This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 09/14/2022 at 06:25:37 (UTC).

In re: Asbesto Products

Case Summary

On 11/22/2016 In re Asbesto Products was filed as a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    16-4148

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

 

Party Details

Defendants

EAGLE PICHER INDUSTRIES INC

COMBUSTION ENGINEERING INC

OWENS CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP

FLEXITALLIC GASKET CORP

T AND N PLC

WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP

GULF OIL TRADING CO

BABCOCK & WILCOX CO

FIBREBOARD CORP

ISTHMIAN LINES

MATHIASEN TANKER INDUSTIRES INC

ALCOA STEAMSHIP CO INC

ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES INC

FOSTER WHEELER CO

PENN SHIPPING CO

AMERICAN LEADER INC

PELTZ BROTHERS INC

HK PORTER CO INC

Plaintiff / Appellant

GEORGE A. PERDREAUVILLE

Defendant / Appellee

KEYSTONE SHIPPING CO

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Henry E. Billingsley Esq. II

Attorney at Tucker Ellis

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Jean K. Korman Esq.

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff

200 Public Square, 2300 Bp America Building

Cleveland, OH 44114

Richard C. Binzley Esq.

Attorney at Thompson Hine

3900 Key Center, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

John S. Wasung Esq.

Attorney at Kitch Saurbien Drutchas Wagner & Kenney

2790 Columbus Road, Route 16, Building 53

Granville, OH 43023

Kent D. Riesen Esq.

Attorney at Billmaier & Cuneo

28366 Kensington Lane

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Randall L. Solomon Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

127 Public Square, Key Tower, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Thomas H. Shunk Esq.

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

127 Public Square, Key Tower, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

James J. Hayes Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Garan Lucow Miller PC

1155 Brewery Park Boulevard, Suite 200

Detroit, MI 48207

Susan K. Dirks Esq.

Attorney at Thompson Hine

3900 Key Center, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Thomas O. Murphy Esq.

Attorney at Thompson Hine

3900 Key Center, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Alan Kellman Esq.

Attorney at The Maritime Asbestosis Legal Clinic

30800 Telegraph Road

Bingham Farms, MI 48226

Timothy A. Swafford Esq.

Attorney at Jaques Admiralty Law Firm

645 Griswold Street, 1370 Penobscot Building

Detroit, MI 48226

Other Attorneys

Timothy T. Brick Esq.

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp

1501 Euclid Avenue, Bulkely Building, Sixth Floor

Cleveland, OH 44115

Stephen L. Witenoff Esq.

Attorney at Thomas Degrood & Whitenoff, PC

400 Galleria Office Centre, Suite 550

Southfield, MI 48034

Michael R. Gallagher Esq.

Attorney at Gallagher Sharp

1501 Euclid Avenue, Bulkely Building, Sixth Floor

Cleveland, OH 44115

Robert Bunda

Attorney at Bunda Stutz & De Witt

3295 Levine Commons Boulevard

Perrysburg, OH 43551

Clayton F. Farrell Esq.

Attorney at Collins Einhorn Farrell

4000 Town Center, 9Th Floor

Southfield, MI 48075

Brent C. Taggart Esq.

Attorney at Vorys Sater Seymour & Pease

52 East Gay Street, P.O. Box 1008

Columbus, OH 43215

William D. Bonezzi Esq.

Attorney at Bonezzi Switzer Murphy Polito & Hupp

Penton Media Building, 1300 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

William C. Schaefer Esq.

Attorney at Driggers Schultz & Herbst

2600 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 550

Troy, MI 48084

11 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Open Document #3

Mandate Letter

Open Document #2

Opinion

Open Document #1

Mandate Issued

Open Document

Open Document #3

Exhibit 1 - Judgment

Open Document #2

Exhibit 2 - Opinion

Open Document #1

Petition for Panel Rehearing ONLY

Open Document

Open Document #2

Certificate of Service

Open Document

Open Document #8

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #7

Standing Order Excess Pagination

Open Document #6

Caption

Open Document #5

Distict Court Memorandum

Open Document #4

Distirct Court Order

Open Document #3

District Court Order

Open Document #2

District Court Order

Open Document #1

Notice of Appeal

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED, filed. (CLW) [Entered: 01/30/2018 12:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (VANASKIE, RENDELL and FISHER, Circuit Judges) denying Petition for Panel Rehearing filed by Appellees Keystone Shipping Co, Farrell Lines, Delta Steamship Lines Inc, American Export Isbrandtsen and Mississippi Shipping Co, filed. Vanaskie, Authoring Judge. (CLW) [Entered: 01/22/2018 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Petition filed by Appellees American Export Isbrandtsen, Delta Steamship Lines Inc, Farrell Lines, Keystone Shipping Co and Mississippi Shipping Co for Rehearing before Original Panel. Certificate of Service dated 01/11/2018. Service made by ECF. (HWH) [Entered: 01/11/2018 11:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREVIEWED Bill of Costs filed. After review, costs will be taxed in the amount of $2181.80. 16-4148 (CLW) [Entered: 01/11/2018 09:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: BILL OF COSTS filed on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville. Certificate of Service dated 01/10/2018. Service made by ECF. (AK) [Entered: 01/10/2018 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT, ORDERED and ADJUDGED by this Court that the District Court's March 12, 2014, and October 10, 2014, orders granting the Appellees' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction are hereby REVERSED and VACATED and the matter is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings. Costs shall be taxed against the Appellees. All of the in accordance with the Opinion of this Court. (CLW) [Entered: 12/28/2017 10:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: VANASKIE, RENDELL and FISHER, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 12. Judge: VANASKIE Authoring. (CLW) [Entered: 12/28/2017 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT MINUTES OF ARGUED/SUBMITTED CASES. [16-3636, 16-4297, 16-1198, 16-2992, 16-4092, 16-4111, 16-4148, 16-4169, 17-1246] (PM) [Entered: 09/11/2017 03:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketSUBMITTED on Monday, September 11, 2017. Panel: VANASKIE, RENDELL, FISHER, Circuit Judges. (PM) [Entered: 09/11/2017 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmit Notification for Monday, 09/11/2017. (TLG) [Entered: 08/22/2017 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville, received. (AK) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville, filed. (AK) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville, filed. (AK) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Joseph Blue and George A. Perdreauville advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (AK) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harold W. Henderson on behalf of Appellee(s) Delta Steamship Lines Inc. Mississippi Shipping Company Farrell Lines Inc. American Export Lines Inc. American Export Isbrandtsen Keystone Shipping Co.. (HWH) [Entered: 12/06/2016 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy A. Swafford on behalf of Appellant(s) Joseph E. Blue; George Perdreauville. (TAS) [Entered: 12/01/2016 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alan Kellman on behalf of Appellant(s) Joseph E. Blue; George Perdreauville. (AK) [Entered: 12/01/2016 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2016
  • DocketNotice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 11/23/2016. (JK) [Entered: 11/25/2016 01:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketRECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 11/22/2016 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Joseph E. Blue and George A. Perdreauville in District Court No. 2-11-cv-33914,2-11-cv-33906,2-02-md-00875. (CLW) [Entered: 11/22/2016 01:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H.K. PORTER CO., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FLEXITALLIC GASKET COMPANY, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIBREBOARD CORP. is a litigant