Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2020 at 06:01:42 (UTC).

In Re: Application of Gorsoan

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 In Re Application of Gorsoan was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-678

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Gorsoan Limited

Respondents

Stuart Sundlun

Eugenia Bullock

Zoe Bullock Remmel

Zoya Kuznetsova

Intervenor

Janna Bullock

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Caroline Stoker Donovan Esq.

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210

Kenneth Scott Leonetti Esq.

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210

Respondent Attorneys

Matthew J. Craig Esq.

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Sean Hecker Esq.

Attorney at Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP

350 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10118

Nathaniel Z. Marmur Esq.

Attorney at The Law Offices of Nathaniel Z. Marmur, PLLC

500 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10110

Intervenor Attorneys

Jonathan Bach Esq.

Attorney at Shapiro Arato Bach LLP

500 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10110

Alexandra A.E. Shapiro Esq.

Attorney at Shapiro Arato Bach LLP

500 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10110

Julian S. Brod Esq.

Attorney at Shapiro Arato Bach LLP

500 5Th Avenue

New York, NY 10110

 

Court Documents

#58

(#58) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Bullock Remmel, Eugenia Bullock and Zoya Kuznetsova in 20-680, 20-678, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 03/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2805568] [20-680, 20-678, 20-679] [Entered: 03/19/2020 01:15 PM]

#57

(#57) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Stuart Sundlun in 20-678 Brief due date as 06/15/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 06/15/2020, FILED.[2805196] [20-678, 20-679, 20-680] [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:08 AM]

#54

(#54) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Janna Bullock in 20-678, 20-679 Brief due date as 06/15/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 06/15/2020, FILED.[2804164] [20-678, 20-679, 20-680] [Entered: 03/18/2020 08:19 AM]

#53

(#53) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Stuart Sundlun in 20-678, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 03/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2803942] [20-678, 20-679, 20-680] [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:56 PM]

#50

(#50) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Janna Bullock in 20-679, Janna Bullock in 20-678, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 03/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2803749] [20-679, 20-678, 20-680] [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:26 PM]

#49

(#49) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2798927] [20-678, 20-679, 20-680] [Entered: 03/11/2020 12:17 PM]

#43

(#43) NOTICE, to Appellee Gorsoan Limited, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2798172] [20-680] [Entered: 03/10/2020 03:02 PM]

#39

(#39) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Bullock Remmel, Eugenia Bullock and Zoya Kuznetsova, FILED. Service date 03/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2796170] [20-678] [Entered: 03/06/2020 03:54 PM]

#38

(#38) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Bullock Remmel, Eugenia Bullock and Zoya Kuznetsova, FILED. Service date 03/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2796167] [20-678] [Entered: 03/06/2020 03:54 PM]

8 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

8 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

7 #2

Case FILED

7 #1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/24/2020, RECEIVED.[2784999] [20-678] [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:01 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Bullock Remmel, Eugenia Bullock and Zoya Kuznetsova in 20-680, 20-678, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 03/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2805568] [20-680, 20-678, 20-679] [Entered: 03/19/2020 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Stuart Sundlun in 20-678 Brief due date as 06/15/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 06/15/2020, FILED.[2805196] [20-678, 20-679, 20-680] [Entered: 03/19/2020 09:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Janna Bullock in 20-678, 20-679 Brief due date as 06/15/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 06/15/2020, FILED.[2804164] [20-678, 20-679, 20-680] [Entered: 03/18/2020 08:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Stuart Sundlun in 20-678, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 03/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2803942] [20-678, 20-679, 20-680] [Entered: 03/17/2020 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Janna Bullock in 20-679, Janna Bullock in 20-678, informing Court of proposed due date 06/15/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 03/17/2020 by CM/ECF.[2803749] [20-679, 20-678, 20-680] [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2798927] [20-678, 20-679, 20-680] [Entered: 03/11/2020 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#44) ATTORNEY, Kenneth Scott Leonetti for Gorsoan Limited, in case 20-680, [ # 2798260-2 ], ADDED.[2798331] [20-680] [Entered: 03/10/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE, to Appellee Gorsoan Limited, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2798172] [20-680] [Entered: 03/10/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Bullock Remmel, Eugenia Bullock and Zoya Kuznetsova, FILED. Service date 03/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2796170] [20-678] [Entered: 03/06/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Zoe Bullock Remmel, Eugenia Bullock and Zoya Kuznetsova, FILED. Service date 03/06/2020 by CM/ECF.[2796167] [20-678] [Entered: 03/06/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#22) ATTORNEY, Alexandra A.E. Shapiro for Janna Bullock, in case 20-679, [ # 2786708-2 ], ADDED.[2786900] [20-679] [Entered: 02/25/2020 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CAPTION, edited designation of the respondents due to consolidated appeals, AMENDED.[2785073] [20-678] [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2785087] [20-680] [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Eugenia Bullock, Zoe Bullock Remmel and Zoya Kuznetsova, FILED. [2785076] [20-680] [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2785040] [20-679] [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Janna Bullock, FILED. [2785033] [20-679] [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2785002] [20-678] [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docket(#3) PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Stuart Sundlun, district court receipt # ANYSDC-18878723, FILED.[2785001] [20-678] [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 01/24/2020, RECEIVED.[2784999] [20-678] [Entered: 02/24/2020 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Stuart Sundlun, FILED. [2784995] [20-678] [Entered: 02/24/2020 11:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gorsoan Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Paul Bach