This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/25/2023 at 10:08:18 (UTC).

In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 In Re Bernard L Madoff Investment Securities LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-3006

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendants

Russell Oasis

Tamiami Tower Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellee

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff

Intervenor

SIPC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Defendant / Appellant

RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

David J. Sheehan Esq.

Seanna R. Brown Esq.

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.

Intervenor Attorneys

Kevin H. Bell Esq.

Nathanael Kelley Esq.

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Matthew J. Conigliaro Esq.

 

Court Documents

#58

(#58) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Intervenor SIPC Brief due date as 06/15/2023, FILED.[3495178] [22-3006] [Entered: 04/06/2023 09:34 AM]

#52

(#52) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of SIPC, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 03/30/2023 by CM/ECF.[3491676] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/30/2023 08:43 AM]

#46

(#46) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Irving H. Picard Brief due date as 06/15/2023, FILED.[3489266] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/24/2023 03:15 PM]

#44

(#44) PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED. Service date 03/23/2023 by CM/ECF. [3488296] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/23/2023 11:38 AM]

#43

(#43) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Page Proof Brief, [40], on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED.[3487602] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/22/2023 11:07 AM]

#41

(#41) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 03/20/2023 by CM/ECF.[3486073] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/20/2023 11:19 AM]

#39

(#39) SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, to fiile a deferred appendix pursuant to FRAP 30(c) ansd Local Rule 30.1(c), FILED.[3484758] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/16/2023 02:14 PM]

#36

(#36) NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, re: filing a deferred appendix, RECEIVED. Service date 03/16/2023 by CM/ECF.[3484379] [22-3006]--[Edited 03/16/2023 by EM] [Entered: 03/16/2023 09:26 AM]

#35

No Description Available

#34

No Description Available

#33

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#25

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#17

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Intervenor SIPC Brief due date as 06/15/2023, FILED.[3495178] [22-3006] [Entered: 04/06/2023 09:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of SIPC, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 03/30/2023 by CM/ECF.[3491676] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/30/2023 08:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) CURED DEFECTIVE: BRIEF, [ # 44 ], on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED.[3489327] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/24/2023 03:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Irving H. Picard Brief due date as 06/15/2023, FILED.[3489266] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/24/2023 03:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED. Service date 03/23/2023 by CM/ECF. [3488296] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/23/2023 11:38 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Page Proof Brief, [40], on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED.[3487602] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/22/2023 11:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 03/20/2023 by CM/ECF.[3486073] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/20/2023 11:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • Docket(#40) PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED. Service date 03/16/2023 by CM/ECF. [3485034] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/16/2023 06:56 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, to fiile a deferred appendix pursuant to FRAP 30(c) ansd Local Rule 30.1(c), FILED.[3484758] [22-3006] [Entered: 03/16/2023 02:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, re: filing a deferred appendix, RECEIVED. Service date 03/16/2023 by CM/ECF.[3484379] [22-3006]--[Edited 03/16/2023 by EM] [Entered: 03/16/2023 09:26 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-3006, [ # 10 ], ADDED.[3428950] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-3006, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3428947] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 11/30/2022 by CM/ECF. [3428681] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 11/30/2022 by CM/ECF. [3428674] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 01:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 11/30/2022 by CM/ECF.[3428664] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., district court receipt # ANYSDC-27000124, FILED.[3427073] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3427066] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/24/2022, RECEIVED.[3427063] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/23/2022, RECEIVED.[3427061] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED. [3427043] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less