This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/01/2023 at 15:31:02 (UTC).

In re: Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp Derivative Lit

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 In re Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp Derivative Lit was filed as a Contract - Security lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-3027

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

In re: COGNIZANT TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS CORP DERIVATIVE LITIGATION

Plaintiff / Appellants

JOHN LAUTZENHEISER, Derivatively on behalf of Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp.

MICHAEL S. GRANIERO, III, Derivatively on behalf of Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp.

JOSH SCHAUFELBERGER

BRIAN HAYDEN

TIM KEELEY

ROBERT CALHOUN

GLYN RAMAGE

ROBERT GREEN

STEVEN TYLER

MICHAEL TESTERMAN, Trustees of the Employers & Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Pension Fund, Derivatively on behalf of Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp

JAMES B. HOY, as Trustee and Beneficiary of the James B. Hoy & Marjorie A. Hoy TTEES FBO Marjorie A. Hoy Rev Liv Trust

Defendant / Appellees

COGNIZANT TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS CORP

GORDON COBURN

STEVEN E. SCHWARTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William B. Federman Esq.

Matthew F. Gately Esq.

Benny C. Goodman Esq. III

Steven Hubachek Esq.

Erik W. Luedeke Esq.

Peter S. Pearlman Esq.

Robert B. Weiser Esq.

James M. Ficaro Esq.

Britt W. Sowle Esq.

Gary S. Graifman Esq.

Melissa A. Fortunato Esq.

Ligaya T. Hernandez Esq.

Michael J. Hynes Esq.

James S. Notis Esq.

Jennifer Sarnelli Esq.

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Charles A. Brown Esq.

William M. Jay Esq.

James H. Keale Esq.

Alison R. Benedon Esq.

Theodore V. Wells Esq. Jr.

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#22

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Steven Tyler, Josh Schaufelberger, Brian Hayden, Tim Keeley, Robert Calhoun, Glyn Ramage, Robert Green, Michael Testerman, John Lautzenheiser, Michael S. Graniero, III and James B. Hoy. [22-3027] (SH) [Entered: 11/14/2022 01:55 PM]

#44

(#44) ORDER (Clerk) The motion to file opening brief under seal is referred to the merits panel. The Clerk will hold the unredacted version of Appellants' opening brief provisionally under seal pending a ruling by the Court. (CJG) [Entered: 03/10/2023 01:42 PM]

#42

(#42) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Joint Motion filed by Appellees Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp, Gordon Coburn and Steven E. Schwartz for Extension of Time to file Appellees' Briefs. Certificate of Service dated 03/03/2023. Service made by ECF. [22-3027]--[Edited 03/06/2023 by CJG] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/03/2023 04:56 PM]

#40

(#40) ECF FILER: REDACTED ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Robert Calhoun, Michael S. Graniero, III, Robert Green, Brian Hayden, James B. Hoy, Tim Keeley, John Lautzenheiser, Glyn Ramage, Josh Schaufelberger, Michael Testerman and Steven Tyler. Certificate of Service dated 02/24/2023 by ECF. [22-3027] (SH) [Entered: 02/24/2023 06:44 PM]

#36

(#36) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William Evans on behalf of Appellee(s) Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp., Zein Abdalla, Maureen Breakiron-Evans, Jonathan Chadwick, Ramakrishnan Chandrasekaran, Francisco D'Souza, John N. Fox, Leo S. Mackay, Jr., Karen McLoughlin, Rajeev Mehta, Lakshmi Narayanan, Michael Patsalos-Fox,. [22-3027] (WE) [Entered: 02/22/2023 04:15 PM]

#35

(#35) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah Efronson on behalf of Appellee(s) Gordon Coburn. [22-3027] (SDE) [Entered: 02/21/2023 02:55 PM]

