This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/02/2022 at 05:11:39 (UTC).

DengIn re: Deng

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 DengIn re Deng was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1568

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Appellants

In re: HAIXIA DENG

YONGBONG HAN

CHARAN MASARAPU

YOGESH KUMAR ANGUCHAMY

HERMAN A. LOPEZ

SUJEET KUMAR

Appellee

ANDREW HIRSHFELD, Performing the Functions and Duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Peter S. Dardi Esq.

Attorney at Patterson Thuente Pedersen, PA

4800 Ids Center, 80 South 8Th Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Appellee Attorney

Thomas W. Krause

Attorney at United States Patent and Trademark Office

Po Box 1450, Mail Stop 8

Alexandria, VA 22313

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Agency Case Docketed

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 03/23/2022. [838722] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/07/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/07/2022. Docketing Statement is due on 04/25/2022. Certified List is due on 05/03/2022. [JCW] [Entered: 03/24/2022 08:55 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANDREW HIRSHFELD, Performing the Functions and Duties of the Under Secretary of Commerce for Intellectual Property and Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Krause