This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/07/2023 at 06:04:02 (UTC).

In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 In Re Bernard L Madoff Investment Securities LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-3006

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendants

Russell Oasis

Tamiami Tower Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellee

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff

Intervenor

SIPC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Defendant / Appellant

RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Seanna R. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

David J. Sheehan Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Intervenor Attorneys

Kevin H. Bell Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Nathanael Kelley Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellant Attorney

Matthew J. Conigliaro Esq.

Attorney at Carlton Fields, P.A.

4221 West Boy Scout Boulevard

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd. Brief due date as 03/16/2023. Joint Appendix due date as 03/16/2023, FILED.[3451042] [22-3006] [Entered: 01/11/2023 05:51 PM]

#29

(#29) NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[3442285] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/22/2022 03:47 PM]

#26

(#26) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., informing Court of proposed due date 03/16/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 12/21/2022 by CM/ECF.[3441491] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/21/2022 04:23 PM]

#25

(#25) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of SIPC, FILED. Service date 12/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3437215] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/15/2022 08:39 AM]

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of SIPC, FILED. Service date 12/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3435050] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/12/2022 01:10 PM]

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of SIPC, FILED. Service date 12/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3435044] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/12/2022 01:06 PM]

#17

(#17) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/08/2022 by CM/ECF.[3433312] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/08/2022 01:40 PM]

#16

(#20) CURED DEFECTIVE Form C [ # 16 ], [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED.[3437022] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:59 PM]

#15

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#10

(#12) ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-3006, [ # 10 ], ADDED.[3428950] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:18 PM]

#9

(#11) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-3006, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3428947] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:16 PM]

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 11/30/2022 by CM/ECF.[3428664] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 01:15 PM]

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/24/2022, RECEIVED.[3427063] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:36 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/23/2022, RECEIVED.[3427061] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:35 PM]

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd. Brief due date as 03/16/2023. Joint Appendix due date as 03/16/2023, FILED.[3451042] [22-3006] [Entered: 01/11/2023 05:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[3442285] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/22/2022 03:47 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., informing Court of proposed due date 03/16/2023, RECEIVED. Service date 12/21/2022 by CM/ECF.[3441491] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/21/2022 04:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of SIPC, FILED. Service date 12/15/2022 by CM/ECF.[3437215] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/15/2022 08:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ATTORNEY, Nathanael Kelley for SIPC, in case 22-3006, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[3437033] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/14/2022 04:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY, Kevin H. Bell, [ # 18 ], in place of attorney Kenneth J. Caputo, SUBSTITUTED.[3437029] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/14/2022 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CURED DEFECTIVE Form C [ # 16 ], [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED.[3437022] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/14/2022 03:59 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of SIPC, FILED. Service date 12/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3435050] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/12/2022 01:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of SIPC, FILED. Service date 12/12/2022 by CM/ECF. [3435044] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/12/2022 01:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/08/2022 by CM/ECF.[3433312] [22-3006] [Entered: 12/08/2022 01:40 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY, Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-3006, [ # 10 ], ADDED.[3428950] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown for Irving H. Picard, in case 22-3006, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[3428947] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 05:16 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 11/30/2022 by CM/ECF. [3428681] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 01:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 11/30/2022 by CM/ECF. [3428674] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 01:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 11/30/2022 by CM/ECF.[3428664] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/30/2022 01:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#5) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., district court receipt # ANYSDC-27000124, FILED.[3427073] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3427066] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/24/2022, RECEIVED.[3427063] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 09/23/2022, RECEIVED.[3427061] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant RAR Entrepreneurial Fund, Ltd., FILED. [3427043] [22-3006] [Entered: 11/28/2022 03:27 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less