This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2021 at 06:01:55 (UTC).

In re: In re: Boy Scouts of America

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 In re In re Boy Scouts of America was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2035

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

In re: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO

WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE CO

CENTURY INDEMNITY CO, as successor to CCI Insurance Company, as successor to Insurance Company of North America and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America

Debtor / Appellees

BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA, a/k/a BSA

DELAWARE BSA LLC

Not Yet Classified

SIDLEY AUSTIN LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Tancred V. Schiavoni Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

7 Times Square, Time Square Tower, 33Rd Floor

New York, NY 10036

Stamatios Stamoulis Esq.

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt

800 North West Street, 3Rd Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jonathan D. Hacker Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Bradley N. Garcia Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Andrew R. Hellman Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Debtor / Appellee Attorneys

Derek C. Abbott Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Eric W. Moats Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Joseph C. Barsalona Esq. II

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Andrew R. Remming Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

James W. Ducayet Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Robert N. Hochman Esq.

Attorney at Sidley Austin

One South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

17 #2

Briefing and Scheduling Order

17 #1

Briefing Notice Issued

#16

(#16) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA LLC and Sidley Austin LLP. [21-2035] (DCA) [Entered: 06/17/2021 05:42 PM]

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Derek C. Abbott on behalf of Appellee(s) Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. [21-2035] (DCA) [Entered: 06/17/2021 05:24 PM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Sidley Austin LLP. [21-2035] (RNH) [Entered: 06/17/2021 04:56 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert N. Hochman on behalf of Appellee(s) Sidley Austin LLP. [21-2035] (RNH) [Entered: 06/17/2021 04:53 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James W. Ducayet on behalf of Appellee(s) Sidley Austin LLP. [21-2035] (JWD) [Entered: 06/17/2021 04:49 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 01:03 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:56 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:52 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew R. Hellman on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-2035] (ARH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:39 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tancred Schiavoni on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-2035] (TVS) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:33 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bradley N. Garcia on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-2035] (BNG) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:16 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan D. Hacker on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:10 PM]

4 #2

Transcript Scheduling Order

4 #1

Transcript Scheduling Order Issued

#3

(#3) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Century Indemnity Co advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 02/09/2021, to be filed by Heather M. Triozzi. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/14/2021 12:01 PM]

1 #2

District Court Order dated 050621

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co due on or before 09/07/2021. Appendix due on or before 09/07/2021. (TMM) [Entered: 07/26/2021 04:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Boy Scouts of America, Delaware BSA LLC and Sidley Austin LLP. [21-2035] (DCA) [Entered: 06/17/2021 05:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Derek C. Abbott on behalf of Appellee(s) Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. [21-2035] (DCA) [Entered: 06/17/2021 05:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Sidley Austin LLP. [21-2035] (RNH) [Entered: 06/17/2021 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert N. Hochman on behalf of Appellee(s) Sidley Austin LLP. [21-2035] (RNH) [Entered: 06/17/2021 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from James W. Ducayet on behalf of Appellee(s) Sidley Austin LLP. [21-2035] (JWD) [Entered: 06/17/2021 04:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 01:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew R. Hellman on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-2035] (ARH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tancred Schiavoni on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-2035] (TVS) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bradley N. Garcia on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-2035] (BNG) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan D. Hacker on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/16/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER to Court Reporter Ms. Heather M. Triozzi directing transcripts, ordered on 06/14/2021 , to be filed by 07/19/2021. (TMM) [Entered: 06/14/2021 12:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Century Indemnity Co advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 02/09/2021, to be filed by Heather M. Triozzi. [21-2035] (JDH) [Entered: 06/14/2021 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 06/03/2021 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co in District Court No. 1-20-cv-00798. (PDB) [Entered: 06/03/2021 01:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delaware BSA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sidley Austin LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Westchester Fire Insurance Company is a litigant