34 #2

Non-Criminal Appendix Volume II

34 #1

Non-Criminal Appendix

#33

RESTRICTED

#32

RESTRICTED

#31

No Description Available

#30

No Description Available

#28

No Description Available

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ORDER (Clerk) The motion to file opening brief under seal is referred to the merits panel. The Clerk will hold the unredacted version of Appellants' opening brief provisionally under seal pending a ruling by the Court. (CJG) [Entered: 03/10/2023 01:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Docket(#43) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) granting unopposed motion by all Appellees for extension of time to file their briefs until 04/19/2023. (NMB) [Entered: 03/08/2023 04:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ECF FILER: UNOPPOSED Joint Motion filed by Appellees Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp, Gordon Coburn and Steven E. Schwartz for Extension of Time to file Appellees' Briefs. Certificate of Service dated 03/03/2023. Service made by ECF. [22-3027]--[Edited 03/06/2023 by CJG] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/03/2023 04:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Docket(#41) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Robert Calhoun, Michael S. Graniero, III, Robert Green, Brian Hayden, James B. Hoy, Tim Keeley, John Lautzenheiser, Glyn Ramage, Josh Schaufelberger, Michael Testerman and Steven Tyler - Redacted Brief. Copies: 1. (KEL) [Entered: 02/28/2023 03:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ECF FILER: REDACTED ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Robert Calhoun, Michael S. Graniero, III, Robert Green, Brian Hayden, James B. Hoy, Tim Keeley, John Lautzenheiser, Glyn Ramage, Josh Schaufelberger, Michael Testerman and Steven Tyler. Certificate of Service dated 02/24/2023 by ECF. [22-3027] (SH) [Entered: 02/24/2023 06:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Docket(#39) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Robert Calhoun, Michael S. Graniero, III, Robert Green, Brian Hayden, James B. Hoy, Tim Keeley, John Lautzenheiser, Glyn Ramage, Josh Schaufelberger, Michael Testerman and Steven Tyler - SEALED Appendix (SA1 - SA125). Copies: 4. Volumes: 1 (EAF) [Entered: 02/23/2023 12:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Docket(#38) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Robert Calhoun, Michael S. Graniero, III, Robert Green, Brian Hayden, James B. Hoy, Tim Keeley, John Lautzenheiser, Glyn Ramage, Josh Schaufelberger, Michael Testerman and Steven Tyler - Joint Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 2 (EAF) [Entered: 02/23/2023 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Docket(#37) HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellants Robert Calhoun, Michael S. Graniero, III, Robert Green, Brian Hayden, James B. Hoy, Tim Keeley, John Lautzenheiser, Glyn Ramage, Josh Schaufelberger, Michael Testerman and Steven Tyler - Brief. (FILED UNDER SEAL) Copies: 7. (KEL) [Entered: 02/22/2023 04:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from William Evans on behalf of Appellee(s) Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp., Zein Abdalla, Maureen Breakiron-Evans, Jonathan Chadwick, Ramakrishnan Chandrasekaran, Francisco D'Souza, John N. Fox, Leo S. Mackay, Jr., Karen McLoughlin, Rajeev Mehta, Lakshmi Narayanan, Michael Patsalos-Fox,. [22-3027] (WE) [Entered: 02/22/2023 04:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sarah Efronson on behalf of Appellee(s) Gordon Coburn. [22-3027] (SDE) [Entered: 02/21/2023 02:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Steven Tyler, Josh Schaufelberger, Brian Hayden, Tim Keeley, Robert Calhoun, Glyn Ramage, Robert Green, Michael Testerman, John Lautzenheiser, Michael S. Graniero, III and James B. Hoy. [22-3027] (SH) [Entered: 11/14/2022 01:55 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew D. Stachel on behalf of Appellee(s) Steven E. Schwartz. [22-3027] (MDS) [Entered: 11/14/2022 12:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Theodore V. Wells, Jr. on behalf of Appellee(s) Steven E. Schwartz. [22-3027] (TVW) [Entered: 11/14/2022 12:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Erik W. Luedeke on behalf of Appellant(s) Steven Tyler, Josh Shaufelberger, Brian Hayden, Tim Keeley, Robert Calhoun, Glyn Ramage, Robert Green, Michael Testerman, in their capacities as Trustees of the Employers & Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Pension Fund, John Lautzenheiser, Michael S. Graniero. [22-3027] (EWL) [Entered: 11/09/2022 05:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Benny C. Goodman III on behalf of Appellant(s) Steven Tyler, Josh Shaufelberger, Brian Hayden, Tim Keeley, Robert Calhoun, Glyn Ramage, Robert Green, Michael Testerman, in their capacities as Trustees of the Employers & Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Pension Fund, John Lautzenheiser, Michael S. Graniero. [22-3027] (BCG) [Entered: 11/09/2022 05:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Steven F. Hubachek on behalf of Appellant(s) Steven Tyler, Josh Shaufelberger, Brian Hayden, Tim Keeley, Robert Calhoun, Glyn Ramage, Robert Green, Michael Testerman, in their capacities as Trustees of the Employers & Laborers Locals 100 and 397 Pension Fund, John Lautzenheiser, Michael S. Graniero. [22-3027] (SH) [Entered: 11/09/2022 05:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Peter S. Pearlman, Esq. on behalf of Appellant(s) Josh Schaufelberger Brian Hayden Tim Keeley Robert Calhoun Glyn Ramage, Robert Green Steven Tyler Michael Testerman John Lautzenheiser Michael S.Graniero IIII James B. Hoy. [22-3027] (PSP) [Entered: 11/07/2022 01:54 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) For all parties represented by Charles A. Brown, Esq., or any other attorney from Goodwin Procter LLP, the designated filer shall be Cognizant Technology Solutions Corp. (CJG) [Entered: 10/31/2022 10:16 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CJG) [Entered: 10/31/2022 10:11 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Robert Calhoun, Michael S. Graniero, III, Robert Green, Brian Hayden, James B. Hoy, Marjorie A. Hoy, Tim Keeley, John Lautzenheiser, Glyn Ramage, Josh Schaufelberger, Michael Testerman and Steven Tyler in District Court No. 2-17-cv-01248. (CJG) [Entered: 10/31/2022 10:06 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less