This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/31/2020 at 14:54:26 (UTC).

In re: Fortinet, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/20/2020 In re Fortinet, Inc was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-120

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: FORTINET, INC.

Respondents

BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS PLC

BT AMERICAS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

John Neukom

Attorney at Skadden Arps

525 University Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

James Y. Pak

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

525 University Avenue

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Respondent Attorneys

Baldassare Vinti

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

John E. Roberts

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

One International Place

Boston, MA 02110

James Holman Shalek

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

Eleven Times Square

New York, NY 10036-8299

Nolan M. Goldberg

Attorney at Proskauer Rose LLP

11 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#1

2 #1

Writ

#2

Appendix

#4

#5

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#14

#15

#16

#17

#18

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Certificate of Interest for Petitioner Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 03/25/2020 by email. [681827] [20-120] [John Neukom] [Entered: 03/25/2020 08:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Entry of appearance for James Y. Pak as of counsel for Petitioner Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 03/25/2020 by email. [681825] [20-120] [James Pak] [Entered: 03/25/2020 07:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Entry of appearance for John M. Neukom as principal counsel for Petitioner Fortinet, Inc.. Service: 03/25/2020 by email. [681824] [20-120] [John Neukom] [Entered: 03/25/2020 07:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting motion [ # 14 ]. The response is due no later than April 2, 2020. Any reply in support of the petition must be filed no later than 5 days thereafter. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [681701] [NL] [Entered: 03/25/2020 02:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION of Respondent British Telecommunications PLC and BT Americas, Inc. to extend the time to 04/02/2020 to file Response/Reply [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 03/24/2020 by email. [681520] [20-120] [James Shalek] [Entered: 03/24/2020 06:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#13) Filing fee paid. Fee Amount: $500.00. Receipt Number: A13-33840-616. [681344] [20-120] [John Neukom] [Entered: 03/24/2020 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interest for Respondent British Telecommunications PLC and BT Americas, Inc.. Service: 03/24/2020 by email. [681328] [20-120] [James Shalek] [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Entry of appearance for Nolan M. Goldberg as of counsel for Respondent British Telecommunications PLC and BT Americas, Inc.. Service: 03/24/2020 by email. [681324] [20-120] [Nolan Goldberg] [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:42 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Entry of appearance for John E. Roberts as of counsel for Respondent British Telecommunications PLC and BT Americas, Inc.. Service: 03/24/2020 by email. [681320] [20-120] [John Roberts] [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Baldassare Vinti as of counsel for Respondent British Telecommunications PLC and BT Americas, Inc.. Service: 03/24/2020 by email. [681318] [20-120] [Baldassare Vinti] [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:33 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Entry of appearance for James H. Shalek as principal counsel for Respondent British Telecommunications PLC and BT Americas, Inc.. Service: 03/24/2020 by email. [681313] [20-120] [James Shalek] [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:30 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER filed directing British Telecommunications PLC and BT Americas, Inc. to respond to the motion to stay [ # 5 ] no later than 10 days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the motion must be filed no later than 5 days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [680814] [LMS] [Entered: 03/23/2020 10:13 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Confidential Motion for Stay of Proceedings in the District Court Pending this Court's Decision on Fortinet, Inc.'s Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioner Fortinet, Inc. corresponding to Doc. No. [ # 5 ]. Service: 03/20/2020 by email. [680722] [20-120] [John Neukom] [Entered: 03/20/2020 05:34 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION of Petitioner Fortinet, Inc. for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8/18 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 03/20/2020 by email. [680720] [20-120] [John Neukom] [Entered: 03/20/2020 05:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER filed directing British Telecommunications PLC and BT Americas, Inc. to respond to the Petition for Writ of Mandamus [ # 2 ] no later than 10 days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the petition must be filed no later than 5 days thereafter.. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [680708] [NL] [Entered: 03/20/2020 04:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Confidential PETITION for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21 filed by Petitioner Fortinet, Inc. corresponding to Doc. No. [ # 2 ]. Service: 03/20/2020 by email. [680573] [MMA] [Entered: 03/20/2020 01:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner Fortinet, Inc. for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 03/20/2020 by email. [680571] [MMA] [Entered: 03/20/2020 01:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 03/20/2020. [680566] Fee/IFP due on 04/03/2020. Entry of Appearance due 04/03/2020. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/03/2020. [MMA] [Entered: 03/20/2020 01:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BT AMERICAS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS PLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Y. Pak

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Neukom