This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2021 at 06:59:53 (UTC).

In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Inves

Case Summary

On 03/01/2019 In Re Bernard L Madoff Inves was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-510

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Defendant

Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement dated August 29, 1984

Defendant / Appellants

The Estate of Marianne Lowrey

Marianne B. Lowrey Trust

Jessica Lee Lowrey, individually, in her capacity as personal representative of the Estate of Marianne Lowrey, in her capacity as trustee for the Marianne B. Lowrey Trust and in her capacity as successor partner

Turtle Cay Partners

Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984

Larry B. Alexander, in his capacity as personal representative of the Estate of Marianne Lowrey, in his capacity as trustee for the Marianne B. Lowrey Trust and in his capacity as successor partner of Coldbroo

Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, individually, in her capacity as personal representative of the Estate of Marianne Lowrey, in her capacity as trustee for the Marianne B. Lowrey Trust and in her capacity as successor pa

James Lowrey, capacity as general partner of Turtle Cay Partners, capacity as personal rep of Estate Of Marianne Lowrey, capacity as trustee for Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, & capacity as Successor Partner Coldbrook Associates Partner

Coldbrook Associates Partnership, individually and in its capacity as general partner of Turtle Cay Partners

Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan

Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement dated August 29, 1984

Intervenor

Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellee

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Richard A. Kirby Esq.

Attorney at R K Invest Law, PBC

1725 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Beth-Ann Roth Esq.

Attorney at R K Invest Law, PBC

1725 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Intervenor Attorneys

Kenneth Joseph Caputo Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Nathanael Kelley Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Seanna R. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Keith R. Murphy

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

David J. Sheehan Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#146

144 #2

Opinion

144 #1

Judgment Mandate ISSUED

#143

#139

#138

#137

#136

#132

131 #3

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_2

131 #2

Bill_of_Cost_Itemized_Notice_1

131 #1

Opinion FILED

#13

#12

#10

#9

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#3

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 05/03/2021, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 20-1382, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[3093099] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2980025] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 11/23/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) ORDER, petition for panel rehearing, or, in the alternative, for rehearing en banc denied, FILED.[2975264] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Emanuel Gettinger, James Lowrey, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Turtle Cay Partners, United Congregations Mesora, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson and Zev Wolfson in 19-429, Appellant United Congregations Mesora in 19-443, Appellant Emmanuel Gettinger, South Ferry #2 LP, Aaron Wolfson and Abraham Wolfson in 19-501, Appellant Coldbrook Associates Partnership, James Lowrey, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey and Turtle Cay Partners in 19-510, FILED. Service date 10/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2948502] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 10/08/2020 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[2939556] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[2939555] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#141) JUDGMENT, FILED.[2937980] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/24/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2937494] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/24/2020 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, by JMW, JAC, RDS, FILED.[2937487] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/24/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#133) CASE, before JMW, JAC, RDS, HEARD.[2811632] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 03/31/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2510978] [19-510] [Entered: 03/05/2019 05:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2510961] [19-510] [Entered: 03/05/2019 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown, [ # 10 ], in place of attorney Geraldine E. Ponto, SUBSTITUTED.[2510463] [19-510] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2510461] [19-510] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2510458] [19-510] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • (#8) NEW PARTY, Intervenor Securities Investor Protection Corporation, ADDED.[2510447] [19-510] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2508333] [19-510] [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Larry B. Alexander, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984 and Turtle Cay Partners, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16372604, FILED.[2508332] [19-510] [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT CLERK'S JUDGMENT, dated 02/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2508330] [19-510] [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Larry B. Alexander, Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Whitney Hanlon Lowrey Gaeta, Tracy McDonald Lowrey Lenehan, James Lowrey, Jessica Lee Lowrey, Marianne B. Lowrey Trust, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Trust Created for the Benefit of Jessica Lee Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Tracy McDonald Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement dated August 29, 1984, Trust Created for the Benefit of Whitney Hanlon Lowrey under Article Second of a Certain Trust Agreement Dated August 29, 1984 and Turtle Cay Partners, FILED. [2508328] [19-510] [Entered: 03/01/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coldbrook Associates Partnership is a litigant

Latest cases where Securities Investor Protection Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith R. Murphy