This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/02/2019 at 06:04:19 (UTC).

In re: Deepwater Horizon

Case Summary

On 06/03/2019 In re Deepwater Horizon was filed as an Other - Environment lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-30440

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

TRANSOCEAN, LIMITED

TRANSOCEAN OFFSHORE DEEPWATER DRILLING, INCORPORATED

TRANSOCEAN DEEPWATER, INCORPORATED

ANADARKO E&P COMPANY, L.P.

TRANSOCEAN HOLDINGS, L.L.C.

BP, P.L.C.

ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION COMPANY

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED

TRITON ASSET LEASING GMBH

HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INCORPORATED

BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INCORPORATED

BP AMERICA, INCORPORATED

Plaintiff / Appellants

SERGIO ALVARADO

SANDRA A. IAMES

SERGIO VALDIVIESO

BRIAN GORTNEY

SHERI ALLEN DORGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kerry J. Miller

Attorney at Fishman Haygood, L.L.P.

201 Saint Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

David Bruce Salmons Esq.

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, L.L.P.

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Don Keller Haycraft

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, 1 Shell Square

New Orleans, LA 70139

James Andrew Langan Esq.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

George W. Hicks Jr.

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Aaron Lloyd Nielson

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis, L.L.P.

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Devin Chase Reid Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, 1 Shell Square

New Orleans, LA 70139

Robert Alan York

Attorney at Reed Smith, L.L.P.

811 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

Thomas Andrew Range

Attorney at Akerman, L.L.P.

106 E. College Avenue

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Douglas M. Schmidt

335 City Park Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70119-0000

J. Alistair McKenzie

Attorney at McKenzie Law Firm, P.A.

905 E. Hatton Street

Pensacola, FL 32503

James Alistair McKenzie

Attorney at McKenzie Law Firm, P.A.

905 E. Hatton Street

Pensacola, FL 32503

W. Mark Lanier Esq.

Attorney at Lanier Law Firm, P.C.

6810 Fm 1960 Road, W.

Houston, TX 77069

Harvey Grannis Brown Jr.

301 Fannin Street

Houston, TX 77002-2700

Kevin Philip Parker

Attorney at Lanier Law Firm

10940 W. Sam Houston Parkway N.

Houston, TX 77064

Miriam Michelle Carreras

Attorney at Lanier Law Firm

10940 W. Sam Houston Parkway N.

Houston, TX 77064

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

ROA Desig Order

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document #3

Describe Attachment

Open Document #2

Transcript Unnecessary - order attached

Open Document #1

Transcript Unnecessary

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:10-MD-2179 & 2:13-CV-1778. Electronic ROA due on 08/08/2019. [19-30440] (SEP) [Entered: 07/24/2019 07:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER filed advising that the designations of records have been filed in DC. Designations of the record are attached. [19-30440] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellees BP America Production Company, BP America, Incorporated, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated, BP Products North America, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C. referencing Clerk Order [ # 9089490-2 ]. Date of Service: 07/23/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Brown, Carreras, Lanier, McKenzie, Parker, Schmidt; Attorney for Appellees: Haycraft, Hicks, Langan, Miller, Nielson, Reid, Salmons, York; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Range [19-30440] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 07/23/2019 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Sergio Alvarado advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes (no hearings). [19-30440] (AGL) [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Sergio Alvarado No hearings regarding this matter so the transcript is not required for appeal purposes for the Court to process. Date of service: 07/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Brown, Carreras, Lanier, McKenzie, Parker, Schmidt; Attorney for Appellees: Haycraft, Hicks, Langan, Miller, Nielson, Reid, Salmons, York; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Range. [19-30440] (Douglas M. Schmidt ) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER directing parties to file their joint designation of the record with the District Court. [9089490-2] Case Management due on 07/16/2019 [19-30440] (LEF) [Entered: 07/02/2019 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-30440] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Sheri Allen Dorgan, Mr. Brian Gortney and Mr. Sergio Valdivieso advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 07/01/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Brown, Carreras, Lanier, McKenzie, Parker, Schmidt; Attorney for Appellees: Haycraft, Hicks, Langan, Miller, Nielson, Reid, Salmons, York; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Range [19-30440] (Kevin Philip Parker ) [Entered: 07/01/2019 11:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Douglas M. Schmidt for Appellant Sergio Alvarado in 19-30440 [19-30440] (WMJ) [Entered: 06/28/2019 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James Alistair McKenzie for Appellant Sandra A. Iames in 19-30440 [19-30440] (LLL) [Entered: 06/27/2019 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James Alistair McKenzie for Ms. Sandra A. Iames for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30440] (James Alistair McKenzie ) [Entered: 06/25/2019 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Harvey Grannis Brown Jr. for party(s) Appellant Sheri Allen Dorgan Appellant Sergio Valdivieso Appellant Brian Gortney, in case 19-30440 [19-30440] (SMC) [Entered: 06/24/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process as to notice of appeal filed by Brian Grotney. [9072252-2] [19-30440] (SEP) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process for notice of appeal filed by Sheri Allen Dorgan. [9072204-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30440] (AGL) [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9072171-2] [19-30440] (MRW) [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process for Notice of Appeal filed on behalf of Sergio Alvarado. [9071607-2] [19-30440] (LEF) [Entered: 06/10/2019 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process for notice of appeal filed on behalf of Appellant Sergio Valdivieso. [9071401-2] Transcript order due on 06/25/2019, for Appellant Sergio Valdivieso. [19-30440] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/10/2019 08:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9069911-2] Parties added: Appellant Sergio Valdivieso. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Sergio Valdivieso. [9069911-1] [19-30440] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9068512-2] Parties added: Appellant Brian Gortney, Appellees BP Products North America, Incorporated and BP America, Incorporated. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Brian Gortney. [9068512-1] [19-30440] (SEP) [Entered: 06/05/2019 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9068322-2] Parties added: Appellant Sheri Allen Dorgan. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Sheri Allen Dorgan. [9068322-1] [19-30440] (AGL) [Entered: 06/05/2019 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9066918-2] Parties added: Appellant Sandra A. Iames, Appellees Transocean Holdings, L.L.C., Transocean Deepwater, Incorporated, Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, Transocean, Limited, Triton Asset Leasing GmBH, Anadarko E&P Company, L.P., Anadarko Petroleum Corporation Company and Halliburton Energy Services, Incorporated. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra A. Iames. [9066918-1] [19-30440] (MAS) [Entered: 06/03/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Sergio Alvarado [19-30440] (LEF) [Entered: 06/03/2019 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSOCEAN, LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where ANADARKO E&P CO LP is a litigant

Latest cases where TRITON ASSET LEASING GMBH is a litigant

Latest cases where Transocean Offshore Deepwater Drilling, Inc. is a litigant