This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/02/2022 at 06:18:55 (UTC).

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Inves

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 In re Bernard L Madoff Inves was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1898

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FKA Fortis Prime Fund Solutions Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd.

ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd.

Respondent

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation,

Intervenor

Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Melissa Arbus Sherry Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Thomas Giblin Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Christopher R. Harris Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

1271 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Eric Konopka Esq.

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Respondent Attorneys

Seanna R. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Roy T. Englert Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck & Untereiner LLP

2000 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Matthew M. Madden

Attorney at Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck & Untereiner LLP

2000 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

David J. Sheehan Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Intervenor Attorneys

Nathanael Kelley Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kevin H. Bell Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kenneth Joseph Caputo Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#84

(#84) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 02/03/2022, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3255223] [20-1898] [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:50 AM]

#83

(#83) LEAVE TO APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 02/03/2022, DENIED.[3255218] [20-1898] [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:45 AM]

#82

(#82) NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[3255213] [20-1898] [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:40 AM]

#78

(#78) SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3246969] [20-1898] [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:08 PM]

#74

(#74) MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file reply in support of updated petition for leave to appeal to the merits panel, [ # 71 ], filed by Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. [3195141][74] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/19/2021 10:39 AM]

#71

(#71) MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 10/18/2021 by CM/ECF. [3194897] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/18/2021 07:42 PM]

#67

(#67) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 50 ], on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 10/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3190808] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/12/2021 05:09 PM]

#64

(#64) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 10/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3190345] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/12/2021 12:07 PM]

#63

(#65) ATTORNEY, Matthew M. Madden for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1898, [ # 63 ], ADDED.[3190348] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/12/2021 12:10 PM]

#60

No Description Available

#59

No Description Available

#51

No Description Available

#50

(#67) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 50 ], on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 10/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3190808] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/12/2021 05:09 PM]

#49

#48

#46

#42

#36

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 02/03/2022, determining the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][3255223] [20-1898] [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) LEAVE TO APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 02/03/2022, DENIED.[3255218] [20-1898] [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) NEW CASE MANAGER, Khadijah Young, ASSIGNED.[3255213] [20-1898] [Entered: 02/03/2022 11:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) SUBMITTED NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[3246969] [20-1898] [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) MOTION ORDER, referring motion to file reply in support of updated petition for leave to appeal to the merits panel, [ # 71 ], filed by Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. [3195141][74] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/19/2021 10:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) MOTION, to file document, on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 10/18/2021 by CM/ECF. [3194897] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/18/2021 07:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 50 ], on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 10/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3190808] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/12/2021 05:09 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ATTORNEY, Roy T. Englert Jr. for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1898, [ # 64 ], ADDED.[3190350] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/12/2021 12:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ATTORNEY, Matthew M. Madden for Irving H. Picard, in case 20-1898, [ # 63 ], ADDED.[3190348] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/12/2021 12:10 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 10/12/2021 by CM/ECF. [3190345] [20-1898] [Entered: 10/12/2021 12:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ATTORNEY, Christopher R Harris for ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd., in case 20-1898 , [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2870310] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/24/2020 05:19 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870265] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:35 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF. [2870255] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:28 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2870250] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/24/2020 04:24 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 12 ], on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED.[2870077] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/24/2020 02:37 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2870056] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/24/2020 02:22 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [10], on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED.[2870003] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/24/2020 01:36 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Respondent Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 06/24/2020 by CM/ECF.[2869924] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/24/2020 12:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION, to expedite motion, on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by email, US mail.[2865922] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/18/2020 05:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION, for leave to appeal (28 U.S.C. 158(d)), on behalf of Petitioner ABN AMRO Bank (Ireland) Ltd. and ABN AMRO Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd., FILED. Service date 06/18/2020 by US mail, email.[2865912] [20-1898] [Entered: 06/18/2020 05:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less