This case was last updated from PACER on 04/03/2021 at 05:12:19 (UTC).

Charles Duff, et al v. Newrez, LLC, et alIn re: Charles Duff, et al v. Newrez, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 Charles Duff filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Newrez, LLC, In re Charles Duff. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-60022

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Appellants

CHARLES L. DUFF

CATHRYN DUFF

Debtor

In re: CHARLES L. DUFF

Appellees

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

LANDSAFE, INC.

LANDSAFE APPRAISAL, INC.

COUNTRYWIDE FINANCIAL CORPORATION

NEWREZ, LLC, DBA Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing

COUNTRYWIDE BANK, N.A.

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS, INC.

BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Jon Borderud

Attorney at Law Offices of Jon W. Borderud

7 West Figueroa Street

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Appellee Attorneys

Elizabeth Christine Hehir

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Deleyla Lawrence

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Payam Khodadadi Esquire

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

1800 Century Park East, 8Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Tanya Greene

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

355 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 4200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Bradford E. Klein Esquire

Attorney at ZBS Law, LLP

30 Corporate Park, Suite 450

Irvine, CA 92606

Robert Martin Shaughnessy

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

501 West Broadway, Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#1

Main Document

1 #2

Mediation Letter

1 #3

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) BAP Payment of docket fee received. Receipt or check number: 1108. Date paid: 03/25/2021. Amount paid: USD 505.00. Fee status: [Case Number 21-60022: Paid]. [12053771] (BY) [Entered: 03/25/2021 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. Setting schedule as follows: Appellants Cathryn Duff and Charles L. Duff Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/01/2021. Appellants Cathryn Duff and Charles L. Duff opening brief due 05/13/2021. Appellees Bank of America Corporation, Bank of New York Mellon, Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC, Countrywide Bank, N.A., Countrywide Financial Corporation, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., LandSafe Appraisal, Inc., LandSafe, Inc. and Newrez, LLC answering brief due 06/14/2021 Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12053531] (BG) [Entered: 03/25/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Landsafe, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CoreLogic Valuation Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant