This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2019 at 06:10:52 (UTC).

In re: Deepwater Horizon

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 In re Deepwater Horizon was filed as an Other - Environment lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-30267

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

TURBO PUMP SERVICES, INCORPORATED

Defendant / Appellees

PATRICK JUNEAU

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

BP, P.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

William Gray Chason

Attorney at McDowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, L.L.C.

11 N. Water Street

Mobile, AL 36602

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Richard C. Stanley Esq.

Attorney at Stanley, Reuter, Ross, Thornton & Alford, L.L.C.

909 Poydras Street, Ll&E Tower

New Orleans, LA 70112

Kathryn Weatherly Munson Esq.

Attorney at Stanley, Reuter, Ross, Thornton & Alford, L.L.C.

909 Poydras Street, Ll&E Tower

New Orleans, LA 70112

J. David Forsyth

Attorney at Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel, L.L.C.

400 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Devin Chase Reid Esq.

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, 1 Shell Square

New Orleans, LA 70139

Don Keller Haycraft

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis, P.L.C.

701 Poydras Street, 1 Shell Square

New Orleans, LA 70139

R. Stanton Jones

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P.

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

John Robinson

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, L.L.P.

601 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

Open Document

UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend the stay of proceedings in this court until 09/09/2019, in case 18-31177 [9054290-2]. [18-31177, 19-30267] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Claimant ID 100118552 and Claimant ID 100282515 in 18-31177 for stay pending appeal [9054290-2]. Date of service: 05/16/2019, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Chason, Hofferber; Attorney for Appellees: Forsyth, Haycraft, Jones, Langan, Munson, Regan, Reid, Robinson, Stanley. [18-31177, 19-30267] (William Gray Chason ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:35 AM]

Open Document

LETTER filed by Appellant Turbo Pump Services, Incorporated referencing Clerk Order [ # 9032022-2 ]. Date of Service: 05/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Chason; Attorney for Appellees: Forsyth, Haycraft, Jones, Munson, Reid, Robinson, Stanley [19-30267] (William Gray Chason ) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:39 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30267] (J. David Forsyth ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:14 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30267] (Kathryn Weatherly Munson ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:40 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9028108-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 04/29/2019 for Appellant Turbo Pump Services, Incorporated [19-30267] (MCS) [Entered: 04/12/2019 10:28 AM]

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30267] (Richard C. Stanley ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:28 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Devin Chase Reid, Esq. for BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30267] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:51 PM]

Open Document #1

MOT-2 Letter

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. [19-30267] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Turbo Pump Services, Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 04/17/2019, via email - Attorney for Appellant: Chason; Attorney for Appellee: Reid. [19-30267] (William Gray Chason ) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:49 PM]

Open Document #2

ROA Desig Order

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30267] (John Robinson ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:30 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30267] (R. Stanton Jones ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:26 AM]

Open Document #2

Court Order

Open Document

CLERK ORDER granting unopposed motion to consolidate cases 18-31177 and 19-30267, filed by Appellants Claimant ID 100118552 and Claimant ID 100282515 [ # 9048140-2 ] in 18-31177. [18-31177, 19-30267] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:05 AM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Turbo Pump Services, Incorporated [19-30267] (MCS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:01 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT ORDER granting Motion to extend the stay of proceedings in this court until September 9, 2019 in case 18-31177, filed by Appellants Claimant ID 100118552 and Claimant ID 100282515 [ # 9054290-2 ] [18-31177] (LEF) [Entered: 05/17/2019 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend the stay of proceedings in this court until 09/09/2019, in case 18-31177 [9054290-2]. [18-31177, 19-30267] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Claimant ID 100118552 and Claimant ID 100282515 in 18-31177 for stay pending appeal [9054290-2]. Date of service: 05/16/2019, via email - Attorney for Appellants: Chason, Hofferber; Attorney for Appellees: Forsyth, Haycraft, Jones, Langan, Munson, Regan, Reid, Robinson, Stanley. [18-31177, 19-30267] (William Gray Chason ) [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER granting unopposed motion to consolidate cases 18-31177 and 19-30267, filed by Appellants Claimant ID 100118552 and Claimant ID 100282515 [ # 9048140-2 ] in 18-31177. [18-31177, 19-30267] (DLJ) [Entered: 05/10/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER filed by Appellant Turbo Pump Services, Incorporated referencing Clerk Order [ # 9032022-2 ]. Date of Service: 05/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Chason; Attorney for Appellees: Forsyth, Haycraft, Jones, Munson, Reid, Robinson, Stanley [19-30267] (William Gray Chason ) [Entered: 05/03/2019 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:10-MD-2179; 2:18-CV-11118. Electronic ROA due on 05/20/2019. [19-30267] (SEE JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED 5/1/18 - DOC. 25602) (AGL) [Entered: 05/03/2019 08:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Don Keller Haycraft for Appellee BP America Production Company, Appellee BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated, Appellee BP, P.L.C. in case 19-30267 [19-30267] (AGL) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Devin Chase Reid for Appellee BP, P.L.C. in case 19-30267, Attorney Devin Chase Reid for Appellee BP America Production Company in 19-30267, Attorney Devin Chase Reid for Appellee BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated in 19-30267 [19-30267] (AGL) [Entered: 04/30/2019 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30267] (Don Keller Haycraft ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Devin Chase Reid, Esq. for BP America Production Company and BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30267] (Devin Chase Reid ) [Entered: 04/29/2019 05:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Richard C. Stanley for Appellee Patrick Juneau, in case 19-30267. [19-30267] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/24/2019 10:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney R. Stanton Jones for Appellees BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Incorporated and BP, P.L.C., in case 19-30267. [19-30267] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/23/2019 01:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30267] (Richard C. Stanley ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30267] (Kathryn Weatherly Munson ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30267] (J. David Forsyth ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 01:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30267] (John Robinson ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30267] (R. Stanton Jones ) [Entered: 04/22/2019 08:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER directing parties to file their joint designation of the record with the District Court [9032022-2]. Case Management due on 05/01/2019. [19-30267] (DLJ) [Entered: 04/17/2019 04:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. [19-30267] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Turbo Pump Services, Incorporated advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 04/17/2019, via email - Attorney for Appellant: Chason; Attorney for Appellee: Reid. [19-30267] (William Gray Chason ) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9028108-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 04/29/2019 for Appellant Turbo Pump Services, Incorporated [19-30267] (MCS) [Entered: 04/12/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Turbo Pump Services, Incorporated [19-30267] (MCS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.