This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2022 at 16:05:33 (UTC).

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Inves

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 In re Bernard L Madoff Inves was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2291

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., AKA The Royal Bank of Scotland N.V.

Respondent

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC,

Intervenor

Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michael Feldberg Esq.

Attorney at Reichman Jorgensen Lehman & Feldberg LLP

750 3Rd Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Respondent Attorneys

Seanna R. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Patrick Thomas Campbell

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Intervenor Attorneys

Nathanael Kelley Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kenneth Joseph Caputo Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kevin H. Bell Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#61

(#61) MOTION ORDER, denying as moot motion for leave to appeal (28 U.S.C. 158(d)) [ # 1 ] filed by Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., FILED. [3201489][61] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/28/2021 11:46 AM]

#58

(#58) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 10/27/2021, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3201071] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:34 PM]

#57

(#57) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, by DC, FILED.[3201067] [20-2291]--[Edited 10/27/2021 by KYY] [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:32 PM]

#56

(#56) NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[3200958] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/27/2021 03:16 PM]

#51

(#51) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 10/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3199990] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:54 PM]

#49

(#49) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 10/26/2021 by CM/ECF. [3199890] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:05 PM]

#48

#46

36 #2

Exhibit A - Reply in Support of Permission to Appeal

36 #1

Motion FILED

#18

#17

#16

#13

#11

#10

#2

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MOTION ORDER, denying as moot motion for leave to appeal (28 U.S.C. 158(d)) [ # 1 ] filed by Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., FILED. [3201489][61] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/28/2021 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 10/27/2021, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3201071] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, with prejudice, by DC, FILED.[3201067] [20-2291]--[Edited 10/27/2021 by KYY] [Entered: 10/27/2021 04:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[3200958] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/27/2021 03:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) FRAP 42 STIPULATION, With Prejudice, RECEIVED. Service date 10/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3199990] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ATTORNEY, Patrick Thomas Campbell for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-2291, [ # 49 ], ADDED.[3199958] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 10/26/2021 by CM/ECF. [3199890] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/26/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file replies [ # 36 ]; deferring motion for leave to appeal pending resolution of the appeals docketed under 2d Cir. 20-1333 and 20-1334, [ # 1 ]; filed by Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., by BDP, DC, JAR, FILED. [2946671][48] [20-2291] [Entered: 10/06/2020 06:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2935668] [20-2291] [Entered: 09/22/2020 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file a reply to the panel that will determine the merits of the petition, [ # 36 ] filed by Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., FILED. [2900763][41] [20-2291] [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 07/30/2020 by CM/ECF. [2896544] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [15], on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED.[2896512] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [14], on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED.[2896496] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#15) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 07/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2896464] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 07/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2896459] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 07/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2896455] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/30/2020 02:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., FILED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF.[2895369] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/29/2020 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 07/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2894098] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/28/2020 01:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION, to expedite appeal, on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., FILED. Service date 07/21/2020 by US mail.[2889168] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION, for leave to appeal (28 U.S.C. 158(d)), on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank, N.V., FILED. Service date 07/21/2020 by US mail.[2889151] [20-2291] [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, is a litigant

Latest cases where Securities Investor Protection Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Royal Bank of Scotland PLC is a litigant