This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2021 at 06:01:43 (UTC).

In re: Allonhill LLC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 In re Allonhill LLC was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1017

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Debtor

In re: ALLONHILL LLC, FKA Allon Hill, FKA Allon Financial LLC, FKA Murrayhill Company LLC

Defendant / Appellee

STEWART LENDER SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Debtor Attorneys

Lynn W. Holbert Esq.

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US

390 Madison Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Neil B. Glassman Esq.

Attorney at Bayard

600 North King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Evan T. Miller Esq.

Attorney at Bayard

600 North King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Pieter H.B. Van Tol Esq. III

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US

390 Madison Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Sophie E. Macon Esq.

Attorney at Bayard

600 North King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Nathaniel P. Bruhn Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Andrew J. Gallo Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Ericka F. Johnson Esq.

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

Samuel R, Rowley Esq.

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

One Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Kevin J. Mangan Esq.

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson

1313 North Market Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Allonhill LLC to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/21/2021 05:03 PM]

#16

(#16) ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL Response filed by Appellee Stewart Lender Services Inc to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/21/2021 04:59 PM]

#15

(#15) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Stewart Lender Services Inc. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:14 PM]

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stewart Lender Services, Inc. on behalf of Appellee(s) Kevin J. Mangan. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:12 PM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stewart Lender Services, Inc. on behalf of Appellee(s) Nathaniel P. Bruhn. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:09 PM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew J. Gallo on behalf of Appellee(s) Stewart Lender Services, Inc.. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:03 PM]

11 #6

Exhibit F

11 #5

Exhibit E

11 #4

Exhibit D

11 #3

Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Document (Exhibits, etc.)

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Allonhill LLC. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 03:25 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Allonhill LLC. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 03:24 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Allonhill LLC advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 03:21 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Allonhill LLC. [21-1017] (NBG) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:28 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Pieter Van Tol on behalf of Appellant(s) Allonhill, LLC. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:21 PM]

#5

(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Evan T. Miller on behalf of Appellant(s) Allonhill, LLC. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:19 PM]

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: Response filed by Appellant Allonhill LLC to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/21/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ECF FILER: SUPPLEMENTAL Response filed by Appellee Stewart Lender Services Inc to clerk order advising of possible dismissal. Certificate of Service dated 01/21/2021. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/21/2021 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Stewart Lender Services Inc. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stewart Lender Services, Inc. on behalf of Appellee(s) Kevin J. Mangan. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Stewart Lender Services, Inc. on behalf of Appellee(s) Nathaniel P. Bruhn. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Andrew J. Gallo on behalf of Appellee(s) Stewart Lender Services, Inc.. [21-1017] (KJM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 05:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: Exhibits A through F to Concise Summary of the Case (D.I. 10) filed by Appellant Allonhill LLC. Certificate of Service dated 01/19/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Allonhill LLC. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Allonhill LLC. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Allonhill LLC advising this court that transcripts are not needed. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/19/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Allonhill LLC. [21-1017] (NBG) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Pieter Van Tol on behalf of Appellant(s) Allonhill, LLC. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Evan T. Miller on behalf of Appellant(s) Allonhill, LLC. [21-1017] (ETM) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Neil B. Glassman on behalf of Appellant(s) Allonhill, LLC. [21-1017, 20-1739] (NBG) [Entered: 01/15/2021 03:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER (Clerk) advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (AMR) [Entered: 01/07/2021 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 01/07/2021 03:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Allonhill LLC in District Court No. 1-19-cv-00879,1-19-cv-00938. (AMR) [Entered: 01/07/2021 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STEWART LENDER SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil B. Glassman Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Thomas Miller