This case was last updated from PACER on 06/29/2021 at 06:41:01 (UTC).

In re: Boy Scouts of America, et al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 In re Boy Scouts of America was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1792

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

WESTCHESTER FIRE INSURANCE CO

WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE CO

CENTURY INDEMNITY CO, as successor to CCI Insurance Company, as successor to Insurance Company of North America and Indemnity Insurance Company of North America

Debtor / Appellees

DELAWARE BSA LLC

In re: BOY SCOUTS OF AMERICA, a/k/a BSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Tancred V. Schiavoni Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

7 Times Square, Time Square Tower, 33Rd Floor

New York, NY 10036

Stamatios Stamoulis Esq.

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt

800 North West Street, 3Rd Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jonathan D. Hacker Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Andrew Kirschenbaum Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

7 Times Square, Time Square Tower, 33Rd Floor

New York, NY 10036

Bradley N. Garcia Esq.

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Debtor / Appellee Attorneys

Joseph C. Barsalona Esq. II

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Michael C. Andolina Esq.

Attorney at White & Case

111 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 33130

Matthew E. Linder Esq.

Attorney at White & Case

111 South Wacker Drive, Suite 5100

Chicago, IL 33130

Andrew R. Remming Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Paige N. Topper Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Derek C. Abbott Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Jessica C. Lauria Esq.

Attorney at White & Case

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Eric W. Moats Esq.

Attorney at Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell

1201 North Market Street, 16Th Floor, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA LLC to Response, Response. Certificate of Service dated 05/27/2021. [21-1792] (DCA) [Entered: 05/27/2021 07:35 PM]

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co to Response. Certificate of Service dated 05/20/2021. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/20/2021 01:16 PM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA LLC to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 05/14/2021. [21-1792] (DCA) [Entered: 05/14/2021 08:37 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 05/14/2021. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 07:23 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA LLC. [21-1792] (DCA) [Entered: 05/14/2021 07:14 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Derek C. Abbott on behalf of Appellee(s) Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. [21-1792] (DCA) [Entered: 05/14/2021 06:30 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:43 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:36 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:28 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:21 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bradley N. Garcia on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-1792] (BNG) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:14 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tancred Schiavoni on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-1792] (TVS) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:03 PM]

#4

(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan D. Hacker on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 03:42 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER (Clerk) advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (AMR) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:56 AM]

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

1 #4

Case Caption

1 #3

District Court Order

1 #2

District Court Memorandum Opinion

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA LLC to Response, Response. Certificate of Service dated 05/27/2021. [21-1792] (DCA) [Entered: 05/27/2021 07:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co to Response. Certificate of Service dated 05/20/2021. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/20/2021 01:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellees Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA LLC to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 05/14/2021. [21-1792] (DCA) [Entered: 05/14/2021 08:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 05/14/2021. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 07:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellees Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA LLC. [21-1792] (DCA) [Entered: 05/14/2021 07:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Derek C. Abbott on behalf of Appellee(s) Boy Scouts of America and Delaware BSA, LLC. [21-1792] (DCA) [Entered: 05/14/2021 06:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co advising this court that no transcripts are available. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Bradley N. Garcia on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-1792] (BNG) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Tancred Schiavoni on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company, and Westchester Surplus Insurance Company. [21-1792] (TVS) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jonathan D. Hacker on behalf of Appellant(s) Century Indemnity Company, Westchester Fire Insurance Company and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company. [21-1792] (JDH) [Entered: 05/14/2021 03:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (AMR) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Century Indemnity Co, Westchester Fire Insurance Co and Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Co in District Court No. 1-20-cv-00774. (AMR) [Entered: 04/30/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delaware BSA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Westchester Fire Insurance Company is a litigant