This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/25/2020 at 06:02:25 (UTC).

In re: American Medical

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 In re American Medical was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-2149

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Appellant

LANA C. KEETON

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Not Classified By Court

In re: AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INCORPORATED, Pelvic Repair System Products Liability Litigation

Defendant / Appellees

AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INCORPORATED

AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Lana C. Keeton

901 Pennsylvania Avenue

Miami Beach, FL 33139

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Erik Wayne Legg

Attorney at FARRELL, WHITE & LEGG PLLC

914 5Th Avenue

Huntington, WV 25772-0000

Barbara R. Binis

Attorney at REED SMITH, LLP

3 Logan Square, 1717 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#17

21 #13

Additional Document

21 #12

Additional Document

21 #11

Additional Document

21 #10

Additional Document

21 #9

Additional Document

21 #8

Additional Document

21 #7

Additional Document

21 #6

Additional Document

21 #5

Additional Document

21 #4

Additional Document

21 #3

Additional Document

21 #2

Additional Document

21 #1

Informal appendix

#20

19 #6

Additional Document

19 #5

Additional Document

19 #3

Additional Document

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. . Due: 12/29/2020. [20-2149] MR [Entered: 12/15/2020 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) INFORMAL APPENDIX by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 12/03/2020 11:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DOCUMENT referencing [ # 5 ] Record - ADDITIONAL RECORD ON APPEAL BY LANA C. KEETON by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. [1000855334] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 11/29/2020 09:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000855333] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 11/29/2020 09:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER filed granting motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ]. Number of days granted: 10. Informal Opening Brief due 12/03/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000853900] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 11/24/2020 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION by Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170 to extend filing time for informal opening brief until Thursday, December 3, 2020.. Date and method of service: 11/23/2020 ecf. [1000853656] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] Lana Keeton [Entered: 11/23/2020 05:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RECORD FOLLOW UP NOTICE ISSUED to Clerk of Court. Due: 12/03/2020. [20-2149] MR [Entered: 11/19/2020 08:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice issued re: [ # 3 ] initial notice, [ # 4 ] briefing order.. . [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1000835008-2 ] case , [ # 1 ] case , [ # 1000836857-2 ] case , [ # 1000837196-2 ] case , [ # 1000837571-2 ] case , [ # 1000837796-2 ] case , [ # 1000838228-2 ] case Originating case number: 2:10-md-02187, 2:12-md-02325, 2:12-md-02326, 2:12-md-02327, 2:12-md-02387, 2:13-md-02440, 2:14-md-02511. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE ISSUED re: case caption.. [20-2149] MR [Entered: 11/09/2020 11:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PARTIAL RECORD (pleadings 7297-7583) requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 11/09/2020 [20-2149] MR [Entered: 11/04/2020 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RECORDS requested from Clerk of Court in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170. Due: 11/12/2020. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 10/29/2020 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 11/23/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 10/29/2020 10:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FEE NOTICE issued to Lana C. Keeton in 20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170 - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 11/30/2020 Originating case number: 2:10-md-02187. [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER filed consolidating case 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, and 20-2170 with 20-2139.. Copies to all parties.. [1000838551] [20-2139, 20-2149, 20-2155, 20-2158, 20-2161, 20-2164, 20-2170] MR [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:12-md-02325. Case manager: MRadday. [20-2149] MR [Entered: 10/26/2020 10:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barbara R. Binis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erik W Legg