This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 10/23/2021 at 05:46:24 (UTC).

In re: Arista Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 In re Arista Networks, Inc was filed as an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-103

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

 

Party Details

Petitioner

In re: ARISTA NETWORKS, INC.

Respondent

WSOU INVESTMENTS LLC, dba Brazos Licensing and Development

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Douglas Ethan Lumish

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Gabriel K. Bell

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Richard Gregory Frenkel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Ashley Fry

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jeffrey G. Homrig

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Respondent Attorneys

Shawn Daniel Blackburn

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Streetsuite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Kalpana Srinivasan

Attorney at Susman Godfrey L.L.P.

1901 Avenue Of The Starssuite 950

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Max Lalon Tribble Jr.

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1000 Louisiana Streetsuite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION of Petitioner Arista Networks, Inc. to extend time. Service: 10/21/2021 by email. [807253]--[Edited 10/21/2021 by MMA - Reason: to correct relief] [Douglas Lumish] [Entered: 10/21/2021 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certificate of Interest for Petitioner Arista Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/21/2021 by email. [807249] [22-103] [Douglas Lumish] [Entered: 10/21/2021 11:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Entry of appearance for Jeffrey G. Homrig; Richard G. Frenkel; Gabriel K. Bell; Ashley M. Fry as counsel for Petitioner Arista Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/21/2021 by email. [807246] [22-103] [Douglas Lumish] [Entered: 10/21/2021 11:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER filed granting motion to extend time to file [ # 7 ] filed by Respondent WSOU Investments LLC. WSOU must submit its response to the mandamus petition no later than October 29, 2021. Any reply in support of the petition is due no later than three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [806377] [LMS] [Entered: 10/18/2021 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION of Respondent WSOU Investments LLC to extend time. Service: 10/15/2021 by email. [806237]--[Edited 10/18/2021 by MMA - Reason: to correct relief] [Shawn Blackburn] [Entered: 10/15/2021 06:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Entry of appearance for Shawn Blackburn; Kalpana Srinivasan; Max L. Tribble, Jr. as counsel for Respondent WSOU Investments LLC. Service: 10/15/2021 by email. [806235] [22-103] [Shawn Blackburn] [Entered: 10/15/2021 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER. WSOU Investments LLC is directed to respond to the petition [ # 2 ] within seven days from the date of filing of this order. Any reply in support of the petition is due no later than three days thereafter. (Per Curiam). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [806144] [NL] [Entered: 10/15/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Entry of appearance for Douglas E. Lumish as counsel for Petitioner Arista Networks, Inc.. Service: 10/15/2021 by clerk. [805884] [MMA] [Entered: 10/15/2021 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Confidential Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Petitioner Arista Networks, Inc. corresponding to Doc. No. [ # 2 ]. Service: 10/14/2021 by US mail. [805882] [MMA] [Entered: 10/15/2021 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PETITION of Petitioner Arista Networks, Inc. for Writ of Mandamus pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 21. Service: 10/14/2021 by US mail. [805879] [MMA] [Entered: 10/15/2021 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Miscellaneous case docketed. Received: 10/14/2021. [805875] Entry of Appearance due 10/29/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/29/2021. [MMA] [Entered: 10/15/2021 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WSOU Investments, LLC d/b/a Brazos Licensing and Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shawn Daniel Blackburn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Max Lalon Tribble, Jr