This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2019 at 06:05:11 (UTC).

In Re: Hello Newman Inc

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 In Re Hello Newman Inc was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-439

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

Doris Kornish

New York, NY 10003

Appellee

Albert Togut

Not Yet Classified

Hello Newman Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Doris Kornish

151 First Avenue

New York, NY 10003

Appellee Attorney

Neil M. Berger Esq.

Attorney at Togut, Segal & Segal LLP

1 Pennsylvania Plaza

New York, NY 10119

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Bruce L. Weiner Esq.

Attorney at Rosenberg Musso & Weiner LLP

26 Court Street

Brooklyn, NY 11242

 

Court Documents

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, RECEIVED.[2501835] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:50 AM]

3 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

3 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#4

(#4) NOTICE, re: pending district court IFP motion, to district court, SENT.[2501845] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:52 AM]

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2501853] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:56 AM]

#8

(#8) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/25/2019, denying IFP, RECEIVED.[2507313] [19-439] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:02 AM]

9 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

9 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#29

(#29) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by US mail.[2523738] [19-439] [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:26 AM]

#28

(#28) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by US mail.[2523733] [19-439] [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:24 AM]

#26

(#26) LETTER, dated 03/20/2019, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, informing the Court of an address change, RECEIVED. Service date 03/20/2019 by US mail.[2523697] [19-439] [Entered: 03/22/2019 09:58 AM]

#19

(#19) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Albert Togut, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2522123] [19-439] [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:18 PM]

#15

(#15) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellee Albert Togut, FILED.[2520500] [19-439] [Entered: 03/19/2019 08:52 AM]

#20

(#20) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for subpoena, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by US mail.[2522374] [19-439] [Entered: 03/20/2019 03:49 PM]

#18

(#18) ORDER, dated 03/19/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/09/2019 unless Appellant Doris Kornish submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2520915] [19-439] [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:53 AM]

#17

(#17) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Doris Kornish motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, [7] from the docket, FILED.[2520908] [19-439] [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:49 AM]

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2019
  • (#27) ADDRESS CHANGE REQUEST, dated 03/20/2019, COMPLETED.[2523703] [19-439] [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by US mail.[2523738] [19-439] [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by US mail.[2523733] [19-439] [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) LETTER, dated 03/20/2019, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, informing the Court of an address change, RECEIVED. Service date 03/20/2019 by US mail.[2523697] [19-439] [Entered: 03/22/2019 09:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 15 ], [ # 19 ], on behalf of Appellee Albert Togut, FILED.[2522387] [19-439] [Entered: 03/20/2019 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for subpoena, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by US mail.[2522374] [19-439] [Entered: 03/20/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Albert Togut, FILED. Service date 03/20/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2522123] [19-439] [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER, dated 03/19/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/09/2019 unless Appellant Doris Kornish submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2520915] [19-439] [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STRIKE ORDER, striking Appellant Doris Kornish motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, [7] from the docket, FILED.[2520908] [19-439] [Entered: 03/19/2019 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellee Albert Togut, FILED.[2520500] [19-439] [Entered: 03/19/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, dated 03/08/2019, dismissing appeal by 03/29/2019 unless Appellant Doris Kornish submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2513202] [19-439] [Entered: 03/08/2019 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2507316] [19-439] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/25/2019, denying IFP, RECEIVED.[2507313] [19-439] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • (#7) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [6], on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2501911] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2501853] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • (#6) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, FILED. No service included.[2501869] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE, re: pending district court IFP motion, to district court, SENT.[2501845] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2501839] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 02/05/2019, RECEIVED.[2501835] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Doris Kornish, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2501819] [19-439] [Entered: 02/21/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.