This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/21/2021 at 05:13:12 (UTC).

G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LPIn re: G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 G H Diversified Manufacturing, LPIn re G H Diversified Manufacturing, LP was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-176

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: G&H DIVERSIFIED MANUFACTURING, LP

Respondents

DYNAENERGETICS EUROPE GMBH

DYNAENERGETICS US, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Amir H. Alavi

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney, Suite 3460

Houston, TX 77010

Demetrios Anaipakos

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing PC

1221 Mckinney, Suite 3460

Houston, TX 77010

Kelsi M. White

Attorney at Aza Law

1221 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Respondent Attorney

Barry J. Herman

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

100 Light Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Petition for Writ of Mandamus

#2

Appendix

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Amended Entry of appearance for Amir H. Alavi; Demetrios Anaipakos; Kelsi White as counsel for Petitioner G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP. Service: 08/19/2021 by email. [794109] [21-176] [Amir Alavi] [Entered: 08/19/2021 03:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER filed directing DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH and DynaEnergetics US, Inc. to respond to the petition [ # 2 ] within seven days from the date of filing of this order. G&H may file a reply in support of the petition within four days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [793909] [LMS] [Entered: 08/19/2021 11:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corrected Certificate of Interest for Petitioner G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP. Service: 08/18/2021 by email. [793673] [21-176] [Amir Alavi] [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Petitioner G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP, Certificate of Interest [ # 4 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 08/25/2021. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [793658] [MMA] [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Petitioner G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP. Service: 08/18/2021 by clerk. [793657] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No. [ # 5 ] [MMA] [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Entry of appearance for Amir Alavi; Demetrios Anaipakos as counsel for Petitioner G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP. Service: 08/18/2021 by clerk. [793656] [MMA] [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner G&H Diversified Manufacturing, LP for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 08/17/2021 by email. [793654] [MMA] [Entered: 08/18/2021 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 08/17/2021. [793652] Entry of Appearance due 09/01/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/01/2021. [MMA] [Entered: 08/18/2021 11:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less