This case was last updated from PACER on 10/24/2021 at 06:56:25 (UTC).

In Re: Bernard L. Madoff Inves

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 In Re Bernard L Madoff Inves was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-501

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellants and Defendants

South Ferry Building Company

Zev Wolfson

South Ferry #2 LP

Aaron Wolfson

Emmanuel Gettinger

Abraham Wolfson

Intervenor

Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Plaintiff / Appellee

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Richard A. Kirby Esq.

Attorney at R K Invest Law, PBC

1725 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Beth-Ann Roth Esq.

Attorney at R K Invest Law, PBC

1725 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Intervenor Attorneys

Kenneth Joseph Caputo Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Josephine Wang Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Keith R. Murphy

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Seanna R. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

David J. Sheehan Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#158) U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE, dated 05/03/2021, U.S. Supreme Court docket # 20-1382, stating the petition for writ of certiorari is denied, RECEIVED.[3093099] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 05/04/2021 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#156) JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2980025] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 11/23/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) ORDER, petition for panel rehearing, or, in the alternative, for rehearing en banc denied, FILED.[2975264] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 11/16/2020 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC, on behalf of Appellant Coldbrook Associates Partnership, Emanuel Gettinger, James Lowrey, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey, Turtle Cay Partners, United Congregations Mesora, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson and Zev Wolfson in 19-429, Appellant United Congregations Mesora in 19-443, Appellant Emmanuel Gettinger, South Ferry #2 LP, Aaron Wolfson and Abraham Wolfson in 19-501, Appellant Coldbrook Associates Partnership, James Lowrey, The Estate of Marianne Lowrey and Turtle Cay Partners in 19-510, FILED. Service date 10/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2948502] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 10/08/2020 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[2939556] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with internet citation, ATTACHED.[2939555] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/28/2020 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) JUDGMENT, FILED.[2937980] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/24/2020 02:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2937494] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/24/2020 09:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) OPINION, affirming the judgment of the district court, by JMW, JAC, RDS, FILED.[2937487] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 09/24/2020 08:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#139) CASE, before JMW, JAC, RDS, HEARD.[2811632] [19-429, 19-443, 19-501, 19-510] [Entered: 03/31/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2510958] [19-501] [Entered: 03/05/2019 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY, Seanna R. Brown, [ # 12 ], in place of attorney Keith R. Murphy, SUBSTITUTED.[2510457] [19-501] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF. [2510455] [19-501] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 03/05/2019 by CM/ECF.[2510449] [19-501] [Entered: 03/05/2019 12:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) LETTER, dated 03/01/2019, on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation, informing the Court they should be added as a party to the case, RECEIVED. Service date 03/01/2019 by email.[2509063] [19-501] [Entered: 03/01/2019 04:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2507417] [19-501] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • (#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Emmanuel Gettinger, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson and Zev Wolfson, district court receipt # ANYSDC-16372650, FILED.[2507410] [19-501] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 02/08/2019, RECEIVED.[2507407] [19-501] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 02/27/2019, RECEIVED.[2507405] [19-501] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Emmanuel Gettinger, South Ferry #2 LP, South Ferry Building Company, Aaron Wolfson, Abraham Wolfson and Zev Wolfson, FILED. [2507394] [19-501] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where South Ferry #2 LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Securities Investor Protection Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, is a litigant