This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/25/2020 at 14:10:00 (UTC).

In re: Davis Cty Cooperative, et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 In re Davis Cty Cooperative was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-4019

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ABM, INC.

STANDARD INDUSTRIES, INC.

COP COAL DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

DAVIS COUNTY COOPERATIVE

MITCHELL & ASSOCIATES

SECURITY FUNDING

WORLD ENTERPRISES

STANDARD INDUSTRIES

A-FAB ENGINEERING

APRIL MCKAY

MBSC, LLC

PPMC, INC.

FIDELITY FUNDING

LATTER DAY CHURCH OF CHRIST

Respondents

LEV ASLAN DERMEN, AKA Levon Termendzhyan

ISAIAH ELDEN KINGSTON

JACOB O. KINGSTON

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

SALLY LOUISE KINGSTON

RACHEL ANN KINGSTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Samuel Alba

Attorney at Snow, Christensen & Martineau

10 Exchange Place, 11Th Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Ryan C. Kingston

Attorney at Standard Industries

3500 South West Temple

Salt Lake City, UT 84115

Nathan Andrew Crane

Attorney at Snow, Christensen & Martineau

10 Exchange Place, 11Th Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Rodney R. Parker

Attorney at Snow, Christensen & Martineau

10 Exchange Place, 11Th Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Danica N. Cepernich

Attorney at Snow, Christensen & Martineau

10 Exchange Place, 11Th Floor

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Robert Bryan Breeze

Attorney at Law Office of Robert Breeze

292 East 3900 South, Suit #4

Salt Lake City, UT 84107

David E. Kingston

Attorney at Carl E. Kingston Law Office

3212 South State Street

Salt Lake City, UT 84115

Respondent Attorneys

Jon D. Williams

Attorney at Jon D. Williams, P.C.

9 Exchange Place, Suite 600

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Linda Moreno

Attorney at Geragos & Geragos

644 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Teny R. Geragos

Attorney at Brafman & Associates

767 Third Avenue, Floor 26

New York, NY 10017

Walter F. Bugden Jr.

Attorney at Bugden & Isaacson

445 East 200 South, Suite 150

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Tara L. Isaacson

Attorney at Bugden & Isaacson

445 East 200 South, Suite 150

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Adam Elggren

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

111 South Main Street, Suite 1800

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Leslie A. Goemaat

Attorney at Appellate Staff, Civil Division

601 D Street, N.W., Room 9550

Washington, DC 20530-0000

John Sullivan

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Ben Franklin Station, P.O. Box 972

Washington, DC 20044

Stanley J. Okula Jr.

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

601 D Street, Nw, Room 7102

Washington, DC 20004

Richard M. Rolwing

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

303 Marconi Boulevard, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

Arthur J. Ewenczyk

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

601 D St., Nw, 7110

Washington, DC 20530-0000

David Loren Washburn

Attorney at Smith Washburn

8 East Broadway, Suite 320

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Cara M. Tangaro

Attorney at Tangaro Law

35 West Broadway, Suite 203

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document #2

Addendum A

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Indictment

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #5

exhibit 4

Open Document #4

exhibit 3

Open Document #3

exhibit 2

Open Document #2

exhibit 1

Open Document #1

usdc response

Open Document

Open Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10642457-1] Denied. Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing. Written, unsigned, unpublished. Final order filed denying petition for writ of mandamus by Judges Tymkovich, Lucero and Holmes. The stay of the district court's orders is lifted. [19-4019] [Entered: 04/18/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10635792] Reply filed by COP Coal Development Company, Davis County Cooperative, Fidelity Funding and World Enterprises, PMMC, Inc.; Standard Industries; ABM, Inc,; Security Funding; MBSC, LLC; Latter Day Church of Christ; Mitchell & Associates; April McKay; Standard Industries, Inc.; A-FAB Engineering to Intervenors' Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Served on 03/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4019] DNC [Entered: 03/25/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10634017] Response filed by Jacob O. Kingston to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Served on 03/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4019] WFB [Entered: 03/18/2019 08:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10634013] Response filed by Sally Louise Kingston to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Served on 03/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4019] DLW [Entered: 03/18/2019 07:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10634011] Response filed by Lev Aslan Dermen to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Served on 03/18/2019. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-4019] MJG [Entered: 03/18/2019 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10633947] Response filed by United States of America in 19-4019 to Response in Opposition to Petition for a Writ of Mandamus. Served on 03/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 03/18/2019 by MLB to remove from 19-4018] [19-4019] APR [Entered: 03/18/2019 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10633883] Response to Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by the United States District Court for the District of Utah. Served on 03/18/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4019] [Entered: 03/18/2019 02:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10631903] Order filed by Judges Tymkovich, Lucero and Holmes. We order the parties in the underlying criminal case (the United States of America and the five defendants) to respond to the Petition within ten (10) days from the entry of this order. The District Court may also file a response to the Petition within ten (10) days if it so chooses. Petitioners may file a reply within seven (7) days after the deadline for filing responses has passed. We sua sponte order a temporary stay of the District Courts January 17, 2019, order pending further order of this court. Response due on 03/18/2019 for Lev Aslan Dermen, Isaiah Elden Kingston, Jacob O. Kingston, Rachel Ann Kingston and Sally Louise Kingston, and United States of America. Served on 03/07/2019. [19-4019] [Entered: 03/07/2019 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10631743] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Elissa Hart-Mahan and Samuel Robert Lyons for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. The parties listed are parties in the appeal and counsel in the appeal. Served on 03/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4019] [Entered: 03/07/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10631682] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Alexander Patrick Robbins and Mr. Stanley J. Okula, Jr., for United States of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 03/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4019] [Entered: 03/07/2019 11:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • [10631623] Entry of appearance submitted by Stanley J. Okula, Alexander P. Robbins for Respondent United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 03/07/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4019]--[Edited 03/07/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] APR [Entered: 03/07/2019 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • [10631492] Entry of appearance submitted by S. Robert Lyons, Elissa Hart-Mahan for Respondent United States of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 03/06/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-4019]--[Edited 03/07/2019 by JM] to remove PDF filed by the court on 3/7/19. EH [Entered: 03/06/2019 07:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10630859] Case docketed. Petition Mandamus filed. Original. c/s: y. Fee paid. Receipt # 10C004192; Amount $500.00. DATE RECEIVED: 03/04/2019. [19-4019] [Entered: 03/04/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM Company Office is a litigant

Latest cases where BROADWAY ENTERTAINMENT MARKETING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY FUNDING CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where STANDARD INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant