This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/10/2022 at 05:10:53 (UTC).

Creekview IP LLCIn re: Creekview IP LLC

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 Creekview IP LLCIn re Creekview IP LLC was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    23-108

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: CREEKVIEW IP LLC

Respondents

JABRA CORP.

SKULLCANDY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

David R. Bennett Esq.

Respondent Attorneys

Anne Shea Gaza Esq.

J. Jeffrey Gunn

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 11/30/2022. [887442] Entry of Appearance due 12/15/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/15/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 12/01/2022 10:02 AM]

2 #1

Petition for Writ of Mandamus

#2

Appendix

#3

(#3) Notice from Petitioner Creekview IP LLC Regarding New Order and Remark by the District Court. Service: 12/01/2022 by email. [887683] [23-108] [David Bennett] [Entered: 12/01/2022 07:30 PM]

#4

(#4) ORDER filed; Defendants Jabra Corporation and Skullcandy Inc. are directed to respond to the petition no later than December 9, 2022, whether defendants fully defend, partly defend, or decline to defend the challenged order. Any reply from petitioner to defendants' filing is due no later than December 13, 2022. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [887843] [LMS] [Entered: 12/02/2022 12:10 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER filed; Defendants Jabra Corporation and Skullcandy Inc. are directed to respond to the petition no later than December 9, 2022, whether defendants fully defend, partly defend, or decline to defend the challenged order. Any reply from petitioner to defendants' filing is due no later than December 13, 2022. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [887843] [LMS] [Entered: 12/02/2022 12:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice from Petitioner Creekview IP LLC Regarding New Order and Remark by the District Court. Service: 12/01/2022 by email. [887683] [23-108] [David Bennett] [Entered: 12/01/2022 07:30 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner Creekview IP LLC for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 11/30/2022 by email. [887444] [ALK] [Entered: 12/01/2022 10:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 11/30/2022. [887442] Entry of Appearance due 12/15/2022. Certificate of Interest is due on 12/15/2022. [ALK] [Entered: 12/01/2022 10:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less