This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2022 at 16:07:00 (UTC).

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Inves

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 In re Bernard L Madoff Inves was filed as a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-872

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC

Defendant

Goodman Charitable Foundation, in its capacity as a limited Partner of JABA Associates LP

Plaintiff / Appellees

Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff

Defendant / Appellants

JABA Associates LP

Andrew Goodman, in his capaicty as a general Partner of JABA Associates LP

The Estate of James Goodman

Audrey M. Goodman, in her capacity as a general and limited Partner of JABA Associates LP, and in her capacity as Personal Representative of the Estate of James Goodman

Bruce Goodman, in his capacity as a general Partner of JABA Associates LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kevin H. Bell Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Kenneth Joseph Caputo Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Nathanael Kelley Esq.

Attorney at Securities Investor Protection Corporation

1667 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Seanna R. Brown Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Tracy L. Cole Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Nick Cremona Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

David J. Sheehan Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Maximillian S. Shifrin Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Amy Elizabeth Vanderwal Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Helen Davis Chaitman Esq.

Attorney at Chaitman LLP

465 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Lance Gotthoffer Esq.

Attorney at Chaitman LLP

465 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

137 #3

Exhibit 2- Trial Transcript Day 3

137 #2

Exhibit 1- Jury Charge

137 #1

FRAP 28(j) Letter RECEIVED

#135

(#135) FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 03/21/2022, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, RECEIVED. Service date 03/21/2022 by CM/ECF.[3281269] [21-872] [Entered: 03/21/2022 11:42 AM]

#132

(#132) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, FILED. Service date 03/11/2022 by CM/ECF. [3276240] [21-872] [Entered: 03/11/2022 10:09 AM]

#131

RESTRICTED

#128

(#128) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, in reponse to Trustee's Rule 28(j) letter dated 02/23/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3267480] [21-872]--[Edited 02/25/2022 by CM] [Entered: 02/25/2022 09:36 AM]

#127

(#127) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, FILED. Service date 02/24/2022 by CM/ECF. [3267092] [21-872] [Entered: 02/24/2022 02:54 PM]

121 #2

Supporting Document

#11

#9

#8

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

#2

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

68 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 03/23/2022, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, RECEIVED. Service date 03/23/2022 by CM/ECF.[3283561] [21-872] [Entered: 03/23/2022 03:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) FRAP 28(j) LETTER, dated 03/21/2022, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, RECEIVED. Service date 03/21/2022 by CM/ECF.[3281269] [21-872] [Entered: 03/21/2022 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • Docket(#133) CASE, before RSP, RCW, SJM, HEARD.[3278684] [21-872] [Entered: 03/16/2022 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, FILED. Service date 03/11/2022 by CM/ECF. [3276240] [21-872] [Entered: 03/11/2022 10:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) INSTRUCTIONS FOR ARGUMENT, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED. Note: Listed counsel must log on to CM/ECF in order to view the attachment. [3274195] [21-872] [Entered: 03/08/2022 09:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#128) LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, in reponse to Trustee's Rule 28(j) letter dated 02/23/2022, RECEIVED. Service date 02/25/2022 by CM/ECF.[3267480] [21-872]--[Edited 02/25/2022 by CM] [Entered: 02/25/2022 09:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#127) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, FILED. Service date 02/24/2022 by CM/ECF. [3267092] [21-872] [Entered: 02/24/2022 02:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#124) CURED DEFECTIVE LETTER, [ # 121 ], on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED.[3266990] [21-872] [Entered: 02/24/2022 01:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#123) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 02/24/2022 by CM/ECF. [3266918] [21-872] [Entered: 02/24/2022 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#122) NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 02/24/2022 by CM/ECF. [3266821] [21-872] [Entered: 02/24/2022 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ATTORNEY, Lance Gotthoffer for Bruce Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, JABA Associates LP, The Estate of James Goodman, and Andrew Goodman, in case 21-872, [ # 12 ], ADDED.[3080570] [21-872] [Entered: 04/19/2021 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, FILED. Service date 04/19/2021 by CM/ECF. [3080484] [21-872] [Entered: 04/19/2021 12:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, FILED. Service date 04/16/2021 by CM/ECF.[3079723] [21-872] [Entered: 04/16/2021 03:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Securities Investor Protection Corporation, FILED. Service date 04/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3073723] [21-872] [Entered: 04/08/2021 03:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Irving H. Picard, FILED. Service date 04/08/2021 by CM/ECF.[3073318] [21-872] [Entered: 04/08/2021 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3072446] [21-872] [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docket(#4) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, district court receipt # ANYSDC-24355943, FILED.[3072441] [21-872] [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/24/2021, RECEIVED.[3072437] [21-872] [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 03/24/2021, RECEIVED.[3072429] [21-872] [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Andrew Goodman, Audrey M. Goodman, Bruce Goodman, JABA Associates LP and The Estate of James Goodman, FILED. [3072419] [21-872] [Entered: 04/07/2021 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JABA Associates LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Securities Investor Protection Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Securities Investor Protection Corporation, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance Gotthoffer Esq.