deputy Clerk: MGS) Appellants have failed to comply with the courts order filed July 2, 2013. Accordingly, this appeal is dismissed. Ninth Cir. Rule 42-1. The parties shall bear their own costs on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. [8701322] (BJB) [Entered: 07/12/2013 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed order MEDIATION (EPM): Appellants have failed to file a Mediation Questionnaire in accordance with the courts order of June 12, 2013. Within seven (7) days of the filing date of this order, appellants shall file a Mediation Questionnaire (available on the court's website, www.ca9.uscourts.gov) or a motion to dismiss the appeal voluntarily under Fed. R. App. P. 42(b), or shall show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed. [8688873] (BJB) [Entered: 07/02/2013 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • Docket(#6) Terminated Chet Alan Kronenberg for LG Display Co., Ltd. and LG Display America, Inc. in 13-15929 [8664236] (CW) [Entered: 06/12/2013 09:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed order MEDIATION (EPM): The Court of Appeals records do not indicate that appellants have filed a Mediation Questionnaire in accordance with Circuit Rule 3-4. Within seven (7) days of the filing of this order, appellants shall: (a) file a Mediation Questionnaire (available on the court's website, www.ca9.uscourts.gov); (b) dismiss the appeal voluntarily pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b); or (c) show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. Failure to comply with this order will result in dismissal pursuant to Ninth Cir. R. 42-1. [8664159] (BJB) [Entered: 06/12/2013 08:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellees LG Display America, Inc. and LG Display Co., Ltd. Correspondence: Correspondence to Clerk re: Notice of Settlement in Underlying Case. Date of service: 06/11/2013 [8663950] (Kronenberg, Chet) [Entered: 06/11/2013 04:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • Docket(#3) Received notification from District Court re: payment of docket fee. Amount Paid: USD 455.00. Date paid: 05/14/2013. [8629556] (RT) [Entered: 05/15/2013 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: DEV): Order to show cause docket fee due. [8623150] (DEV) [Entered: 05/09/2013 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Fee due from Appellants Leveta Chesser, Johnny Kessel and Alison Paul on 04/26/2013. Mediation Questionnaire due on 05/14/2013. Transcript ordered by 05/28/2013. Transcript due 06/25/2013. Appellants Leveta Chesser, Johnny Kessel and Alison Paul opening brief due 08/05/2013. Appellees AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chimei Innolux Corp., Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi Ltd., Indirect Plaintiff Class, Koninklijke Philips Electronics, NV, LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., NEC Corporation, NEC Corporation of America, NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Electronics Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc., Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Renesas Electronics America, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung SDI America, Inc., Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., LTD. and Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. answering brief due 09/03/2013. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8619552] (RT) [Entered: 05/07/2013 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EPSON ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC. is a litigant